Butler v. Hanken et al
Plaintiff: David D Butler
Defendant: James Hanken, Calvin Cogburn and Steven Jewitt
Case Number: 2:2023cv01624
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida Served by First-Class Mail on 12/07/2023 to James Hanken; Calvin Cogburn; Dr. Steven Jewitt; Washington State Attorney General. (cc: Washington State Attorney General via mail and email) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by David D Butler against defendant(s) Calvin Cogburn, James Hanken, Steven Jewitt **49 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STRIKING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The report and recommendation filed on November 28, 2023, is STRICKEN. Dkt. 3. Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by David D Butler before Judge Brian A Tsuchida (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**55 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
December 1, 2023 Deficiency corrected. Signed IFP application received. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 STRIKE ENTRY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Applicationby Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2023, Noting Date 12/15/2023, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR) Modified on 12/5/2023 strike entry per #5 Order (CR).
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** IFP Blank/Incomplete/Unsigned.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/24/2023 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff David D Butler. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**53 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Butler, Prisoner ID: 343955) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Hanken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hanken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?