Portillo et al v. CoStar Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jeanette Portillo, Alicia Coakley, Freddy Barajas, Heriberto Valiente, David Concepcion, Daniel Kassl and Daniel Smith
Defendant: CoStar Group, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Accor Management US Inc., STR, Inc., CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc, Marriott International Inc, Accor Management US Inc, Six Continents Hotels Inc and Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2024cv00229
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Chad S. Hummel, filed by Defendant Accor Management US Inc. (Wechkin, Robin)
April 16, 2024 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulated motion to substitute the party name and change the case caption (Dkt. No. #84 ). Finding good cause, the motion is GRANTED. The complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) is deemed amended to substitute "Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc." for "Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc." The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant "Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc." from the docket and replace it with "Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc." Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
April 15, 2024 Filing 84 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party and Change Case Caption, filed by Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Parties) Noting Date 4/15/2024, (Bradley, Heidi)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re #78 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mari Grace for DEFENDANT Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #79 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tina Joe for DEFENDANT Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #77 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neal Potischman for DEFENDANT Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re #76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney D Jarrett Arp for DEFENDANT Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Filing 79 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tina Joe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408551 (Bradley, Heidi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 78 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mari Grace FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408542 (Bradley, Heidi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 77 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neal Potischman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408541 (Bradley, Heidi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 76 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. Jarrett Arp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408365 (Bradley, Heidi)
March 28, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #78 by attorney Mari Grace will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re #69 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Emily S Newton for DEFENDANT Six Continents Hotels Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #68 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey S Cashdan for DEFENDANT Six Continents Hotels Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re #67 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Caroline Buyak for DEFENDANT Six Continents Hotels Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re #66 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lohr A Beck for DEFENDANT Six Continents Hotels Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re #61 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul D Brachman for DEFENDANT Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #60 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Robinson for DEFENDANT Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 22, 2024 Filing 69 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Emily S. Newton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Six Continents Hotels Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8402050 (Taylor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 68 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey S. Cashdan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Six Continents Hotels Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8402048 (Taylor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 67 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caroline Buyak FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Six Continents Hotels Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8402044 (Taylor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 66 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lohr A. Beck FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Six Continents Hotels Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8401875 (Taylor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Corporate Parent Inter-Continental Hotels Group PLC for Six Continents Hotels Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Six Continents Hotels Inc. (Taylor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/3/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/10/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2024. (KMP)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
March 22, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #60 by attorney Matthew Robinson will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 22, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #61 by attorney Paul D. Brachman will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 21, 2024 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #32 Stipulated MOTION Extending Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, and Parties' #56 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party Name and Change Case Caption. The deadline for Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended until 5/17/2024. Moreover, the complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) is deemed amended to substitute "Six Continents Hotels, Inc." for "Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation." The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant "Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation" from the docket and replace it with "Six Continents Hotels, Inc." Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
March 21, 2024 Filing 61 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul D. Brachman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8399593 (Maguire, Robert)
March 21, 2024 Filing 60 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Robinson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8399495 (Maguire, Robert)
March 20, 2024 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven W Fogg on behalf of Defendant Marriott International Inc. (Fogg, Steven)
March 19, 2024 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold no longer assigned to case, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (KAM)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lawrence E Buterman for DEFENDANTS CoStar Group Inc and STR Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 19, 2024 Filing 56 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party Name and Change Case Caption, filed by Plaintiffs Freddy Barajas, Alicia Coakley, David Concepcion, Daniel Kassl, Jeanette Portillo, Daniel Smith, Heriberto Valiente. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/19/2024, (Berman, Steve)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #38 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carrie Mahan for DEFENDANT Accor Management US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elyse M Greenwald for DEFENDANTS CoStar Group Inc and STR Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah M Ray for DEFENDANTS CoStar Group Inc and STR Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Filing 52 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/25/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin M Mundel for DEFENDANT Accor Management US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #37 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amy P Lally for DEFENDANT Accor Management US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #36 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chad S Hummel for DEFENDANT Accor Management US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re #35 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sandra Nicole Booth for DEFENDANT Accor Management US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine Forrest for DEFENDANT Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lindsay C. Harrison for DEFEDANT Hyatt Hotels Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Douglas Litvack for DEFEMDANT Hyatt Hotels Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (Rosenberger, Michael)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah Akhtar for DEFENDANT Marriott International Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melanie L. Katsur for DEFENDANT Marriott International Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristen C Limarzi for DEFENDANT Marriott International Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 18, 2024 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. (Maguire, Robert)
March 18, 2024 Attorney Emily Parsons added for Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; per #28 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
March 18, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #38 by attorney Carrie Mahan will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 18, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #27 by attorney Elyse M. Greenwald will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 18, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #25 by attorney Sarah M. Ray will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 18, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #26 by attorney Lawrence E. Buterman will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 15, 2024 Filing 39 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin M. Mundel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accor Management US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8392566 (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 38 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carrie Mahan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accor Management US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8392551 (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 37 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy P. Lally FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accor Management US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8392472 (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 36 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Chad S. Hummel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accor Management US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8392461 (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 35 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sandra Nicole Booth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Accor Management US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8392438 (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Accor SA, Corporate Parent FHI Finance (U.S.) Inc. for Accor Management US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Accor Management US Inc. (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendant Accor Management US Inc. (Wechkin, Robin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 32 Stipulated MOTION Extending Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/15/2024, (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. (Bradley, Heidi)
March 15, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heidi B Bradley on behalf of Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. (Bradley, Heidi)
March 15, 2024 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine B. Forrest FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391823 (Maguire, Robert)
March 15, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert J Maguire on behalf of Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. (Maguire, Robert)
March 15, 2024 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elyse M. Greenwald FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391288 (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lawrence E. Buterman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391281 (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah M. Ray FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391258 (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lindsay C. Harrison FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391270 (Rosenberger, Michael)
March 15, 2024 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Douglas E. Litvack FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8391261 (Rosenberger, Michael)
March 15, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Rosenberger on behalf of Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (Rosenberger, Michael)
March 15, 2024 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent CoStar Realty Information, Inc. for STR Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by STR Inc. (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CoStar Group Inc. (Power, Vanessa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Soriano Power on behalf of Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR Inc. (Power, Vanessa)
March 12, 2024 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Marriott International Inc. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah Akhtar FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Marriott International Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8385730 (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melanie L. Katsur FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Marriott International Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8385720 (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristen C. Limarzi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Marriott International Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8385696 (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey B Coopersmith on behalf of Defendant Marriott International Inc. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul R Taylor on behalf of Defendant Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation. (Taylor, Paul)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on STR, Inc. on 2/27/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Marriott International, Inc. on 2/26/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Loews Hotels Holding Corporation on 2/26/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation on 2/26/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hyatt Hotels Corporation on 2/27/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. on 2/27/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CoStar Group, Inc. on 2/26/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 29, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Accor Management US Inc. on 2/27/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rio S Pierce for PLAINTIFFS Freddy Barajas, Alicia Coakley, David Concepcion, Daniel Kassl, Jeanette Portillo, Daniel Smith and Heriberto Valiente, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rio S. Pierce FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8361977 (Berman, Steve)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(MIH)
February 22, 2024 Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (MIH)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8358221) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Freddy Barajas(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Alicia Coakley(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party David Concepcion(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Daniel Kassl(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Jeanette Portillo(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Daniel Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Heriberto Valiente(pty:pla) filed by Freddy Barajas, Alicia Coakley, Jeanette Portillo, David Concepcion, Daniel Kassl, Daniel Smith, Heriberto Valiente. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Accor Management US Inc., #3 Summons for CoStar Group, Inc., #4 Summons for Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., #5 Summons for Hyatt Hotels Corporation, #6 Summons for Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, #7 Summons for Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, #8 Summons for Marriott International, Inc., #9 Summons for STR, Inc.)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo et al v. CoStar Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Portillo
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Coakley
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Barajas
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Valiente
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Concepcion
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kassl
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Smith
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoStar Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Litvack
Represented By: Lindsay C. Harrison
Represented By: Michael Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Forrest
Represented By: Matthew Robinson
Represented By: Paul D Brachman
Represented By: Emily Parsons
Represented By: Robert J Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Management US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoStar Group Inc
Represented By: Elyse M Greenwald
Represented By: Lawrence E Buterman
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STR Inc
Represented By: Elyse M Greenwald
Represented By: Lawrence E Buterman
Represented By: Sarah M Ray
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc
Represented By: D Jarrett Arp
Represented By: Mari Grace
Represented By: Neal Potischman
Represented By: Tina Joe
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Inc
Represented By: Kristen C Limarzi
Represented By: Melanie L. Katsur
Represented By: Sarah Akhtar
Represented By: Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Management US Inc
Represented By: Amy P Lally
Represented By: Benjamin M Mundel
Represented By: Carrie Mahan
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Sandra Nicole Booth
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels Inc
Represented By: Caroline Buyak
Represented By: Emily S Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey S Cashdan
Represented By: Lohr A Beck
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc
Represented By: D Jarrett Arp
Represented By: Mari Grace
Represented By: Neal Potischman
Represented By: Tina Joe
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?