Bolton v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Scott Carroll Bolton
Defendant: Tracy Hixon, State of Washington, Department of Corrections, Olympic Corrections Center, Mate, Janice Price, Don Earls, Chad Lee, Sue Gibbs and John Aldana
Case Number: 3:2012cv05658
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 43 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time. The documents filed at ECF No 38 shall be accepted as Plaintiff's timely response to the Court's Order (ECF No 35). No further extensions shall be granted. Plaintiff shall file nothing further until this Court can determine whether he has filed a viable complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to AMEND Complaint or SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed. Amended Complaint or Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2013. Plaintiff is directed to submit only his proposed second amended complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file no motions until it has been determined that any of his claims will be allowed to go forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/enclosures.)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the Court's Report and Recommendation 20 dated 11/7/12 is WITHDRAWN. The Clerk is directed to strike the noting date for ECF No. 20 and to re-refer this case to the undersigned. Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunctive relief (ECF No. 21 , 22 , 23 , 24 , and 25 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's remaining motions (ECF Nos. 27-33) are DENIED as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 12 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PLEASE DISREGARD, CLERK'S ERROR, filed in wrong case ORDER to AMEND Complaint or SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed. Amended Complaint or Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/enclosures) Modified on 8/29/2012: striking entry as order filed in wrong case. (CMG).
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 5 Complaint, filed by Scott Carroll Bolton Show Cause Response due by 9/7/2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET) cc: plaintiff w/general order & forms
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Carroll Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Hixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?