Basra v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Paramjit Singh Basra
Defendant: Richard Morgan, Robert Herzog, Ron Haynes, Dorinda Wall, Laura Allison, Mike Obenland, Nicholas, Howell, Heimbigner and Stephen Sinclair
Case Number: 3:2016cv06005
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 96 ; Defendants Dreyer, Duncan, Hayes and Stewart's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against them are DISMISSED with prejudice ; Defendant Alpin's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Equal Protection claim is GRANTED and that claim is DISMISSED with prejudice; in forma pauperis status on appeal will continue; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration for Appointment of Counsel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 79 Motion to Appoint Counsel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Clarification; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN) Modified on 4/30/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 47 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Paramjit Singh Basra; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 1/3/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Paramjit Singh Basra; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 19 is DENIED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Paramjit Basra, Prisoner ID: 357517)(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basra v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramjit Singh Basra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorinda Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heimbigner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?