Perez v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Jay Perez
Defendant: Dick Morgan, Ron Haynes, Karie Rainer, Don Holbrook, Brenda McKinney, Steve Blakeman, Heidi Romero, Caroline Gillespie, David Guidry, Peter Back, Brian Ewert, Dave Lesser, John Doe McClanahan, John Doe Doyle, John Doe King, John Doe Vicari, Steve Sundburg, John and Jane Doe's, Michael Tupper, Michael Obenland and Robert Monger
Case Number: 3:2016cv06023
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER that Plaintiff's 134 Motion to Seek Leave to Take Deposition by Written Answer is DENIED. The Court ADOPTS IN PART section II of defendants' proposed Partial Discovery Plan, Dkt. 129. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(CMG)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that Plaintiff's 114 MOTION for Leave to Amend 58 Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute Kara Hubbs for a Jane Doe on the docket. Plaintiff's motion to supplement the motion for leave to amend 120 is DENIED. No further amendments to the pleadings will be granted unless the moving party shows good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(CMG)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE of Amended Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (copy of service order, second amended complaint, and notice of lawsuit & waiver of service emailed on 9/29/17 to Defendant Kara Hubbs.)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(CMG)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 102 GRANTING Defendant Morgan's motion to dismiss; plaintiff's claims against Morgan individually and in his official capacity are DISMISSED; the Clerk will substitute the new DOC Secretary, Stephen Sinclair, as defendant in this action; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(DN)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE SUA SPONTE, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. The discovery deadline is now set for October 27, 2017. The dispositive motion deadline will be December 7, 2017. **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(GMR)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting Defendant Morgan's 63 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(CMG)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke; Denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Counsel; and Granting Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Supplement the Motion for Counsel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(GMR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Amend to Substitute "Doe" Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**3 PAGES, PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(GMR)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 Denying Defendant Guidry's Motion to Dismiss 37 ; Plaintiff has 30 days to amend his complaint; this matter is re-referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(DN)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Default, and denying 34 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Perez, Prisoner ID: 888274)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jay Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karie Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Vicari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sundburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tupper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Monger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?