Swearingen et al v. North Thurston School District

Plaintiff: L.S., David Swearingen and Alicia Swearingen
Defendant: North Thurston School District
Case Number: 3:2018cv05727
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by North Thurston School District.(Safarli, John)
September 28, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on North Thurston School District on 9/21/2018, filed by Plaintiffs L.S., Alicia Swearingen, David Swearingen. (Satre, Mallory)
September 11, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/3/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 11, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 10, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John A Safarli on behalf of Defendant North Thurston School District. (Safarli, John)
September 10, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendant North Thurston School District. (Floyd, Francis)
September 7, 2018 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) North Thurston School District. (GMR)
September 7, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
September 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5461682), filed by Alicia Swearingen, L.S., David Swearingen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fogg, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swearingen et al v. North Thurston School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.S.
Represented By: Lauren R Hruska
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Swearingen
Represented By: Lauren R Hruska
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Swearingen
Represented By: Lauren R Hruska
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Thurston School District
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?