K.N. v. Tacoma School District No 10 et al

Plaintiff: U.S.V. and K.N.
Defendant: Tacoma School District No. 10, Jane and John Does 1-7, Melissa Porter, Sandra Holmes, Megan Clark, Steven Holmes and Tacoma School District No 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv05037
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Steven Holmes.(Repass, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Megan Clark.(O'Donnell, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Melissa Porter.(O'Donnell, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Tacoma School District No 10.(O'Donnell, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Sandra Holmes.(Ragonesi, Shannon)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy John Repass on behalf of Defendant Steven Holmes. (Repass, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Civil Rights Violations and Damages against All Defendants. with JURY DEMAND, filed by K.N.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Cochran, Darrell)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon M Ragonesi on behalf of Defendant Sandra Holmes. (Ragonesi, Shannon)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Kelley on behalf of Defendant Megan Clark. (Kelley, Aaron)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Kelley on behalf of Defendant Melissa Porter. (Kelley, Aaron)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Kelley on behalf of Defendant Tacoma School District No 10. (Kelley, Aaron)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings, as related to C17-6037BHS. Counsel are directed to modify their pleadings to reflect this change. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:17-cv-06037, by Plaintiff K.N.. (Cochran, Darrell)
January 15, 2019 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to RBL) (KAM)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
January 15, 2019 JSR NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 4/15/2019. (KAM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 3/18/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Megan Clark, Melissa Porter, Sandra Holmes, Steven Holmes, Tacoma School District No 10 (Attachments: #1 Summons Megan Clark, #2 Summons Sandra Holmes, #3 Summons Melissa Porter, #4 Summons Steven Holmes)(KB)
January 14, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (KB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Rights Violations and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5611491) Attorney Darrell L Cochran added to party K.N.(pty:pla), filed by K.N.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cochran, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.N. v. Tacoma School District No 10 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacoma School District No. 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Porter
Represented By: Mark F. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Holmes
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Clark
Represented By: Mark F. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Holmes
Represented By: Timothy John Repass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacoma School District No 10
Represented By: Mark F. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S.V.
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.N.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?