Paul v. Paul

Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Paul and Michael Paul
Defendant: Philip Paul
Case Number: 3:2019cv05142
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Acceptance of Service By Counsel by parties (McKinley, Nancy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy T. McKinley on behalf of Defendant Philip Paul. (McKinley, Nancy)
February 27, 2019 JSR due 5/28/2019. (JL)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/21/2019, Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Philip Paul. (GMR)
February 26, 2019 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Michael Paul against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5661051), filed by Michael Paul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lindquist, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Paul
Represented By: Nancy T. McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Paul
Represented By: George Kargianis
Represented By: Neil Thomas Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul
Represented By: George Kargianis
Represented By: Neil Thomas Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?