Whittington v. Internal Revenue Service et al

Plaintiff: Scott A Whittington
Defendant: Steve Dyson, Brad Marler and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv05487
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (cc: Pltf - MGC)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (GMR- cc: pltf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint on Steve Dyson on 6/3/2019, sent to Internal Revenue Service, US Attorney for Western District of Washington, and Attorney General of the US, filed by Plaintiff Scott A Whittington. (ERA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint on Brad Marler on 6/3/2019, sent to Internal Revenue Service, US Attorney for Western District of Washington, and Attorney General of the US, filed by Plaintiff Scott A Whittington. (ERA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Scott A Whittington re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Scott A Whittington. (SP)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Steve Dyson, Internal Revenue Service and Brad Marler, filed by Scott A Whittington. (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # TAC015708) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittington v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?