Smith v. Aldridge et al
Plaintiff: John Garrett Smith
Defendant: Daniel Lloyd, James Mcelvain, Rotha Yong, Anthony Golik, Scott Harris, Paul Weisser, Chad Andrews, Sandra Aldridge and Michael Johnston
Case Number: 3:2019cv05600
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of 9/13/2019 Motion Noting Date re: #4 MOTION to Add New Evidence and New Defendant Based on New Evidence; #6 MOTION to Pre-Notify Court of Forth Coming Illegal Acts; #7 MOTION to Add New Evidence of Criminal Violations and to Invoke Emergency Injunction by Court to Enforce Simple Law and #10 MOTION to File Into Public Record Notice of Nefarious Interference with Public Records Act Compliance. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sandra Aldridge, Chad Andrews, Anthony Golik, Scott Harris, Michael Johnston, Daniel Lloyd, James Mcelvain, Paul Weisser, Rotha Yong, filed by John Garrett Smith.**9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 26, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TAC015846. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED MOTION to File Into Public Record Notice of Nefarious Interference with Public Records Act Compliance filed by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR) Modified on 8/27/2019 to convert to motion (GMR).
August 21, 2019 REFERRING #9 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith to #8 Report and Recommendation to: Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **DO NOT PRINT**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith to #8 Report and Recommendation; and MOTION to Remove both RBL and DWC due to Conflict of Interest. Noting Date 9/6/2019. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Noting Date: 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED MOTION to Add New Evidence of Criminal Violations and to Invoke Emergency Injunction by Court to Enforce Simple Law, filed by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith. **27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA) Modified on 8/27/2019 to convert to motion (GMR).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED MOTION to Pre-Notify Court of Forth Coming Illegal Acts, filed by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA) Modified on 8/27/2019 to convert into a motion (GMR).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by John Garrett Smith.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED MOTION to Add New Evidence and New Defendant Based on New Evidence, filed by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith. **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA) Modified on 8/27/2019 to covert to motion (GMR).
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 7/31/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, filed by Plaintiff John Garrett Smith. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Aldridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mcelvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rotha Yong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Golik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Garrett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?