Armstead v. Haynes et al
Plaintiff: Wendell M Armstead, Jr, Casey Woodson, Justin T Dull, Peter James Carr, Jesus D Montaro, Lowell Lowe, Jason M Giles, Kailebh Hallock, Caesar Larios-Vargas, Lennie Woods, Tory Randazzo, Roger Spike-Like, Travis Ault, Jason Hillstrom, Anderson Xavier, Bobby D Colbert, Wolid Mohamned, Dustin Gilders, Channing Uchendu, Marc Larson, Paul T Makosky, Gary Noble, Paul Tita, Donald Galbert, Jeremey Bryce, Asten Flieger, Robert May, John Bell, Terrell Fox, Marco Santiago, Thomas Pleasant, Leeroy Ramirez, Jesus Montano, Kyntrel Jackson, Christian Gibson, Gerald Matier, Adam Reynolds, Ryan Ward, Tommie Slack, Scott Casimiro, Tyson J Householder, Mathew Walker, Bryan Storer, Tyler R Bashaw, David D Lewis, Cobbe Weston, Devin Gagon, Timothy Hamness, Randy Ellis, Anthony Davis, Marlon Burns, Sean Stevenson, Garrett Kirkeuold, Kasey Chapin, Luis Farias, James Lewis, Daniel Marter, Jeff Anderson, Wilford Armstead, Wendell Clark, Jose Lopez, Andy Hieb, Tylor J Sanchez, Shawn Delacuz, Alexzander J Hensey, Marshall Lewis, David Ricardez, Jeffrey Thomas, Connor Bloom, Monty Burnum, Kareem Babbs, William Ward, Lee Reedy, Brandon Jewell, Scott Cartler, Robert Wentz, Travis Engelen, Mathew L Mittelstaedt, John C Mower, Jr, Juwan M William, Eric Little, Tujuan Henry, Antyone Ojerinola, Syeve J Richardson, Daryl Rogers, Ryan Morgan, Kenneth Leuluaialii, Isaiah Summers, Tony King, Joshua Jones, Estefan Sampson, Arthur McKinnen, Henry Castillo, Jarrod L Jones, Michael Stevenson, Colt Borgeson, Steve Speakman, Bobby Mehaffey, Skyler Zimmerle, Christopher Brown, Michael Pella, Alex Acebedo Medrano, Clarence A Diaz, Michael W Tarbert, Jose Williams, David Morse, Terrell L Wilson, Jerred Johnson, Chris Braun, Jason B Tiffin, Tremayne Reed, Lewis Southard, Rogelio Rodrigues, Anthony Hauck, Kenan Adams-Kinard, Nathaniel Mosley, Michael Trevino, Stephen Reichow, Seth Lloyd, Bobby Lyons, Carlos James McDougall, Eddy Ural and Marx Coonrod
Defendant: Kendra Wakefield, Annice Mizin, Robert Herzog, Cardin, Chris Grubb, Dennis Cherry, Howard, Ronald Haynes, Scott J Russell, Julie Martin, Ron Herrington, Dennis Dahane, Matthews, Stephanie Baltzell, Jodi Wayman, Stacia Quinn, Stephen Sinclair, Teasha Bundy, Parris, James Jolly, Gina Penrose and Dan Van Ogle
Case Number: 3:2020cv05327
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Mail addressed to Jesus Montano returned as Undeliverable re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time. Per staff at SCCC, inmate released to RRE. DOC officer Rydland provided home address. Docket updated; cc mailed to plaintiff 6/5/20 for docket #4. **DO NOT PRINT**Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216(PS)
June 3, 2020 Mail addressed to David Ricardez, Gary Noble, William Ward returned as Undeliverable re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time. Per staff at SCCC, listed inmates were released to RRE. DOC provided contact and/or address information. Docket updated; notice will be mailed to listed inmates on 6/5/2020 (delay due to COVID operational modifications). **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539; Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561; Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944; Lewis Southard, Prisoner ID: 342426; Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904; Kareem Babbs, Prisoner ID: 420365; Juwan William, Prisoner ID: 401243; Jesus Montaro, Prisoner ID: 407216; Christian Gibson, Prisoner ID: 402153; Ryan Morgan, Prisoner ID: 864802; Luis Farias, Prisoner ID: 787477; William Ward, Prisoner ID: 350114; Bryan Storer, Prisoner ID: 416168; Roger Spike-Like, Prisoner ID: 309677; Travis Engelen, Prisoner ID: 376445; Justin Dull, Prisoner ID: 377090; Tyler Bashaw, Prisoner ID: 402023; Henry Castillo, Prisoner ID: 411989; Marlon Burns, Prisoner ID: 728947; Adam Reynolds, Prisoner ID: 409176; Antyone Ojerinola, Prisoner ID: 421544; Channing Uchendu, Prisoner ID: 378722; Joshua Jones, Prisoner ID: 313497; James Lewis, Prisoner ID: 917662; Lowell Lowe, Prisoner ID: 855988; Asten Flieger, Prisoner ID: 421118; Michael Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 378666; Jason Giles, Prisoner ID: 793670; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421535; Scott Cartler, Prisoner ID: 366340; Jason Tiffin, Prisoner ID: 740259; Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Wendell Clark, Prisoner ID: 416403; Dustin Gilders, Prisoner ID: 419489; Carlos McDougall, Prisoner ID: 404168; Arthur McKinnen, Prisoner ID: 809400; Devin Gagon, Prisoner ID: 413357; Lee Reedy, Prisoner ID: 406170; Andy Hieb, Prisoner ID: 407047; Tory Randazzo, Prisoner ID: 836944; Lennie Woods, Prisoner ID: 400407; Jose Williams, Prisoner ID: 412984; Jarrod Jones, Prisoner ID: 317498; Daryl Rogers, Prisoner ID: 412163; Terrell Wilson, Prisoner ID: 810623; David Lewis, Prisoner ID: 789870; Kenan Adams-Kinard, Prisoner ID: 380504; Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315; Sean Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 930936; Eric Little, Prisoner ID: 755738; Paul Makosky, Prisoner ID: 896293; Kailebh Hallock, Prisoner ID: 416067; Marco Santiago, Prisoner ID: 896177; Jose Lopez, Prisoner ID: 411726; Marx Coonrod, Prisoner ID: 839750; Gary Noble, Prisoner ID: 975705; Steve Speakman, Prisoner ID: 297346; Donald Galbert, Prisoner ID: 901522; Mathew Mittelstaedt, Prisoner ID: 791223; Tyson Householder, Prisoner ID: 883366; Timothy Hamness, Prisoner ID: 865630; Paul Tita, Prisoner ID: 400402; Thomas Pleasant, Prisoner ID: 936385; Robert Wentz, Prisoner ID: 795579; Jeremey Bryce, Prisoner ID: 402614; Garrett Kirkeuold, Prisoner ID: 318237; Ryan Ward, Prisoner ID: 359091; Travis Ault, Prisoner ID: 309017; Seth Lloyd, Prisoner ID: 892158; David Morse, Prisoner ID: 852889; Leeroy Ramirez, Prisoner ID: 401913; Bobby Mehaffey, Prisoner ID: 404251; Tremayne Reed, Prisoner ID: 829485; Tujuan Henry, Prisoner ID: 896610; Colt Borgeson, Prisoner ID: 366756; Stephen Reichow, Prisoner ID: 399068; Syeve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447; Eddy Ural, Prisoner ID: 408977; Michael Tarbert, Prisoner ID: 937380; Jeffrey Thomas, Prisoner ID: 884063; Isaiah Summers, Prisoner ID: 368847; John Mower, Prisoner ID: 856447; Casey Woodson, Prisoner ID: 249596; Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101; Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846; Kasey Chapin, Prisoner ID: 358324; Alexzander Hensey, Prisoner ID: 420890; Jerred Johnson, Prisoner ID: 368823; Marshall Lewis, Prisoner ID: 341910; Cobbe Weston, Prisoner ID: 326775; Alex Medrano, Prisoner ID: 368659; Christopher Brown, Prisoner ID: 378020; Wolid Mohamned, Prisoner ID: 366376; Daniel Marter, Prisoner ID: 336297; Connor Bloom, Prisoner ID: 421287; Monty Burnum, Prisoner ID: 979665; Robert May, Prisoner ID: 416904; Marc Larson, Prisoner ID: 858488; Clarence Diaz, Prisoner ID: 730942; Chris Braun, Prisoner ID: 378020; John Bell, Prisoner ID: 727080; Kenneth Leuluaialii, Prisoner ID: 990551; Michael Trevino, Prisoner ID: 908856; Bobby Lyons, Prisoner ID: 286193; Scott Casimiro, Prisoner ID: 400841; Jason Hillstrom, Prisoner ID: 351344; Anthony Hauck, Prisoner ID: 414864; Terrell Fox, Prisoner ID: 367610; Mathew Walker, Prisoner ID: 347489; Anderson Xavier, Prisoner ID: 367961; Michael Pella, Prisoner ID: 628359; Gerald Matier, Prisoner ID: 365904; David Ricardez, Prisoner ID: 368177; Nathaniel Mosley, Prisoner ID: 340183; Estefan Sampson, Prisoner ID: 409613; Randy Ellis, Prisoner ID: 392810; Brandon Jewell, Prisoner ID: 341160; Shawn Delacuz, Prisoner ID: 376117; Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216; Caesar Larios-Vargas, Prisoner ID: 379739; Skyler Zimmerle, Prisoner ID: 386249; Rogelio Rodrigues, Prisoner ID: 345218; Jeff Anderson, Prisoner ID: 881983)(PS)
June 3, 2020 Mail addressed to David Morse returned as Undeliverable re Docket Annotation, Mail Returned, #4 MOTION for Extension of Time. Per staff at SCCC, inmate released to Spokane COPS facility. Desk officer provided home address for Morse. Docket updated; cc to plaintiff via US Mail (* will be sent 6/5/20) **DO NOT PRINT**(Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539; Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561; Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944; Lewis Southard, Prisoner ID: 342426; Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904; Kareem Babbs, Prisoner ID: 420365; Juwan William, Prisoner ID: 401243; Jesus Montaro, Prisoner ID: 407216; Christian Gibson, Prisoner ID: 402153; Ryan Morgan, Prisoner ID: 864802; Luis Farias, Prisoner ID: 787477; William Ward, Prisoner ID: 350114; Bryan Storer, Prisoner ID: 416168; Roger Spike-Like, Prisoner ID: 309677; Travis Engelen, Prisoner ID: 376445; Justin Dull, Prisoner ID: 377090; Tyler Bashaw, Prisoner ID: 402023; Henry Castillo, Prisoner ID: 411989; Marlon Burns, Prisoner ID: 728947; Adam Reynolds, Prisoner ID: 409176; Antyone Ojerinola, Prisoner ID: 421544; Channing Uchendu, Prisoner ID: 378722; Joshua Jones, Prisoner ID: 313497; James Lewis, Prisoner ID: 917662; Lowell Lowe, Prisoner ID: 855988; Asten Flieger, Prisoner ID: 421118; Michael Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 378666; Jason Giles, Prisoner ID: 793670; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421535; Scott Cartler, Prisoner ID: 366340; Jason Tiffin, Prisoner ID: 740259; Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Wendell Clark, Prisoner ID: 416403; Dustin Gilders, Prisoner ID: 419489; Carlos McDougall, Prisoner ID: 404168; Arthur McKinnen, Prisoner ID: 809400; Devin Gagon, Prisoner ID: 413357; Lee Reedy, Prisoner ID: 406170; Andy Hieb, Prisoner ID: 407047; Tory Randazzo, Prisoner ID: 836944; Lennie Woods, Prisoner ID: 400407; Jose Williams, Prisoner ID: 412984; Jarrod Jones, Prisoner ID: 317498; Daryl Rogers, Prisoner ID: 412163; Terrell Wilson, Prisoner ID: 810623; David Lewis, Prisoner ID: 789870; Kenan Adams-Kinard, Prisoner ID: 380504; Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315; Sean Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 930936; Eric Little, Prisoner ID: 755738; Paul Makosky, Prisoner ID: 896293; Kailebh Hallock, Prisoner ID: 416067; Marco Santiago, Prisoner ID: 896177; Jose Lopez, Prisoner ID: 411726; Marx Coonrod, Prisoner ID: 839750; Gary Noble, Prisoner ID: 975705; Steve Speakman, Prisoner ID: 297346; Donald Galbert, Prisoner ID: 901522; Mathew Mittelstaedt, Prisoner ID: 791223; Tyson Householder, Prisoner ID: 883366; Timothy Hamness, Prisoner ID: 865630; Paul Tita, Prisoner ID: 400402; Thomas Pleasant, Prisoner ID: 936385; Robert Wentz, Prisoner ID: 795579; Jeremey Bryce, Prisoner ID: 402614; Garrett Kirkeuold, Prisoner ID: 318237; Ryan Ward, Prisoner ID: 359091; Travis Ault, Prisoner ID: 309017; Seth Lloyd, Prisoner ID: 892158; David Morse, Prisoner ID: 852889; Leeroy Ramirez, Prisoner ID: 401913; Bobby Mehaffey, Prisoner ID: 404251; Tremayne Reed, Prisoner ID: 829485; Tujuan Henry, Prisoner ID: 896610; Colt Borgeson, Prisoner ID: 366756; Stephen Reichow, Prisoner ID: 399068; Syeve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447; Eddy Ural, Prisoner ID: 408977; Michael Tarbert, Prisoner ID: 937380; Jeffrey Thomas, Prisoner ID: 884063; Isaiah Summers, Prisoner ID: 368847; John Mower, Prisoner ID: 856447; Casey Woodson, Prisoner ID: 249596; Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101; Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846; Kasey Chapin, Prisoner ID: 358324; Alexzander Hensey, Prisoner ID: 420890; Jerred Johnson, Prisoner ID: 368823; Marshall Lewis, Prisoner ID: 341910; Cobbe Weston, Prisoner ID: 326775; Alex Medrano, Prisoner ID: 368659; Christopher Brown, Prisoner ID: 378020; Wolid Mohamned, Prisoner ID: 366376; Daniel Marter, Prisoner ID: 336297; Connor Bloom, Prisoner ID: 421287; Monty Burnum, Prisoner ID: 979665; Robert May, Prisoner ID: 416904; Marc Larson, Prisoner ID: 858488; Clarence Diaz, Prisoner ID: 730942; Chris Braun, Prisoner ID: 378020; John Bell, Prisoner ID: 727080; Kenneth Leuluaialii, Prisoner ID: 990551; Michael Trevino, Prisoner ID: 908856; Bobby Lyons, Prisoner ID: 286193; Scott Casimiro, Prisoner ID: 400841; Jason Hillstrom, Prisoner ID: 351344; Anthony Hauck, Prisoner ID: 414864; Terrell Fox, Prisoner ID: 367610; Mathew Walker, Prisoner ID: 347489; Anderson Xavier, Prisoner ID: 367961; Michael Pella, Prisoner ID: 628359; Gerald Matier, Prisoner ID: 365904; David Ricardez, Prisoner ID: 368177; Nathaniel Mosley, Prisoner ID: 340183; Estefan Sampson, Prisoner ID: 409613; Randy Ellis, Prisoner ID: 392810; Brandon Jewell, Prisoner ID: 341160; Shawn Delacuz, Prisoner ID: 376117; Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216; Caesar Larios-Vargas, Prisoner ID: 379739; Skyler Zimmerle, Prisoner ID: 386249; Rogelio Rodrigues, Prisoner ID: 345218; Jeff Anderson, Prisoner ID: 881983)(PS)
June 3, 2020 Mail addressed to Syeve Richardson returned as Undeliverable re Docket Annotation, #4 MOTION for Extension of Time. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to WCC-Shelton. Docket updated; notice regenerated for #4 and docket annotation. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Syeve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447)(PS)
May 29, 2020 Per staff at SCCC, there is no inmate named Andy Heeb DOC#472937. Per court research via DOC site, inmate's true name is Andy Hieb, DOC#407047. Party information corrected; docket updated. Notice regenerated to facility for #4. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539; Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561; Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944; Lewis Southard, Prisoner ID: 342426; Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904; Kareem Babbs, Prisoner ID: 420365; Juwan William, Prisoner ID: 401243; Jesus Montaro, Prisoner ID: 407216; Christian Gibson, Prisoner ID: 402153; Ryan Morgan, Prisoner ID: 864802; Luis Farias, Prisoner ID: 787477; William Ward, Prisoner ID: 350114; Bryan Storer, Prisoner ID: 416168; Roger Spike-Like, Prisoner ID: 309677; Travis Engelen, Prisoner ID: 376445; Justin Dull, Prisoner ID: 377090; Tyler Bashaw, Prisoner ID: 402023; Henry Castillo, Prisoner ID: 411989; Marlon Burns, Prisoner ID: 728947; Adam Reynolds, Prisoner ID: 409176; Antyone Ojerinola, Prisoner ID: 421544; Channing Uchendu, Prisoner ID: 378722; Joshua Jones, Prisoner ID: 313497; James Lewis, Prisoner ID: 917662; Lowell Lowe, Prisoner ID: 855988; Asten Flieger, Prisoner ID: 421118; Michael Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 378666; Jason Giles, Prisoner ID: 793670; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421535; Scott Cartler, Prisoner ID: 366340; Jason Tiffin, Prisoner ID: 740259; Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Wendell Clark, Prisoner ID: 416403; Dustin Gilders, Prisoner ID: 419489; Carlos McDougall, Prisoner ID: 404168; Arthur McKinnen, Prisoner ID: 809400; Devin Gagon, Prisoner ID: 413357; Lee Reedy, Prisoner ID: 406170; Andy Hieb, Prisoner ID: 407047; Tory Randazzo, Prisoner ID: 836944; Lennie Woods, Prisoner ID: 400407; Jose Williams, Prisoner ID: 412984; Jarrod Jones, Prisoner ID: 317498; Daryl Rogers, Prisoner ID: 412163; Terrell Wilson, Prisoner ID: 810623; David Lewis, Prisoner ID: 789870; Kenan Adams-Kinard, Prisoner ID: 380504; Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315; Sean Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 930936; Eric Little, Prisoner ID: 755738; Paul Makosky, Prisoner ID: 896293; Kailebh Hallock, Prisoner ID: 416067; Marco Santiago, Prisoner ID: 896177; Jose Lopez, Prisoner ID: 411726; Marx Coonrod, Prisoner ID: 839750; Gary Noble, Prisoner ID: 975705; Steve Speakman, Prisoner ID: 297346; Donald Galbert, Prisoner ID: 901522; Mathew Mittelstaedt, Prisoner ID: 791223; Tyson Householder, Prisoner ID: 883366; Timothy Hamness, Prisoner ID: 865630; Paul Tita, Prisoner ID: 400402; Thomas Pleasant, Prisoner ID: 936385; Robert Wentz, Prisoner ID: 795579; Jeremey Bryce, Prisoner ID: 402614; Garrett Kirkeuold, Prisoner ID: 318237; Ryan Ward, Prisoner ID: 359091; Travis Ault, Prisoner ID: 309017; Seth Lloyd, Prisoner ID: 892158; David Morse, Prisoner ID: 852889; Leeroy Ramirez, Prisoner ID: 401913; Bobby Mehaffey, Prisoner ID: 404251; Tremayne Reed, Prisoner ID: 829485; Tujuan Henry, Prisoner ID: 896610; Colt Borgeson, Prisoner ID: 366756; Stephen Reichow, Prisoner ID: 399068; Syeve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447; Eddy Ural, Prisoner ID: 408977; Michael Tarbert, Prisoner ID: 937380; Jeffrey Thomas, Prisoner ID: 884063; Isaiah Summers, Prisoner ID: 368847; John Mower, Prisoner ID: 856447; Casey Woodson, Prisoner ID: 249596; Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101; Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846; Kasey Chapin, Prisoner ID: 358324; Alexzander Hensey, Prisoner ID: 420890; Jerred Johnson, Prisoner ID: 368823; Marshall Lewis, Prisoner ID: 341910; Cobbe Weston, Prisoner ID: 326775; Alex Medrano, Prisoner ID: 368659; Christopher Brown, Prisoner ID: 378020; Wolid Mohamned, Prisoner ID: 366376; Daniel Marter, Prisoner ID: 336297; Connor Bloom, Prisoner ID: 421287; Monty Burnum, Prisoner ID: 979665; Robert May, Prisoner ID: 416904; Marc Larson, Prisoner ID: 858488; Clarence Diaz, Prisoner ID: 730942; Chris Braun, Prisoner ID: 378020; John Bell, Prisoner ID: 727080; Kenneth Leuluaialii, Prisoner ID: 990551; Michael Trevino, Prisoner ID: 908856; Bobby Lyons, Prisoner ID: 286193; Scott Casimiro, Prisoner ID: 400841; Jason Hillstrom, Prisoner ID: 351344; Anthony Hauck, Prisoner ID: 414864; Terrell Fox, Prisoner ID: 367610; Mathew Walker, Prisoner ID: 347489; Anderson Xavier, Prisoner ID: 367961; Michael Pella, Prisoner ID: 628359; Gerald Matier, Prisoner ID: 365904; David Ricardez, Prisoner ID: 368177; Nathaniel Mosley, Prisoner ID: 340183; Estefan Sampson, Prisoner ID: 409613; Randy Ellis, Prisoner ID: 392810; Brandon Jewell, Prisoner ID: 341160; Shawn Delacuz, Prisoner ID: 376117; Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216; Caesar Larios-Vargas, Prisoner ID: 379739; Skyler Zimmerle, Prisoner ID: 386249; Rogelio Rodrigues, Prisoner ID: 345218; Jeff Anderson, Prisoner ID: 881983)(PS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Wendell M Armstead, Jr. Noted by clerk for 6/12/2020. **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539; Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561; Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944; Lewis Southard, Prisoner ID: 342426; Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904; Kareem Babbs, Prisoner ID: 420365; Juwan William, Prisoner ID: 401243; Jesus Montaro, Prisoner ID: 407216; Christian Gibson, Prisoner ID: 402153; Ryan Morgan, Prisoner ID: 864802; Luis Farias, Prisoner ID: 787477; William Ward, Prisoner ID: 350114; Bryan Storer, Prisoner ID: 416168; Roger Spike-Like, Prisoner ID: 309677; Travis Engelen, Prisoner ID: 376445; Justin Dull, Prisoner ID: 377090; Tyler Bashaw, Prisoner ID: 402023; Henry Castillo, Prisoner ID: 411989; Marlon Burns, Prisoner ID: 728947; Adam Reynolds, Prisoner ID: 409176; Antyone Ojerinola, Prisoner ID: 421544; Channing Uchendu, Prisoner ID: 378722; Joshua Jones, Prisoner ID: 313497; James Lewis, Prisoner ID: 917662; Lowell Lowe, Prisoner ID: 855988; Asten Flieger, Prisoner ID: 421118; Michael Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 378666; Jason Giles, Prisoner ID: 793670; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421535; Scott Cartler, Prisoner ID: 366340; Jason Tiffin, Prisoner ID: 740259; Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Wendell Clark, Prisoner ID: 416403; Dustin Gilders, Prisoner ID: 419489; Carlos McDougall, Prisoner ID: 404168; Arthur McKinnen, Prisoner ID: 809400; Devin Gagon, Prisoner ID: 413357; Lee Reedy, Prisoner ID: 406170; Andy Heeb, Prisoner ID: 472937; Tory Randazzo, Prisoner ID: 836944; Lennie Woods, Prisoner ID: 400407; Jose Williams, Prisoner ID: 412984; Jarrod Jones, Prisoner ID: 317498; Daryl Rogers, Prisoner ID: 412163; Terrell Wilson, Prisoner ID: 810623; David Lewis, Prisoner ID: 789870; Kenan Adams-Kinard, Prisoner ID: 380504; Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315; Sean Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 930936; Eric Little, Prisoner ID: 755738; Paul Makosky, Prisoner ID: 896293; Kailebh Hallock, Prisoner ID: 416067; Marco Santiago, Prisoner ID: 896177; Jose Lopez, Prisoner ID: 411726; Marx Coonrod, Prisoner ID: 839750; Gary Noble, Prisoner ID: 975705; Steve Speakman, Prisoner ID: 297346; Donald Galbert, Prisoner ID: 901522; Mathew Mittelstaedt, Prisoner ID: 791223; Tyson Householder, Prisoner ID: 883366; Timothy Hamness, Prisoner ID: 865630; Paul Tita, Prisoner ID: 400402; Thomas Pleasant, Prisoner ID: 936385; Robert Wentz, Prisoner ID: 795579; Jeremey Bryce, Prisoner ID: 402614; Garrett Kirkeuold, Prisoner ID: 318237; Ryan Ward, Prisoner ID: 359091; Travis Ault, Prisoner ID: 309017; Seth Lloyd, Prisoner ID: 892158; David Morse, Prisoner ID: 852889; Leeroy Ramirez, Prisoner ID: 401913; Bobby Mehaffey, Prisoner ID: 404251; Tremayne Reed, Prisoner ID: 829485; Tujuan Henry, Prisoner ID: 896610; Colt Borgeson, Prisoner ID: 366756; Stephen Reichow, Prisoner ID: 399068; Syeve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447; Eddy Ural, Prisoner ID: 408977; Michael Tarbert, Prisoner ID: 937380; Jeffrey Thomas, Prisoner ID: 884063; Isaiah Summers, Prisoner ID: 368847; John Mower, Prisoner ID: 856447; Casey Woodson, Prisoner ID: 249596; Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101; Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846; Kasey Chapin, Prisoner ID: 358324; Alexzander Hensey, Prisoner ID: 420890; Jerred Johnson, Prisoner ID: 368823; Marshall Lewis, Prisoner ID: 341910; Cobbe Weston, Prisoner ID: 326775; Alex Medrano, Prisoner ID: 368659; Christopher Brown, Prisoner ID: 378020; Wolid Mohamned, Prisoner ID: 366376; Daniel Marter, Prisoner ID: 336297; Connor Bloom, Prisoner ID: 421287; Monty Burnum, Prisoner ID: 979665; Robert May, Prisoner ID: 416904; Marc Larson, Prisoner ID: 858488; Clarence Diaz, Prisoner ID: 730942; Chris Braun, Prisoner ID: 378020; John Bell, Prisoner ID: 727080; Kenneth Leuluaialii, Prisoner ID: 990551; Michael Trevino, Prisoner ID: 908856; Bobby Lyons, Prisoner ID: 286193; Scott Casimiro, Prisoner ID: 400841; Jason Hillstrom, Prisoner ID: 351344; Anthony Hauck, Prisoner ID: 414864; Terrell Fox, Prisoner ID: 367610; Mathew Walker, Prisoner ID: 347489; Anderson Xavier, Prisoner ID: 367961; Michael Pella, Prisoner ID: 628359; Gerald Matier, Prisoner ID: 365904; David Ricardez, Prisoner ID: 368177; Nathaniel Mosley, Prisoner ID: 340183; Estefan Sampson, Prisoner ID: 409613; Randy Ellis, Prisoner ID: 392810; Brandon Jewell, Prisoner ID: 341160; Shawn Delacuz, Prisoner ID: 376117; Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216; Caesar Larios-Vargas, Prisoner ID: 379739; Skyler Zimmerle, Prisoner ID: 386249; Rogelio Rodrigues, Prisoner ID: 345218; Jeff Anderson, Prisoner ID: 881983) (ERA)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/Motion to Withdraw, filed by Plaintiff Tony King. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846) (ERA)
May 5, 2020 Mail addressed to GERALD MATLER, WTNI GERALD MATIER per DOC, returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate released to Community Field Office-RICHLAND. Docket updated; copy to plaintiff via US MAIL.**DO NOT PRINT**(PS)
May 5, 2020 Mail addressed to RANDY ELLIS returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC- inmate released to DOC Community Field Office-SE Seattle. Docket updated; cc to plaintiff Ellis via US Mail. **DO NOT PRINT**(PS)
April 30, 2020 Mail addressed to Kasey Chapin returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to Community Justice Center-Vancouver. Per duty officer at CJC, inmate released with no DOC obligations. No forwarding information available. **DO NOT PRINT**(PS)
April 30, 2020 Mail addressed to Antyone Ojerinola returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to Community Justice Center-Vancouver. Per duty officer at CJC, inmate released with no DOC obligations. No forwarding information available. **DO NOT PRINT**(PS)
April 30, 2020 Mail addressed to Tylor Sanchez returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to Community Field Office-Cowlitz. Per duty officer at CFO, inmate released homeless with no DOC obligations. No forwarding information available. Address removed from docket. **DO NOT PRINT**(PS)
April 30, 2020 Mail addressed to Scott Cartler returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to Community Field Office-Longview Central. Per duty officer Casey at CFO, inmate released with no DOC obligations. No forwarding information available. **DO NOT PRINT**
April 30, 2020 Mail addressed to Nathaniel Mosley returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Per staff at SCCC, inmate transferred to WCC. Docket updated; notice regenerated for #2. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**Nathaniel Mosley # 340185
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to this order on or before May 24, 2020. **8 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539; Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561; Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944; Lewis Southard, Prisoner ID: 342426; Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904; Kareem Babbs, Prisoner ID: 420365; Juwan William, Prisoner ID: 401243; Jesus Montaro, Prisoner ID: 407216; Christian Gibson, Prisoner ID: 402153; Ryan Morgan, Prisoner ID: 864802; Luis Farias, Prisoner ID: 787477; William Ward, Prisoner ID: 350114; Bryan Storer, Prisoner ID: 416168; Roger Spike-Like, Prisoner ID: 309677; Travis Engelen, Prisoner ID: 376445; Justin Dull, Prisoner ID: 377090; Tyler Bashaw, Prisoner ID: 402023; Henry Castillo, Prisoner ID: 411989; Marlon Burns, Prisoner ID: 728947; Adam Reynolds, Prisoner ID: 409176; Antyone Ojerinola, Prisoner ID: 421544; Channing Uchendu, Prisoner ID: 378722; Joshua Jones, Prisoner ID: 313497; James Lewis, Prisoner ID: 917662; Lowell Lowe, Prisoner ID: 855988; Asten Flieger, Prisoner ID: 421118; Michael Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 378666; Jason Giles, Prisoner ID: 793670; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421535; Scott Cartler, Prisoner ID: 366340; Jason Tiffin, Prisoner ID: 740259; Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Wendell Clark, Prisoner ID: 416403; Dustin Gilders, Prisoner ID: 419489; Carlos McDougall, Prisoner ID: 404168; Arthur McKinnen, Prisoner ID: 809400; Devin Gagon, Prisoner ID: 413357; Lee Reedy, Prisoner ID: 406170; Andy Heeb, Prisoner ID: 472937; Tory Randazzo, Prisoner ID: 836944; Lennie Woods, Prisoner ID: 400407; Jose Williams, Prisoner ID: 412984; Jarrod Jones, Prisoner ID: 317498; Daryl Rogers, Prisoner ID: 412163; Terrell Wilson, Prisoner ID: 810623; David Lewis, Prisoner ID: 789870; Kenan Adams-Kinard, Prisoner ID: 380504; Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315; Sean Stevenson, Prisoner ID: 930936; Eric Little, Prisoner ID: 755738; Paul Makosky, Prisoner ID: 896293; Kailebh Hallock, Prisoner ID: 416067; Marco Santiago, Prisoner ID: 896177; Jose Lopez, Prisoner ID: 411726; Marx Coonrod, Prisoner ID: 839750; Gary Noble, Prisoner ID: 975705; Steve Speakman, Prisoner ID: 297346; Donald Galbert, Prisoner ID: 901522; Mathew Mittelstaedt, Prisoner ID: 791223; Tyson Householder, Prisoner ID: 883366; Timothy Hamness, Prisoner ID: 865630; Paul Tita, Prisoner ID: 400402; Thomas Pleasant, Prisoner ID: 936385; Robert Wentz, Prisoner ID: 795579; Jeremey Bryce, Prisoner ID: 402614; Garrett Kirkeuold, Prisoner ID: 318237; Ryan Ward, Prisoner ID: 359091; Travis Ault, Prisoner ID: 309017; Seth Lloyd, Prisoner ID: 892158; David Morge, Prisoner ID: 852889; Leeroy Ramirez, Prisoner ID: 401913; Bobby Mehaffey, Prisoner ID: 404251; Tremayne Reed, Prisoner ID: 829485; Tujuan Henry, Prisoner ID: 896610; Colt Borgeson, Prisoner ID: 366756; Stephen Reichow, Prisoner ID: 399068; Steve Richardson, Prisoner ID: 719447; Eddy Ural, Prisoner ID: 408977; Michael Tarbert, Prisoner ID: 937380; Jeffrey Thomas, Prisoner ID: 884063; Isaiah Summers, Prisoner ID: 368847; John Mower, Prisoner ID: 856447; Casey Woodson, Prisoner ID: 249596; Peter Carr, Prisoner ID: 357101; Tony King, Prisoner ID: 332846; Kasey Chapin, Prisoner ID: 358324; Alexzander Hensey, Prisoner ID: 420890; Jerred Johnson, Prisoner ID: 368823; Marshall Lewis, Prisoner ID: 341910; Cobbe Weston, Prisoner ID: 326775; Alex Medrano, Prisoner ID: 368659; Christopher Brown, Prisoner ID: 378020; Wolid Mohamned, Prisoner ID: 366376; Daniel Marter, Prisoner ID: 336297; Connor Bloom, Prisoner ID: 421287; Monty Burnum, Prisoner ID: 979665; Robert May, Prisoner ID: 416904; Marc Larson, Prisoner ID: 858488; Clarence Diaz, Prisoner ID: 730942; Chris Braun, Prisoner ID: 378020; John Bell, Prisoner ID: 727080; Kenneth Leuluaialii, Prisoner ID: 990551; Michael Trevino, Prisoner ID: 908856; Bobby Lyons, Prisoner ID: 286193; Scott Casimive, Prisoner ID: 400841; Jason Strom, Prisoner ID: 351344; Anthony Hauck, Prisoner ID: 414864; Tylor Sanchez, Prisoner ID: 421935; Terrell Fox, Prisoner ID: 367610; Mathew Walker, Prisoner ID: 347489; Anderson Xavier, Prisoner ID: 367961; Michael Pella, Prisoner ID: 628359; Gerald Matier, Prisoner ID: 365904; David Ricardez, Prisoner ID: 368177; Gerald Matler, Prisoner ID: 365804; Nathaniel Mosley, Prisoner ID: 340183; Estefan Sampson, Prisoner ID: 409613; Randy Ellis, Prisoner ID: 392810; Brandon Jewell, Prisoner ID: 341160; Shawn Delacuz, Prisoner ID: 376117; Jesus Montano, Prisoner ID: 407216; Caesar Larios-Vargas, Prisoner ID: 379739; Skyler Zimmerle, Prisoner ID: 386249; Robelio Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 345218; Jeff Anderson, Prisoner ID: 881983) (ERA)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED Emergency Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Wendell M Armstead, Jr et al. (NOTE: case opened as instructed by chambers)**130 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Wendell Armstead, Prisoner ID: 867539)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead v. Haynes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annice Mizin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Baltzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Wayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacia Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teasha Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Penrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Van Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell M Armstead, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin T Dull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus D Montaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason M Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailebh Hallock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caesar Larios-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tory Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Spike-Like
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Ault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hillstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Xavier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby D Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolid Mohamned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Gilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channing Uchendu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul T Makosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Galbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremey Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asten Flieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeroy Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyntrel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Matier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Casimiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson J Householder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Storer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler R Bashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobbe Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Gagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hamness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Kirkeuold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Marter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Armstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Hieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylor J Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Delacuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexzander J Hensey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ricardez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Burnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Cartler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Engelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew L Mittelstaedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Mower, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juwan M William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tujuan Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antyone Ojerinola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syeve J Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Leuluaialii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estefan Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur McKinnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colt Borgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Speakman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Mehaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Zimmerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Acebedo Medrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence A Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Tarbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerred Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B Tiffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremayne Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenan Adams-Kinard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Reichow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos James McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Ural
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marx Coonrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?