Behrmann v. ABB Inc et al
Plaintiff: Behrmann H Ronald, Aldrich Pump LLC and Ronald H Behrmann
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc, Keenan Properties Inc, Meriden Molded Plastics Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Trane Technologies Company LLC, Carver Pump Company, JR Clarkson Company LLC, Gardner Denver Inc, Pfizer Inc, Milwaukee Valve Company LLC, American Biltrite Inc, Electrolux Home Products Inc., Ingersoll Rand Inc, Domco Products Texas Inc, Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc, Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Corporation, Johnson Control Inc, BW/IP Inc, ABB Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Inc, IMO Industries Inc, General Electric Company, Lone Star Industries Inc, Aurora Pump Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Viking Pump Inc, ViacomCBS Inc., Gould Electronics Inc, General Cable Industries Inc, York International Corporation, Flowserve US Inc, Grinnell LLC, Rockwell Automation Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Graybar Electric Company Inc, Propulsion Controls Engineering, ITT Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Crane Co, Carrier Global Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service Inc, Industrial Gasket Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc, Okonite Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Morse Tec LLC, Fryer-Knowles Inc, Spirax Sarco Inc, RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company, Eaton Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Lamons Gasket Company, Ericsson Inc, Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company, Plastics Engineering Company, ViacomCBS Inc, Nikko Materials USA Inc, ABB Inc, Duriron Castings Company, Johnson Controls Inc, Electric Controller and Manufacturing Company LLC, Westinghouse Electric Supply Co, Plenco, General Electric Company individually and doing business as General Electric Supply Corporation/GESCO, Azrock Industries Inc, CBS Corporation, Uvalde Rock Asphalt Company, Square D Company, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Gould Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, General Cable Corporation and Domco Inc and Floor Products (Texas)
Case Number: 3:2020cv05685
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint; by Lone Star Industries Inc.(Paal, Zackary)
October 13, 2020 Filing 154 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant General Cable Industries Inc.(Odom, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 153 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company.(Odom, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 152 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant American Biltrite Inc.(Odom, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 151 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant ABB Inc.(Odom, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 150 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Carrier Global Corporation.(Uhle, Megan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 149 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.(Alkhazov, Marissa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 148 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc.(Uhle, Megan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 147 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.(MacKenzie, Nicole)
October 13, 2020 Filing 146 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Morse Tec LLC.(Madderra, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint; Amended Complaint by Blackmer Pump Company.(Clonts, Kevin)
September 18, 2020 Unable to process Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice dkt #135 . Per emailed instructions, PHV Attorney Peter K Renstrom needs to login to PACER.gov and request E-filing with WAWD Court. (CDA)ad hoc Attorney Renstrom
September 14, 2020 Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint; by Industrial Gasket Inc.(Eraut, Allen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 143 ANSWER to Complaint; & Affirmative Defenses by IMO Industries Inc.(Ricketts, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael Edward Ricketts. Filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Ricketts, Michael)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, JR Clarkson Company LLC (as successor to Keystone International) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/2/2020. Modified 9/1/2020 Dkt #30 - CDS filed for different JR Clarkson Defendant. This deadline remains set. (KMC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John G Goller on behalf of Defendant JR Clarkson Company LLC. (Goller, John)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re #127 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John L. Steffan for plaintiff Ronald H Behrmann, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re #137 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert Charles Creighton for American Biltrite Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re #136 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gavin David Whitis for Viking Pump Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 137 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert Creighton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant American Biltrite Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6534277 (Nolet, Angie)
August 14, 2020 Filing 136 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gavin D. Whitis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Viking Pump Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6533053 (Thacker, Todd)
August 14, 2020 Filing 135 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter K. Renstrom FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Viking Pump Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6532939 (Thacker, Todd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 134 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Viking Pump Inc.(Thacker, Todd)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *THIRTY DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 7/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 9/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/13/2021, Motions due by 2/22/2021, Discovery completed by 3/15/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/13/2021, Motions in Limine due by 6/14/2021, Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/2/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/2/2021. s/Tyler Campbell, authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 132 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Industrial Gasket Inc (Eraut, Allen)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 130 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Bryan- Dep Clerk: Tyler Campbell; Pla Counsel: Alice Emerson; Def Counsel: Mark Tuvim, Melissa Roeder et al.; Time of Hearing: 9:00; Telephone Conference regarding discovery held on 8/10/2020. Minute order to be issued. (TC)
August 7, 2020 Filing 129 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 20-30 days. (Tuvim, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Hanson, Lorianne)
August 6, 2020 Filing 127 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Steffan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Ronald H Behrmann (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6514953 (Weinstein, Brian)
August 6, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Please use the following information: Phone number 877-411-9748, Access code 3588188. (TC)
August 4, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Johnson, Malika)
August 3, 2020 Filing 124 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates KKR & Co Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll Rand Inc (Morgan, Shaun) Modified on 8/4/2020 (GMR).
August 3, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy and Stay of Proceedings by Defendant Trane Technologies Company LLC. (Tuvim, Mark)
August 3, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy and Stay of Proceedings by Defendant Aldrich Pump LLC. (Tuvim, Mark)
August 3, 2020 Attorney Rachel A Rubin added for Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a Duriron Castings Company, per #117 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
August 3, 2020 Attorney Claude Bosworth added for Defendant Blackmer Pump Company, per #118 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Industrial Gasket Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/10/2020. (GMR)
July 31, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Industrial Gasket Inc. (Eraut, Allen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 120 ANSWER to Complaint; Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Morgan, Shaun)
July 31, 2020 Filing 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company; and Other Affiliate Dover Pumps & Process Solutions Segment Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Blackmer Pump Company (Clonts, Kevin) Modified on 8/3/2020 (GMR).
July 31, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin Clonts on behalf of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Clonts, Kevin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 30, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: re #1 Notice of Removal - co-counsel Kelly Battley not admitted to practice in WAWD. ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #63 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ryan Wheeler for FMC Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 30, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company. (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant General Cable Industries Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant American Biltrite Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant ABB Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2020 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Viking Pump, Inc., is a non-governmental corporate entity, and is a wholly owned subsidiary of IDEX Corporation for Viking Pump Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Viking Pump Inc (Thacker, Todd) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 30, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd M. Thacker on behalf of Defendant Viking Pump Inc. (Thacker, Todd)
July 30, 2020 Attorney Howard (Terry) I. Hall added for Defendant Lone Star Industries Inc per #98 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 Attorneys Mark B Tuvim, Kevin J Craig, and Trevor J. Mohr added for Defendant for Aldrich Pump LLC per 6/10/2020 Notice of Appearance in #107 State Court Record.(GMR)
July 30, 2020 Attorneys Rachel Tallon Reynolds and Randy J Aliment added for Defendant Flowserve US Inc as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co per #87 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Ingersoll Rand Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/6/2020. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: Christine E. Dinsdale and Rachel A Rubin, co-signers of the #89 Corporate Disclosure Statement, have not properly entered an appearance before the Court as counsel on behalf of defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a/ The Duriron Company Inc. If it is your intention to represent defendant, a Notice of Appearance is required. Thank you. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 Attorneys Rachel Tallon Reynolds and Randy J Aliment added for Defendant Flowserve US Inc as successor to Edward Valve & Manufacturing Company per #85 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Aldrich Pump LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/6/2020. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 Attorneys Mark B Tuvim, Kevin J Craig, and Trevor J. Mohr added for Defendant for Trane Technologies Company LLC per 6/10/2020 Notice of Appearance in #107 State Court Record. (GMR)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Trane Technologies Company LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/6/2020. (GMR)
July 29, 2020 Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Meriden Molded Plastics Inc (Tuvim, Mark)
July 29, 2020 Filing 107 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Craig, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE TO FILER of Filing Deficiency: re #55 Answer to Complaint by Ericsson Inc - improper signature for Elizabeth R. Bain. ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR)
July 28, 2020 Filing 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Propulsion Controls Engineering (Shaw, G)
July 28, 2020 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent NIBCO, Inc. for Milwaukee Valve Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Milwaukee Valve Company LLC (Tuvim, Mark)
July 28, 2020 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint; Eaton Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries by Eaton Corporation.(Hicks, James)
July 28, 2020 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint; by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Roeder, Melissa)
July 28, 2020 Attorney Rachel A Rubin added for defendant BW/IP Inc per #14 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rockwell Automation Inc (Roeder, Melissa)
July 27, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa K Roeder on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc. (Roeder, Melissa)
July 27, 2020 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates RC Lonestar Inc, Dyckerhoff GmbH, Buzzi Unicem International Sarl and Buzzi Unicem S.p.A . Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lone Star Industries Inc (Paal, Zackary) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 27, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zackary A Paal on behalf of Defendant Lone Star Industries Inc. (Paal, Zackary)
July 27, 2020 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plastics Engineering Company (Paal, Zackary)
July 27, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zackary A Paal on behalf of Defendant Plastics Engineering Company. (Paal, Zackary)
July 27, 2020 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DJO Services, LLC for Fraser's Boiler Service Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fraser's Boiler Service Inc (Daywitt, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason H Daywitt on behalf of Defendant Fraser's Boiler Service Inc. (Daywitt, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc., Other Affiliate KKR & Co. Inc. for Gardner Denver Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gardner Denver Inc (Morgan, Shaun)
July 27, 2020 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Okonite Company (Basauri, Taryn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Okonite Company. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve Corporation (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 27, 2020 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc(solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co) (Basauri, Taryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 27, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc(solely as successor to Edward Valves Inc) (Basauri, Taryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 27, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prysmian S.p.A. for General Cable Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Cable Industries Inc (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Biltrite Inc (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ABB Inc (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve Corporation (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 24, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 24, 2020 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by FMC Corporation (Scharer, Karleen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Finance Inc. for Domco Products Texas Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Domco Products Texas Inc (Scharer, Karleen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Honeywell International Inc (Fraser, Erin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin P Fraser on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Fraser, Erin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates General Signal Corporation, SPX Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Madderra, Brittany) Modified on 7/28/2020 (GMR).
July 24, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brittany A. Madderra on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Madderra, Brittany)
July 24, 2020 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc (Gawlowski, Richard)
July 23, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation. (Scharer, Karleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates IMO Industries Inc and Colfax Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Clonts, Kevin) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 23, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin Clonts on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Clonts, Kevin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll Rand Inc. (Morgan, Shaun)
July 23, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Gardner Denver Inc. (Morgan, Shaun)
July 23, 2020 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc., Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Reynolds, Rachel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JX Holdings, Inc and JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation for Gould Electronics Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gould Electronics Inc (Morgan, Shaun) Modified on 7/29/2020 (GMR).
July 23, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Gould Electronics Inc. (Morgan, Shaun)
July 23, 2020 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 23, 2020 Filing 63 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ryan C. Wheeler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant FMC Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6483280 (Scharer, Karleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint; by Union Carbide Corporation.(Reynolds, Rachel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Reynolds, Rachel)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tina Marie Schaefer for Defendant RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 22, 2020 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Keenan Properties Inc (Smith, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James E Berger for RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling, LLC for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Ricketts, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents AB Industrivrden, Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson and Investor AB for Ericsson Inc. Identifying Other Affiliates Travelers - SLG Ericsson, Inc Risk Management, Brandywine Group of Insurance and Reinsurance Companies, and Resolute Management Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ericsson Inc (MacKenzie, Nicole) Modified on 7/29/2020 to add other interested parties listed within document (GMR).
July 22, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Ericsson Inc.(MacKenzie, Nicole)
July 22, 2020 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Graybar Electric Company Inc (Daywitt, Jason)
July 22, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason H Daywitt on behalf of Defendant Graybar Electric Company Inc. (Daywitt, Jason)
July 22, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carver Pump Company (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 22, 2020 Filing 51 DISREGARD- REFILED AS #64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark) Modified on 7/30/2020 (GMR).
July 22, 2020 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Crown Holdings Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc (Johnson, Malika)
July 22, 2020 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ViacomCBS Inc (Marks, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Marks, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Marks, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fryer-Knowles Inc (Marks, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Global Corporation (Uhle, Megan) Modified on 7/28/2020 to add other affiliate information (GMR).
July 22, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Carrier Global Corporation.(Uhle, Megan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer Inc (Alkhazov, Marissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint; by Pfizer Inc.(Alkhazov, Marissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Edward Ricketts on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Ricketts, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom company for Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc (Kopij, Dana)
July 22, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
July 22, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TriMas Company LLC, Other Affiliate TriMas Corporation for Lamons Gasket Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lamons Gasket Company (Johnson, Malika)
July 22, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trevor J. Mohr on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Mohr, Trevor)
July 22, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International PLC for Grinnell LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Grinnell LLC (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent Occidental Chamical Holding Corp., Corporate Parent OXY USA, Inc. for Occidental Chemical Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by York International Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Johnson Controls Inc (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co, Corporate Parent Flow Control US Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Emerson Final Control US Holding for JR Clarkson Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JR Clarkson Company LLC(individually and as successor to) (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ITT, Inc. for ITT Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ITT Corporation(individually and as) (Gardner, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc (Craig, Kevin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ITT, Inc. for Goulds Pumps Incorporated. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Goulds Pumps Incorporated (Gardner, Ronald)
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Eaton Corporation (Hicks, James)
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE for Schneider Electric USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc (Lyon, Wendy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tina Schaefer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6478258 (Tondini, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James Berger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6478157 (Tondini, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds American, Inc., Corporate Parent R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c. for RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company (Tondini, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Group Limited, Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC for Morse Tec LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Morse Tec LLC (Madderra, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BW/IP Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Electrolux Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc. (Marks, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, Ltd., Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc for Spirax Sarco Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Spirax Sarco Inc (Marks, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint; First Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Marks, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint; First Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Electrolux Home Products Inc..(Marks, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant BW/IP Inc. (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/5/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 21, 2020 JSR due 10/19/2020. (JL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Lyon, Wendy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Craig, Kevin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorneys Phillip A. Chu and Alice Emerson Brian Weinstein on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald H Behrmann. (Weinstein, Brian) Modified on 7/24/2020 (SP).
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Lamons Gasket Company.(Johnson, Malika)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/27/2020. (SP)
July 20, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (SP)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Exhibit A to Notice of Joinder in Removal re #4 Notice-Other by Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company LLC (Tuvim, Mark)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Joinder in Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company LLC. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint; by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.(Craig, Kevin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-06217-6; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6466212), filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Jury Demand)(Tuvim, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behrmann v. ABB Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan Properties Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meriden Molded Plastics Inc
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Technologies Company LLC
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Clarkson Company LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Represented By: John G Goller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: John Krawczyk
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R. Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company LLC
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Represented By: Robert Charles Creighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Inc
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas Inc
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Kevin Clonts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Control Inc
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Represented By: Todd M. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics Inc
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable Industries Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Inc
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Represented By: Barry N. Mesher
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company Inc
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propulsion Controls Engineering
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Kevin Clonts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Michael J Madderra
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Gasket Inc
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Company
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Ryan Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Michael J Madderra
Represented By: Jennifer Gannon Crisera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: James E Berger
Represented By: Tina Marie Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Kristine E Kruger
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikko Materials USA Inc
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duriron Castings Company
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Controller and Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Supply Co
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plenco
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company individually and doing business as General Electric Supply Corporation/GESCO
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azrock Industries Inc
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uvalde Rock Asphalt Company
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Inc
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Angie R. Nolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Inc and Floor Products (Texas)
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behrmann H Ronald
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Meredith B Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldrich Pump LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald H Behrmann
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Meredith B Good
Represented By: John L. Steffan
Represented By: Phillip Alexander Chu
Represented By: Alice E Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?