Freeman v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: David L. Freeman and David L Freeman
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Michael A. Freeman, Kelly M. Freeman, Michael A Freeman and Kelly M Freeman
Case Number: 3:2020cv05716
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kelly M Freeman, Michael A Freeman.(Haas, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Edward Haas on behalf of Defendants Kelly M Freeman, Michael A Freeman. (Haas, Michael)
July 24, 2020 JSR deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/21/2020, (TW)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/14/2020, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kelly M Freeman, Michael A Freeman (main document). (Attachments: #1 Summons - K Freeman) (ERA)
July 22, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff David L. Freeman. (Soli, Sandip)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6478748) Attorney Sandip Soli added to party David L. Freeman(pty:pla), filed by David L. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael A. Freeman, #3 Summons Kelly M. Freeman)(Soli, Sandip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Freeman
Represented By: Michael Edward Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M Freeman
Represented By: Michael Edward Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Freeman
Represented By: Sandip Soli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Freeman
Represented By: Sandip Soli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?