Hegge et al v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Ziegler, Sergio Peralta, Alvin L Hegge, William J Ritchie, Brian Champaco, Christopher Bowman, Joseph Moore, Christopher Shade, Andrew Skyberg, Eugene B Garvie, Robert John Thiery, Jr, Ryan Gentzler, Pat Nelson, Josh Hegre, Thomas Gilbert, Jacob Clark, Steven Burr, Darrin Maiden, Randy Demaray and Eugene Brian Garvie
Defendant: Erin Lystad, Richard Estes, William Lane, Robert Herzog, John Doe, CS James Jolly, Sgt Todd Coleman, Kelly Downing, Dennis Cherry, Anica Mizin, Scott Russell, Margaret Gilbert, John Aldana, Howard Yardely, Steven Sinclair, John Thompson, Daniel Van Ogle, Dennis Dahne, Jay Inslee, Grays Harbor County Health Department, Jason Couey, Ron Haynes, Tyler Campbell, Valintina Lopez, David Partovi, Donald Miller, Richard Morgan, Tim Thrasher, Doug Matthews, Sgt Richard Roberts, Barry DeHaven, Jeneva Cotton, Pam Purdue, Kerri McTarsney, Randal Miekler, Robert Ferguson, Carlos Lugo, Dennise Brewer, Arlee Rothwell, Correctional Industries, R Herrington, Gregory Jones, Eschbach, Chandler Martin, Richard Creatura, Tomas P Fithian, Dale Caldwell and Todd Coleman
Case Number: 3:2020cv06170
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jeffrey Ziegler. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibits 1-8, #3 Exhibits 9-16, #4 Exhibits 17-19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Prison Trust Account, #7 Request to Waive Filing Fee)**372 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970) (ST)
January 6, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected as to Plaintiff Jeffrey Ziegler only. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970) (ST)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Steven Burr. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibits 1-8, #3 Exhibits 9-16, #4 Exhibits 17-19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Prison Trust Account)**370 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934) ST
January 4, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected as to Plaintiff Steven Burr only. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**( Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934 (ST)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISREGARD STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. **DO NOT PRINT**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740596; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: 348942; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: 740940; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: 343434; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(GC) Modified on 12/22/2020 (GC)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Mail addressed to Christopher Bowman returned as Undeliverable re #7 IFP Deficiency Letter. Per staff at SCCC-Stafford, inmate Bowman transferred to DOC Tri-Cities Annex. Docket updated; copy to plaintiff via US mail **DO NOT PRINT**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740596; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: 348942; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: 740940; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: 343434; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(PS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER (2nd) sent re IFP deficiency as to Plaintiff Robert Thiery only: - Signature is missing from the Proposed Complaint. Please sign as appropriate and return for filing. Plaintiff has until 1/6/2021 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828)(GMR)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency to all Plaintiffs: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $402.00 filing fee or a completed application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status for each plaintiff. Filer(s) has until 1/6/2021 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740596; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: 348942; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: 740940; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: 343434; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(GMR- cc: J. Clark)
December 7, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740596; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: 348942; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: 740940; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: 343434; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(GMR- cc: J. Clark)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Mail addressed to Brian Champaco, Jacob Clark returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order. Per staff at SCCC-Stafford, inmate Champaco is currently housed at AHCC-Airway; inmate Clark is housed at CCCC-Cedar Creek. Docket updated; notice regenerated to Champaco. CC to Clark via US Mail. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891034; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740597; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: ; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: ; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: ; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(PS)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 Mail addressed to Robert Thiery returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order. Per staff at SCCC, inmate is currently housed at MCC-Reformatory unit. Docket updated; notice regenerated for #3**2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891034; William Ritchie, Prisoner ID: 709299; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740597; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: ; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: ; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: ; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058)(PS)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern, Case Number 2:20-cv-00425.
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER TO WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. This file is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Alvin Hegge, Prisoner ID: 952368; Jeffrey Ziegler, Prisoner ID: 886970; Ryan Gentzler, Prisoner ID: 315617; Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014; Josh Hegre, Prisoner ID: 372229; Steven Burr, Prisoner ID: 891934; Sergio Peralta, Prisoner ID: 899693; Pat Nelson, Prisoner ID: 740596; Jacob Clark, Prisoner ID: 348942; Thomas Gilbert, Prisoner ID: 626436; Darrin Maiden, Prisoner ID: 829585; Joseph Moore, Prisoner ID: 740940; Randy Demaray, Prisoner ID: 767495; Brian Champaco, Prisoner ID: 846849; Christopher Shade, Prisoner ID: 391594; Robert Thiery, Prisoner ID: 704828; Christopher Bowman, Prisoner ID: 343434; Andrew Skyberg, Prisoner ID: 798058) [Transferred from waed on 12/1/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (CLP, Case Administrator) **5 PAGES, PRINT ALL** [Transferred from waed on 12/1/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants and Request for Class Certification Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(c) (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted - attached letter states a filing fee will be paid upon receipt of a case number). Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Attachement 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4)(CLP, Case Administrator) **368 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** Modified on 11/19/2020 to change page numbers received to 368 (CLP, Case Administrator). [Transferred from waed on 12/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegge et al v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Lystad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS James Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anica Mizin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Yardely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Van Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dahne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grays Harbor County Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Couey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valintina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Partovi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Richard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry DeHaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeneva Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri McTarsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Miekler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennise Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlee Rothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eschbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Creatura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas P Fithian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin L Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Champaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Shade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Skyberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene B Garvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert John Thiery, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gentzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Hegre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Maiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Demaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Brian Garvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?