Parkwell v. Pines et al
Plaintiff: Tom Parkwell
Defendant: Michael T Pines and James Howard
Case Number: 3:2021cv05233
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 CONFORMED COPY RECEIVED re #16 Remand Letter to Clallam County Superior Court. (GMR)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF USCA (21-71023): Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. (GMR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT Writ of Mandate or Prohibition by Defendant Michael T Pines (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pines, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE FROM 9TH CIRCUIT (21-71023): A petition for writ of mandamus and/or prohibition has been received in the Clerk's Office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (GMR)
April 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Disqualify , filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in support of motion to disqualify) Noting Date 4/26/2021, (Pines, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER to Clallam County Superior Court Remanding Case back per #11 Order. (KMC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion For Earlier Remand and denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (KMC)
April 11, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Defendant Michael T Pines, to #12 MOTION to Remand Shorten Time. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Pines, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Noting Date reset correctly by clerk to 4/7/2021 re #13 Motion for Reconsideration re #11 Order to Remand Case. (KMC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order to Remand Case, , filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. Noting Date 4/7/2021 4/8/2021 (Pines, Michael) Modified on 4/8/2021 to correct noting date. (KMC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Shorten Time, filed by Plaintiff Tom Parkwell. Noting Date 4/7/2021, (Wolfley, Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Clallam County Superior Court and DENYING #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as MOOT, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 4/21/2021. (KMC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 Supplemental DECLARATION in Support of the #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. Noting Date 4/6/2021 (Pines, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2021 to update docket text per attached document. (KMC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Defendant Michael T Pines. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint to be filed in bankruptcy court in San Diego)(Pines, Michael)
April 7, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification to correct docket text per attached document re #10 Supplemental DECLARATION in Support of the #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. Noting Date 4/6/2021. (KMC)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/6/2021, (Pines, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER re #6 Praecipe for a Summons. Summons(es) as submitted do not comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(b) and cannot be issued. Please see attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC) Modified on 4/6/2021 to edit docket text and indicate this is as a courtesy notice to filer, not a case deficiency. (KMC)
April 6, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Notice to Filer: docket text modified to indicate notice and letter to Defendant Michael T Pines re #6 Praecipe to Issue Summons is a courtesy notice, not a case deficiency. (KMC)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Defendant Michael T Pines (Pines, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE: Defendant Michael T Pines has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal - signature on Defendant's Notice of Removal is improper. ***Action Required*** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Corrected signature page must be filed by 4/16/2021. (KMC - cc: mailed copy of signature page to defendant Michael T Pines)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clallam County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KMC)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Michael T Pines. (KMC)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clallam County Superior Court, case number 21-00002-00173-05; (Receipt # TAC016627), filed by Michael T Pines. (Attachments: #1 Operative Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Proposed Adversary Complaint, #5 Transmittal Email)(KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkwell v. Pines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Pines
Represented By: Michael T Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Parkwell
Represented By: Joseph B Wolfley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?