Pilz et al v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Pilz, Brenda Contine, Juan Lopez, Aaron Keller, Adam Bogle, Alex Carbajal, Alex Murillo, Amber Roskamp, Anna Trawczynski, Benjamin Swenson, Blaine Schiess, Brian Paterik, Candace Kennedy, Cathy Beckner, Daniel Little, David Dahlin, David Lawton, David Taylor, David Walters, Dawn Andersen, Garrett Raulson, Gwendolyn Auman, Haleigh See, Heather Swensen, Heriberto Mendoza, Holly Verner, Jaime Kellogg, James Palmer, Jeffrey Cowgill, Jeni Venables, Jennifer Barnes, Jennifer Templeton, Jennifer Zehrung, Jesse Gorham, Jodie Dewey, Joe DeGroat, Jonah Kuhn, Josephine Swenson, Josh Gibbs, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Kara Coalman, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Katherine Galanga, Kathleen Pokorny, Kayla Berg, Kimberly Scott, Kris Waidley, Kylee Ballensky, LaDonna Hebert, Laura Coleman, Lesiya Drozdov, Lori Auckland, Lori Smith, Lynnette Mathias, Marsa Lasky, Matthew Reinke, Melissa Steele, Michael Faulk, Michael Hamilton, Michael Johnson, Michael Uribe, Misty Cox, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Nicholas Auckland, Nicholas Blackburn, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Niza Puckett, Pamela Coffell, Ronald Kessler, Rosemarie Becker, Ryan Hogan, Sandra Dolan, Sandra Olerich, Scott Fleming, Scott Millenbach, Shannon Ayers, Sheila Hollingsworth, Tammy Kennedy, Tera Green, Teresa Fox, Thomas Corrin, Thomas DeLong, Tiffany Brown, Timothy Henning, Todd Humphreys, Travis Eilertson, Tyler Corrin, Tyler Ratkie, Tyler Tuerschmann, Wade Faircloth, Warren Scotter, Wayne Johnson, William Cleary, Zana Carver, Jamal George, Brad Otto, Venus Bailey, Stephanie Adams, Garrett Raulston, Marsha Lasky and Branon Snyder
Defendant: Jay Inslee, John Batiste, Cheryl Strange, Roger Millar, Derek Sandison, Ross Hunter, Umair A Shah and Joel Sacks
Case Number: 3:2021cv05735
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung, to #61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Oral Argument Requested. (Arnold, Nathan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Jeannie Miller filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Jones, Zachary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Mindy Kornberg filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Zachary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 64 Second DECLARATION of Cheryl Sullivan-Colglazier filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Zachary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 63 RESPONSE, by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Zachary)
November 18, 2021 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Zachary Pekelis Jones In Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Zachary)
November 18, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Zachary)
November 17, 2021 Filing 60 Supplemental DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arnold, Nathan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 59 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Arnold, Nathan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
November 12, 2021 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #56 Report Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Granting Briefing Schedule (Hughes, Andrew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 56 REPORT Joint Status by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange (Hughes, Andrew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and for Damages by John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange.(Hughes, Andrew)
October 17, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/15/2021 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022, (ND)
October 15, 2021 Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein- Dep Clerk: Grant Cogswell; Pla Counsel: Nathan J Arnold; Def Counsel: Zachary Pekelis Jones; CR: Nickie Drury; Time of Hearing: 9:00AM; TRO Hearing Via ZoomGov held on 10/15/2021. The Court hears oral argument on the Motion for TRO, each side is given 30 minutes. The Court makes an oral ruling. For reasons stated on the record, the MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Dkt. #2 is DENIED by the Court. The parties are to meet and confer and submit a joint status report within 21 days of this hearing. (GC)
October 15, 2021 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks for proceedings held on 10/15/2021. Requesting Attorney: Andrew R. W. Hughes.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Nickoline Drury (nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Valerie Santos filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Rumina Killeen filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Dr. Robert Malone, MD, MS filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Matthew Lovelass filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Loretta Dian Taylor filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Dr. Wei-hsung Lin filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Dr. Peter McCullough filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Dr. David D. Luxton filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Dr. Michael Jackson filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Jennifer D. Barnes filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arnold, Nathan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Cheryl Sullivan-Colglazier filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Jeff Pelton filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Heather Normoyle filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Brad McGarvie filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Lorna Mance filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Frank Longano, M.D. filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Andrew Hughes filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Solomon Gilbert Jr. filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Erin Eychaner filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Todd Dowler filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Captain Jason Ashley filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Dr. Christopher J. L. Murray filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Dr. Scott W. Lindquist filed by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Andrew)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Order: This case has been transferred to the undersigned, and the Court and the parties have agreed to an accelerated briefing schedule. The current scheduling order (Dkt. No. 16 ) is modified as follows: Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order by 10/14/2021, at 12pm PST and any supporting declarations by 5pm PST. Defendants' response shall be no more than 30 pages long. Plaintiffs may file additional materials supporting their motion by the end of the day on 10/14/2021. Any materials Plaintiffs submit must be contained in a single filing. An oral argument will be held at 9am PST on 10/15/2021, by Zoom. The oral argument will serve as an opportunity for Plaintiffs to reply to Defendants' opposition, and thus a written reply by Plaintiffs will not be necessary. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Judge Benjamin H. Settle is recused from this case and is no longer assigned. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 8, 2021 Filing 24 Supplemental DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsha Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulston, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Branon Snyder, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kai A Smith on behalf of Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange. (Smith, Kai)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zachary Pekelis Jones on behalf of Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange. (Jones, Zachary)
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew R. W. Hughes on behalf of Defendants John Batiste, Ross Hunter, Jay Inslee, Roger Millar, Joel Sacks, Derek Sandison, Umair A Shah, Cheryl Strange. (Hughes, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jaycee Evinger filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsa Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulson, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Tyler Corrin filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsa Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulson, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 ERRATA re #3 Declaration by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsa Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulson, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Taylor Schrodt filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Adams, Dawn Andersen, Lori Auckland, Nicholas Auckland, Gwendolyn Auman, Shannon Ayers, Venus Bailey, Kylee Ballensky, Jennifer Barnes, Rosemarie Becker, Cathy Beckner, Kayla Berg, Kamaldeep Bhachu, Nicholas Blackburn, Adam Bogle, Tiffany Brown, Alex Carbajal, Judy Carpenter-Ross, Zana Carver, William Cleary, Kara Coalman, Pamela Coffell, Laura Coleman, Brenda Contine, Thomas Corrin, Tyler Corrin, Jeffrey Cowgill, Misty Cox, David Dahlin, Joe DeGroat, Thomas DeLong, Jodie Dewey, Kari Lynn Dohrman, Sandra Dolan, Lesiya Drozdov, Travis Eilertson, Wade Faircloth, Michael Faulk, Scott Fleming, Teresa Fox, Katherine Galanga, Jamal George, Josh Gibbs, Jesse Gorham, Tera Green, Michael Hamilton, LaDonna Hebert, Timothy Henning, Ryan Hogan, Sheila Hollingsworth, Todd Humphreys, Michael Johnson, Wayne Johnson, Aaron Keller, Jaime Kellogg, Candace Kennedy, Tammy Kennedy, Ronald Kessler, Nicole Kinread-Sinclair, Jonah Kuhn, Marsa Lasky, David Lawton, Daniel Little, Juan Lopez, Lynnette Mathias, Heriberto Mendoza, Scott Millenbach, Alex Murillo, Sandra Olerich, Brad Otto, James Palmer, Brian Paterik, Zachary Pilz, Kathleen Pokorny, Niza Puckett, Tyler Ratkie, Garrett Raulson, Matthew Reinke, Amber Roskamp, Blaine Schiess, Kimberly Scott, Warren Scotter, Haleigh See, Lori Smith, Melissa Steele, Heather Swensen, Benjamin Swenson, Josephine Swenson, David Taylor, Jennifer Templeton, Anna Trawczynski, Tyler Tuerschmann, Michael Uribe, Jeni Venables, Holly Verner, Kris Waidley, David Walters, Monty Lee Whiteaker, Jennifer Zehrung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Friday 10/15/2021. Plaintiffs Shall file a Reply by Tuesday 10/19/2021. The Clerk will advise of the parties of any oral argument after that date. IT IS SO ORDERED. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (AMD)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jessie Howard filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Zana Carver filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Venus Bailey filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Juan Lopez filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jamal George filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of William Cleary filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Michael Faulk filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jennifer Templeton filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sheila Hollingsworth filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Blaine Schiess filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kara Coalman filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Teresa Fox filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs BRENDA CONTINE, JUAN LOPEZ, ZACHARY PILZ. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2021, (Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7277377) Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party BRENDA CONTINE(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party JUAN LOPEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party ZACHARY PILZ(pty:pla), filed by JUAN LOPEZ, BRENDA CONTINE, ZACHARY PILZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arnold, Nathan)
October 5, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilz et al v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Pilz
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Contine
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lopez
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Keller
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bogle
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Carbajal
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Murillo
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Roskamp
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Trawczynski
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Swenson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine Schiess
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Paterik
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Kennedy
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Beckner
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Little
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dahlin
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lawton
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Taylor
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walters
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Andersen
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Raulson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Auman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haleigh See
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Swensen
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Mendoza
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Verner
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Kellogg
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Palmer
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cowgill
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeni Venables
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barnes
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Templeton
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zehrung
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Gorham
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Dewey
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe DeGroat
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Kuhn
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Swenson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Gibbs
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Carpenter-Ross
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamaldeep Bhachu
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Coalman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Lynn Dohrman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Galanga
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Pokorny
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Berg
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Scott
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Waidley
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylee Ballensky
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna Hebert
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Coleman
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesiya Drozdov
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Auckland
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Smith
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Mathias
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsa Lasky
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Reinke
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Steele
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Faulk
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Uribe
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Cox
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Lee Whiteaker
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Auckland
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Blackburn
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kinread-Sinclair
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niza Puckett
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Coffell
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Kessler
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Becker
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hogan
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dolan
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Olerich
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Fleming
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Millenbach
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Ayers
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hollingsworth
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Kennedy
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tera Green
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Fox
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Corrin
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas DeLong
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Brown
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Henning
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Humphreys
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Eilertson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Corrin
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Ratkie
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Tuerschmann
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Faircloth
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Scotter
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cleary
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zana Carver
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal George
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Otto
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venus Bailey
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Adams
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Raulston
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Lasky
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branon Snyder
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Batiste
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Millar
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Sandison
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Hunter
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umair A Shah
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Sacks
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Kai A Smith
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?