Stevens v. Pierce County et al
Plaintiff: Randall Stevens
Defendant: Pierce County, Colby Edwards, Greggory Marty, Brent Tulloch and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv05862
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristal M Cowger on behalf of Defendants Colby Edwards, Greggory Marty, Pierce County, Brent Tulloch. (Cowger, Kristal)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Greggory Marty mailed on 11/28/2022 (Loynd, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brent Tulloch mailed on 11/28/2022 (Loynd, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Colby Edwards mailed on 11/28/2022 (Loynd, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Pierce County mailed on 11/28/2022 (Loynd, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer D Loynd on behalf of Defendants Colby Edwards, Greggory Marty, Pierce County, Brent Tulloch. (Loynd, Jennifer)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2023, Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2023. (MET)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1-10, Colby Edwards, Greggory Marty, Pierce County, Brent Tulloch with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Randall Stevens.(MW)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge David W. Christel.(MW)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MW)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRING #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge David W. Christel (MW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Randall Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Millikan, Jackson) (Attachment 2 replaced due to malformed pdf on 11/9/2022) (MW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Pierce County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Stevens
Represented By: Jackson E Millikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Jennifer D Loynd
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Edwards
Represented By: Jennifer D Loynd
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greggory Marty
Represented By: Jennifer D Loynd
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Tulloch
Represented By: Jennifer D Loynd
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?