Clayton v. Strange et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Clayton and Okie Redpaw
Defendant: Cheryl Strange, Casey Kaech, Lara Stick, David Flynn, Scott Russell, Ronna Cole, Helen Jack, Mary Ann Curl, Ron Haynes, Dan Van Ogle, Gina Penrose, Carol E Smith, T Coleman, D Dahna, Gary Wakeman, Kathy Reninger, Shane Evans, Mary Russell, Karen C Mitchell, Malissa Linch, Johnson, Parris, B Jensen and Jan and John Doe 1-13
Case Number: 3:2022cv06015
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Gina Penrose mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 22, 2023 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Shane Evans mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 22, 2023 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ronna Cole mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 22, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Joy Faber on behalf of Defendants Ronna Cole, Shane Evans, Gina Penrose. **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mary Russell mailed on 2/13/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Mandt, Heidi)
February 13, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heidi L Mandt on behalf of Defendant Mary Russell. **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Mandt, Heidi)
February 13, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Gary Wakeman mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Dan Van Ogle mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Cheryl Strange mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Carol E Smith mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Scott Russell mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kathy Reninger mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Parris mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Malissa Linch mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Casey Kaech mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Johnson mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Helen Jack mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ron Haynes mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant David Flynn mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant D Dahna mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mary Ann Curl mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant T Coleman mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Lara Stick mailed on 1/12/2023 **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Joy Faber on behalf of Defendants T Coleman, Mary Ann Curl, D Dahna, David Flynn, Ron Haynes, Helen Jack, Johnson, Casey Kaech, Malissa Linch, Parris, Kathy Reninger, Scott Russell, Carol E Smith, Lara Stick, Cheryl Strange, Dan Van Ogle, Gary Wakeman. **PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(Faber, Katherine)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Documents served electronically to Cheryl Strange, Casey Kaech, Laura Kaech, David Flynn, Scott Russell, Ronna Cole, Helen Jack, Mary Ann Curl, Ron Haynes, Dan Van Ogle, Gina Penrose, Carol E Smith, T Coleman, D Danna, Gary Wakeman, Kathy Reninger, Shane Evans, Mary Russell, Karen C Mitchell, Melissa Linch, HSMI Johnson, HSML Parris, and B Jensen on 1/12/2023. (cc: Washington AG's Office via e-mail w/ Order and Amended Complaint) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397)(MJV)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397) (JWC)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ronna Cole, T Coleman, Mary Ann Curl, D Dahna, Jan and John Doe 1-13, Shane Evans, David Flynn, Ron Haynes, Helen Jack, B Jensen, Johnson, Casey Kaech, Malissa Linch, Karen C Mitchell, Parris, Gina Penrose, Kathy Reninger, Mary Russell, Scott Russell, Carol E Smith, Lara Stick, Cheryl Strange, Dan Van Ogle, Gary Wakeman with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # T300000148), filed by James Edward Clayton.**64 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Clayton, Prisoner ID: 916397) (JWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Strange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okie Redpaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Kaech
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Stick
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flynn
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronna Cole
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Jack
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Curl
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Van Ogle
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Penrose
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol E Smith
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Coleman
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Dahna
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wakeman
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Reninger
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Evans
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Russell
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malissa Linch
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parris
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan and John Doe 1-13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?