Canton Port Services LLC v. M/V Indigo Spica
Plaintiff: Canton Port Services LLC
Defendant: M/V Indigo Spica
Claimant: IMS Maritime SA
Case Number: 3:2023cv06048
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Tiffany M Cartwright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by IMS Maritime SA.(Lempriere, Philip)
December 5, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #17 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement: Document incorrectly filed under Plaintiff. Corporate Disclosure information linked to Claimant. (MJV)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Itochu Corporation, Corporate Parent IMECS Co., Ltd. for IMS Maritime SA Canton Port Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by IMS Maritime SA Canton Port Services LLC. (Lempriere, Philip) Modified docket text to identify correct filing party on 12/5/2023 (MJV).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin O'Donovan for Claimant IMS Maritime SA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin G. O'Donovan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Claimant IMS Maritime SA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8256106 (Lempriere, Philip)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/12/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/20/2024, Joint Status Report due by 2/26/2024. (MET)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David McIntosh Williams for PLAINTIFF Canton Port Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ashley L Ensor for PLAINTIFF Canton Port Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Accepting #10 Letter of Undertaking in Lieu of Arrest of Vessel. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MW)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Accept Letter of Undertaking in Lieu of Arrest of Vessel, filed by Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2023, (Matison, Katie)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip Raoul Lempriere on behalf of Claimant IMS Maritime SA Defendant M/V Indigo Spica. (Lempriere, Philip) Modified party name on 11/20/2023 (MJV).
November 20, 2023 Claimant Party IMS Maritime SA added, per #9 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
November 20, 2023 Attorney Molly J Henry added for IMS Maritime SA; per #9 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Mcl. Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8246512 (Matison, Katie)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ashley L. Ensor FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8246174 (Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Arrest Vessel. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (Attachments: #1 Warrant)(MW) (Warrant, certified copy of this Order and #1 Complaint emailed and hand delivered to USMO)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to attach document re #3 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Verified, #4 Praecipe-Other by Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC (Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 PRAECIPE re #3 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Verified by Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC (Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Verified, filed by Plaintiff Canton Port Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/15/2023, (Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Canton Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Canton Maritime Services, Inc. for Canton Port Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Canton Port Services LLC. (Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against defendant(s) M/V Indigo Spica (IMO No. 9708758) (Receipt # AWAWDC-8242040) filed by Canton Port Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Matison, Katie)
November 15, 2023 District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canton Port Services LLC v. M/V Indigo Spica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canton Port Services LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Miller
Represented By: Katie Belinda Smith Matison
Represented By: Ashley L Ensor
Represented By: David McIntosh Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Indigo Spica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: IMS Maritime SA
Represented By: Kevin O'Donovan
Represented By: Molly J Henry
Represented By: Philip Raoul Lempriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?