Davis v. CSX Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Betty Jo Davis
Defendant: CSX Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00074
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Braxton
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OF DAMAGES NOT AVAILABLE 119 AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING 127 . Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/10/2012. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING DR. FREDERICK W. FOCHTMAN AND DR. D. SCOTT SIMONTON: The Defendant's 70 Motion in Limine and 75 Motion in Limine are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 12/30/11. (mh)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 72 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 12/21/2011. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/OPINION as to 14 Motion to Compel, DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 8/24/2010. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF) (jmm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. CSX Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jo Davis
Represented By: Peter D. Friday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?