Fluharty et al v. City of Clarksburg
Plaintiff: |
Thomas H. Fluharty, Diana R. Jacquez and Thomas J. Jacquez |
Defendant: |
City of Clarksburg |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00027 |
Filed: |
February 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Clarksburg Office |
County: |
Harrison |
Presiding Judge: |
Irene M. Keeley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
201
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 158 , 160 , 162 , 164 , 166 , 168 , AND 170 , DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 157 , AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE: The Court GRANTS all of the defendants motions for summary judgment on all claims, DENIES the plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment, and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. The Court directs the Clerk to enter a separate judgment order. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/12/17. (jss)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: it is ORDERED that Defendants' 67 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/14/15. (cnd)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
56
ORDER/OPINION Plaintiffs' "Motion to Compel Disclosures" 52 is DENIED AS MOOT to the extent it requests that the Court order Defendants to comply with the required disclosure of insurance information. The undersigned declines to ru le on whether Plaintiffs should receive an extension of time within which to file their Second Amended Complaint. The hearing scheduled for Tuesday, August 5, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELLED. The Clerk is directed to remove Docket No. 52 from the docket of motions actively pending before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 8/1/2014. (kd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?