Fout et al v. EQT Production Company
Plaintiff: |
John Fout and Nancy Fout |
Defendant: |
EQT Production Company |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00068 |
Filed: |
April 22, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Clarksburg Office |
County: |
Harrison |
Presiding Judge: |
Frederick P. Stamp |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 5, 2019 |
Filing
184
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs' Rule 60(b) motion to alter judgment (ECF No. 181 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/5/2019. (wrr)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing
180
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 59 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE: The plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend judgment under Rule 59 (ECF No. 175 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/26/2018. (wrr)
|
April 6, 2018 |
Filing
158
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE: It is ORDERED that Defendant's 82 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 83 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 84 Motion in Limine is DEFERRED; 85 Motion in Limine is GRANTE D; 86 Motion in Limine is DENIED AS MOOT; 87 Motion in Limine is DEFERRED; 88 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 89 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 90 Motion in Limine is DEFERRED; 91 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 92 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 93 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 94 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; and 149 Motion in Limine is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 4/6/18. (cnd)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
153
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 66 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 4/2/2018. (copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE A SURREPLY: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Defendant's 35 Motion to File Surreply is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 3/7/16. (cnd)
|
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PARTDEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS: EQTs partial motion todismiss 5 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 6/16/15. (jss)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?