Fielder v. R.V. Coleman Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Jason Fielder |
Defendant: |
R.V. Coleman Trucking, Inc. and Arkos Field Services, LP |
Thirdparty_plaintiff: |
R.V. Coleman Trucking, Inc. |
Thirdparty_defendant: |
MEC Construction, LLC |
Cross_claimant: |
Arkos Field Services, LP |
Cross_defendant: |
R.V. Coleman Trucking, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00023 |
Filed: |
February 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Clarksburg Office |
County: |
Monongalia |
Presiding Judge: |
Irene M. Keeley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1446 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
262
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES AND INAPPLICABLE REGULATIONS. Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Inapplicable Regulations and Standards filed by MEC Construction, LLC ECF No. [152 ] is GRANTED in part and DEFERRED in part, and the Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures filed by MEC Construction, LLC ECF No. 154 is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 3/19/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
|
February 26, 2018 |
Filing
234
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING AS FRAMED PLAINTIFFS MOTION FORADDITIONAL PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES. Plaintiffs motion request for additionalperemptory challenges ECF No. 218 is GRANTED AS FRAMED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 2/26/2018. (copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
233
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS. It is ORDERED re 144 Motion in Limine is DENIED; 145 Motion in Limine deferred; 146 Motion in Limine is DEFFERED ; 147 Motion in Limine is DENIED AS M OOT; 148 Motion in Limine IS DEFERRED; 150 Motion in Limine is DENIED; 152 Motion in Limine is DEFFERED; 154 Motion in Limine is DEFFERED; 155 Motion in Limine is DENIED; 156 Motion in Limine is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/29/2017 (Copy counsel of record). (jmm)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
207
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 112 DEFENDANTS EQT CORPORATION, EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY AND EQUITRANS LPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 113 DEFENDANT R.V. COLEMAN TRUCKING, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 114 DEFENDANT A RKOS FIELD SERVICES, LPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 115 DEFENDANT R.V. COLEMAN TRUCKING INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 116 PLAINTIFF JASON FIELDERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 117 DEFENDANT MEC CONSTRUCTIO N LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DELIBERATE INTENTION AND DENYING RULING AS TO INDEMNITY OR CONTRIBUTION AS PREMATURE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment on this matter as to defendants EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company, and Equitrans, LP. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/11/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?