Rover Pipeline LLC v. Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-009.972-TAR-1A et al
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-009.972-TAR-1A, Agnes E. Poe, Elizabeth A. Jordan, Carolyn Grable, Carol Gardner, St. Francis Hospital Fund, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Anzel Irene Kinnard, Sarah E. Shafer, Veta M. Balis, Margaret E. Howells, Constance Glover, Kathryn E. Robinson, Michael Ross, James F. Smith, Ralph H. Boos, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-006.510-ROW-T, Sharon Powers, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Fern Stout, Diversified Resources, Inc., Ryan C. Radtka, Morgan O'Brien, The Successors and Assigns of the Estate of Harold G. Worswick, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Mary E. Gumprecht, Tara Paladi, Chrissy McConnell, Sarah M. Wilmoth, Robert E. Swart, Chapman Energy, LLC, Chad J. Harkness, Vickie Mace, James R. Ritchay, West Union District, Stephen Layne Knight, James Robert Zeigler, Jr., Geraldine Stalling, Duane Raymond Couture, Harrison Rural Electrification Association, Inc., Betty A. Burnside, Barbara A. Blake, Fred E. Herrod, William T. Valenta, Cameron H. Caldwell, Alice Brannon Smith, Cheryl L. Swain, Willard William Herrod, Katherine Walsh Kadderly, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Hilda V. Hartman, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Dr. Joseph D. Beck, James E. Holliday, Paul Amos Smith, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-022.000-ROW-T, Statoil USA Onshore Properties Inc, Janice Carpenter Starkey, Valerie Clay, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Fay Stout, Robyn Lavey, Katy Jo Price, Theresa Yarborough, TiAnna Wherry, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Vinton W. Knechtges Sr., William H. Lively, Betty Lee Freeman, DFW Midstream Services LLC, James L. Thompson, Carol Petz, Clarence E. Sigley, Clarence E. Freeman, Monongahela Power Company, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Vinton W. Knechtges, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-040.000-T, Alice J. Bowen, Ronald Jeremy Herrod, Ida M. Bartlett, Galen R. Ash, Karen Beth Smell, Linda D. Spencer, Debra Kay Cantrell, Valaria R. Knight, Ascent Resources - Marcellus, LLC, Russell L. Ingalls, Mary Elta Knight, Tom Paladi, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Connie Prucka, Daniel O. Walsh, Nichole Johnston, Ada Joann McConnell, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-046.000-ROW-T, Kenneth P. Cottrill, Sue Ann Provenzano, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-023.000-T, West Virginia Department of Transportation, Division of Highways, and Thomas J. Smith, P.E., Worthy Carson Underwood, Jr., Randall Eric Friend, William R. Frazier, Nathan Monroe, J. Victor Benton, The Successors and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc., Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-016.000-ROW-T, Martha Sue Bennett Goff, David E. Bowyer, Mary Wolverton, Standard Land Company, LLC, Jennifer L. Powers, John Knight, Stephen C. Heidecker, John E. Smith, Roger Wells, Katherine Marie Daubenspeck, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-008.000-T, James W. Goit, Pamela Hellyer, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-021.971-TAR-4, Shirley A. Johnson, Beverlee Ann Fenton, BB&T Collateral Service Corporation, Doris M. Smith, Dustin Herrod, Joey Taggart, Mountain V, LLC, Charles N. Monroe, Evelyn Starlene Bays, Tonya Renee Linville, Ralph Main, Stonewall Gas Company, The Successor and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc., Jessie M. Wolverton, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Martha Bock, Victor Ash, White & Ellis Drilling Co. Inc., The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Charles Ray Smith, Jr., Janie L. Gains, Terrissa Kelley, William B. Van Doren, The Successors and Assigns of Empire Oil Company, Rebecca Minnear Finch, St. Francis Health Foundation, Dawna L. Miller, Richard R. Valenta, Thomas Cowman, Diana Lynne Knight, Linda Stahl, E. Carolyn Grable, Kimberly Kay Anderson, William M. Todd, Virginia Kovak, Nancy E. O'Brien, Carolyn Sue Gaskins, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-018.000-ROW-T, UMC Petroleum Corporation, Lois J. Moore, Antero Midstream Partners LP, North Bend Rail Trail, Rebecca Houk, Lou Ann Devries, MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C., Danny Lee Abels, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-017.971-TAR-3A, Matthew Monroe, Albert Smith, Sr., Thomas Scott Hoffman, Carol Tesar, Christopher Herrod, Patricia A. Lewis, Lewis K. Peters, Douglas R. Smith, Dennis H. Powell, David Gene Smith, Scott A. Schwertfeger, Rick Siders, Virginia Brannon Gascon, Sonja J. Harris, Antero Resources Corporation, Eureka Midstream, LLC, Carolyn J. Sherman, Clarence W. Mutschelknaus, James E. Van Doren, June Patrice Corlett, Lee Ann Alexander, Allen O'Neal Brown, William E. Powell, Prudence A. Newton, Peter A. Morse, Sr., Edith White, Wilma T. Bunner, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of K. Cecelia Walsh, DeAnga Hills, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-009.000-T, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Margaret D. Prucka, Stephanie Kay Kennedy, Juanita McConnell, Robert Lee Herrod, Brenda Suzi Herrod, Robert Shawn Schwertfeger, Lois M. Hunt, Brenda Jo Alexander, Jonathan C. Sykes, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Suzanne Jean Cody Knechtges, Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Audrey J. Baltoff, George W. Grove, Jr., Robert S. Harker, Marjorie Talbert, James David Zellerbach, IV, Mary Price Dorsey, Norman A. Schwertfeger, Peggy S. Harrah, A. W. Stevenson, Lando Glenn Robinson, Jr., Ruth Monroe, Lisa McGill, Sarah Kirby, Janice Main, Richard Ervin, David Gene Palmer, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-006.500-T, Sonny Lee Couture, John B. Wolverton, Jr., The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of William F. Mazzitello, Julia Ann Robinson Rogers, Carnegie Interstate Pipeline Company, Elizabeth Ann Romine, Veta Lewis, Walton Wolverton, Connie Glover, Vernon R. Schwertfeger, Terry A. Grove, Danny Woodford, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-039.000-ROW-T-B, William Hinton, Rhonda J. Smith, Lillie G. Brown, Robyn Moore, Mellie M. Powell, Danielle Renee Soules, Jane Hardin, Scott R. Fontaine, Septembre P. Wilt, Armstrong Land Management Company, Lawrence Shivers, John Michael Linville, Michael D. Herrod, Any Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of the Above-Named Defendants, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-001.505-T, Jonathan St. Laurent, Anna May Brown, James D. Kinnard, Jr., Mary F. Mutschelknaus, Charles G. Freeman, Lorelei F. Phillips, Darlene S. Hinkle, Kellie Penix, Appalachian Royalties, Inc., Joseph A. Grove, Jary J. Larson, John B. McCuskey, Kelleigh D. Leggett, Lee Ann Farr, Janet Hixon Estle, Hinu Funmaker, Robert Scott Palmer, GTP Towers I, LLC, Any Unknown Owners, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Guy W. Stout, Kim R. Freeland, Timmy D. Holtz, Kay Fowler, Murvin & Meier Oil Co., Elizabeth Ann Smith, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Lewis E. Davis, Loree Conley, Amanda Stull, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-018.000-ROW-T, Matthew T. Smith, Joyce Mazzitello, Trudell Tennant, Carl A. Smith, Bernard Keith Leggett, Christina Price Williams, Chiquita Watts, Richard S. Taylor, Tenmile Land Limited Liability Company, Margaret Walsh Batt, Melanie Doak, Paul E. Spencer, Michael J. Worswick, Audra June Matheny, CGAS Properties, L.P., Melvin Robert Herrod, Susannah Hilliard, Christopher Main, Mary Shivers, Raymond E. Thompson, Blaine Brinton, J. Douglas Sykes, Connie J. Sandreth, Judith Kozoriz, Lloyd Frederick Hoit, Jr., Theda D. Davis, Steven W. Prucka, John G. Valenta, Anna Marie Woodruff, P. D. Farr, Key Oil Company, Sharon Powell Erdman, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Joseph J. Larson, Susan W. Lee, KAJ, LLC, James Flanagan, Donivan L. Cumpston, Erin E. Sutton, Kathryn Summers, Candy Soto, Nancy Keller, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-042.000-T, Sarah E. Burdine, Lillian Morrison, Elizabeth Ann Guido, Franklin L. Butler, Judy E. Kelley, Loren E. Thompson, Jr., John P. Spencer, Wiha Pearl Funmaker, Edward D. Smith, Jr., Russell Daugherty, CONSOL Mining Company LLC, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-021.000-ROW-T, Wallace Glover, Jr., Dianne Lynne Knight, Steven J. Vodonik, Sherry Satrang, Patrick Dean Leggett, Thomas R. Smith, Kelli M. Bauso, Noble Energy, Inc., Velma G. Osborne, Laurie Leleu, Leslie Ann Juenger, Beverly A. Hoskinson, Michael T. O'Brien, Jeffrey W. Spencer, Paul Eugene Cumpston, Silverado Mineral Group, LP, Leslie Ray Tennant, Harold Wolverton, John Jason Dotson, Charles L. Pearcy, III, Frances Mae Musgrove, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-021.000-ROW-T and WV-DO-SHB-021.970-TAR-4, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-011.000-T, John F. Barnhart, Lonnie C. Frey, XTO Energy, Inc., Kathleen Lenora Reed, Betty Ann Smith, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-021.220-ROW-T, Tobey Lynn Nutt, Cathy Jo Johnston, Lawrence E. Carroll, Maxwell Y. Sutton, Carolyn C. Brinkley, Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company, Marvin L. Ford, Kimberly J. Martin, Lawrence D. Cottrill, Mary McConnell, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Robert E. Walsh, Judy R. Garner, Terri Lea Herrod, Cloyetta Moore, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of John P. Conn, Elizabeth A. Beveridge, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-011.500-T, Gayford Alan Cox, Mildred Nail, Energy Services and Consulting LLC, Thomas R. Todd, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-015.000-ROW-T and WV-DO-SHC-015.970-TAR-3, Mountain V Oil & Gas, Inc., Maggie O'Brien Sammons, Randall Richard Leggett, The Carter Oil Co., Heritage Resources - Marcellus Minerals, LLC, Johnny Vanscoy, Angel M. Brown, EMAX Oil Company, Clara J. Tate, Harriet E. Williams, Willis E. Freeman, Freda B. Jones, Haroldene K. Helmick, Eve M. Fowler, Mary Ann Perkins, James T. Robinson, John G. Lanoy, Wendell G. Mayle, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-019.000-ROW-T, Clyde M. Ford, III, Maribeth Moses, AT&T Corp., Nora L. Kell, Glynda L. Caray, Judith A. Hasse, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Rudolph J. Valenta, Travis Daugherty, Nancy M. Gregg, Kimberly K. Holland, Janet Gumprecht, Linda M. Summers, Dorothy M. Cain, Edward Flanagan, Jr., Michael Headley, Steven L. Swart, Janice Cowman, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Vinton W. Knechtges II, Trustee of the Stewart M. Vockel Trust, for the benefit of Miram L. Vockel, The Mike Ross Family Foundation, Inc., Anna E. Carroll, Steven C. Mays, James C. Atkinson, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Edna Robinson, Brenda Jo Fulton, Robert Arthur Friend, II, Debra L. O'Dell, Virginia R. Brannon, Willis G. Tetrick, Jr., Eleanor Frances DeLawder, Larry S. Cottrill, S.J.J. Leggett Family, LLC, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-024.000, Lillian Mathess, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-011.000-T, Jeffrey Scott Anderson, Richard Hoit, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-004.000-T, Neil Knight, Debbie Hayhurst, Janice Kay Snider, Colleen Smith, Jennifer L. Ford, Gerald Smith, Timothy C. Phillips, Richard L. Grove, Forrest Tennant, Agnes Elizabeth Poe, Garry Allen Cottrill, Jr., Katherine Ruiz, Liz Beth Seymour, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of W. Gail Stout, Carlos L. Stockham, Margaret Sykes Howells, David R. Holtz, Sylvia G. Pflugh, David W. Meier, Jr., Floyd D. Deaton, Victor R. Smith, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Charles T. Freeman, CNX Gas Company LLC, Nancy J. Jones, Jerry E. Hyatt, E. H. Lechner, James David Zellerbach, III, Zadok M. Leggett, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-011.510-ROW-T and WV-DO-SHB-013.000-ROW-T, SWN Production Company, LLC, Jackson H. Calhoun, Laroy Knight, William A. Farr, Alexandria Main, Deborah McConnell Smith, Grace Al-Wazzan, Donald R. Anderson, Antero Midstream LLC, Sheila Rena McCutchan, West Union Bank, Bessie M. Smith, West Virginia Division of Natural Resources, Carol Sue Edwards, Lisa A. Prucka, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-039.310-ROW-T, Wilda E. Staats, Edith V. Goit, Carolyn M. Thomas, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Junius E. Powell, Black Gold Group Limited, Mary Patricia Wyatt, H3 LLC, Karen V. Knechtges, F. Walter Dennis, Eugene Wolverton, West Virginia State Rail Authority, Mary Barnett, David D. Taft, Mike Ross, Debbie K. Ballard, Energy Holdings LLC, Diane R. Grant, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of John P. Conn, Danny Vanscoy, Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc., Andrea Lawrence, Heather Bradley, John M. Kinnard, Barbara Hook, Ed Broome, Inc., Phyliss M. Harvey, Mary Lou Varner Wright, Peoples Gas WV LLC, HG Energy, LLC, Richard O. Mueller, Lisa Dawn Swisher, Mark W. Wilt, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-016.000-ROW-T, Joyce Stubbs, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Mary S. Floyd, Gregory Brian Cox, Anzel Irene Kinnaird, Juanita Marie Heath, Donald Dean Spencer, East Resources, Inc., Christopher Gene Whited, Elaine Cottrill, Chesna Menear, John Cowman, Clifford Harold Freeman, Jr., Donna S. Dowler, James E. Smith, Reese F. Sherman, John C. Farr, Jenny Lombardozzi, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Joseph L. Vodonik, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Grace Stout, Pamela Bliss, Mike Ross, Inc., David L. Knight, Jr., Elizabeth A. Gill, Helen Burton, The Estate of Beulah Vanscoy, Kimberly Mattos, The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Charles E. Gumprecht, Shirley A. Monroe, Terry L. Smith, Catherine M. Shivers, Suzette Weekley, The Successors and Assigns of Dominion Coal Company, Frontier West Virginia Inc., Carl B. Dulin, Tyler Herrod, Jan E. Chapman, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-002.971-TAR-0-HDD and WV-DO-SHC-005.000-ROW, Amy P. Demorest, Ann Napier, Russell D. Jones, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-001.970-TAR-0-HDD, Linda K. Munsell, Joseph A. Prucka, Penelope Lou Barcus, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-017.000-T, Casey O'Brien, Helen Virginia Tennant, The Ohio State University, Richard L. Shields, Cherie Owens, Successor Trustees of the Virginia A. Tetrick Trust, Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-026.000-ROW-T, WV-DO-SHB-26.970-TAR-5, and WV-DO-SHB-027.000-ROW-T, St. Francis Health Center Foundation, Craig Scott Whited, Eric Thomas Anderson, Colleen C. Linkfield, E. Leslie Hoffman, III, Sharon K. Knight, Gary L. Ingalls, Ryder O'Brien, Middle Island Hunt Club, Crystal Brown, Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-020.000-T, Mark Russell Minnear, Delores J. Hyatt and Jerry Linn Toothman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00016
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Doddridge
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further proceedings will progress in the separate, tract-specific civil actions set forth herein. It is ORDERED that this civil action be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/25/2019. (wrr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 639 Proposed Order Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 PAPERLESS ORDER: For reasons appearing to the Court, the previously scheduled Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2018 and the Trial set for 10/16/2018 are hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/19/2018. (bjt)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NOBLE ENERGY, INC.: It is ORDERED that the parties' #633 Joint Motion for Dismissal of Defendant Noble Energy, Inc. is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the parties are DIRECTED to file the joint motion in the proper civil actions. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/22/18. (cnd)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2018 04:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey, Jury Selection/ Jury Trial set for 10/16/2018 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/18/18. (soa)
May 17, 2018 Filing 635 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: A Status Conference Hearing was held on 5/17/2018. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (bjt)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 PAPERLESS ORDER: The DIAL IN information for the scheduled telephonic hearing to be held THURSDAY, May 17, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., is as follows: Call-in: 1-866-455-2049 Passcode: 304 933 8193. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/16/2018. (bjt)
May 16, 2018 Filing 633 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Noble Energy, Inc. by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jamison)
May 15, 2018 Filing 632 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Amos Smith Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production. (Ford, William)
May 15, 2018 Filing 631 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Amos Smith Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories. (Ford, William)
May 15, 2018 Filing 630 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Amos Smith Response to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission. (Ford, William)
May 11, 2018 Filing 629 Proposed Stipulated Order as to AT&T with respect to tracts: WV-DO-SHB-011.510-ROW-T AND WV-DO-SHB-013.000-ROW-T (Dkt. 6) WV-DO-SHB-019.000-ROW-T (Dkt. 9) WV-DO-SHB-021.000-ROW-T AND WV-DO-SHB-021.970-TAR-4 (Dkt. 10) WV-DO-SHC-006.510-ROW-T (Dkt. 15) and also other tracts, including road rights-of-way, where AT&T Corp. and/or its affiliated entities may have facilities by AT&T Corp.. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER SETTING HEARING: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #627 Emergency Motion for Expedited Telephonic Status Conference is hereby GRANTED and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in Judge Bailey Chambers before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/10/18. (cnd)
May 8, 2018 Filing 627 Emergency MOTION for Hearing /Expedited Telephonic Status Conference by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
May 4, 2018 Filing 626 STIPULATION (Joint) to Extend Time to File Motions to Compel and for Plaintiff to Respond and/or Object to Discovery Requests Served by Defendants Tobey Lynn Nutt, Trustee of The Tobey Lynn Nutt Trust, dated January 24, 2008, and Jerry E. Hyatt, Subject to Court Approval of the Same by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
May 4, 2018 Filing 625 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy E. O'Brien of O'Brien Defendants' Responses to Requests for Production. (Ford, William)
May 4, 2018 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy E. O'Brien of O'Brien Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories. (Ford, William)
May 4, 2018 Filing 623 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy E. O'Brien of O'Brien Defendants' Responses to Requests for Admission. (Ford, William)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL, SUBJECT TO COURT APPROVAL: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant AT&T Corp's Stipultaion is GRANTED and the parties shall have until 5/14/2018 to file a Motion to Compel related to Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant AT&T Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/1/18. (cnd)
April 30, 2018 Filing 621 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Motion to Compel, Subject to Court Approval by AT&T Corp.. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER OF COURT: It is ORDERED that the #619 Consented-To Motion to Extend Time is hereby GRANTED and Defendants CONSOL Mining Company LLC and CNX Gas Company LLC response to written discovery requests is extended through 5/20/2018, and CONSOL Defendants time to provide expert disclosures is extended through May 20, 2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/30/18. (cnd)
April 27, 2018 Filing 619 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Puz, Rodger)
April 27, 2018 Filing 618 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. for AT&T's Expert Witness Disclosure. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TOBEY LYNN NUTT, TRUSTEE OF THE TOBEY LYNN NUTT TRUST, DATED JANUARY 24, 2008, AND JERRY E. HYATT, SUBJECT TO COURT APROVAL OF THE SAME: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants Tobey Lynn Nutt and Jerry E. Hyatts' #616 Stipulation/Motion to Extend Time to File Motions to Compel is hereby GRANTED and the parties shall have until 5/4/2018 to file motions to compel. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/20/18. (copy Atty Hall)(cnd)
April 16, 2018 Filing 616 STIPULATION/MOTION to Extend Time to File Motions to Compel by Plaintiff and Defendants Tobey Lynn Nutt, Trustee of The Tobey Lynn Nutt Trust, dated January 24, 2008, and Jerry E. Hyatt, Subject to Court Approval of the Same by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) Modified event type on 4/19/2018 (cnd).
April 16, 2018 Filing 615 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerry E. Hyatt (McNab, J.)
April 16, 2018 Filing 614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tobey Lynn Nutt (McNab, J.)
April 13, 2018 Filing 613 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. for AT&T's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant AT&T Corp.. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
April 6, 2018 Filing 612 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerry E. Hyatt . (McNab, J.)
April 6, 2018 Filing 611 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tobey Lynn Nutt . (McNab, J.)
April 2, 2018 Filing 610 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Motion to Compel by AT&T Corp.. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
March 30, 2018 Filing 609 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Plaintiffs Rule 26(a) Disclosure of Expert Testimony. (Williams, Lauren)
March 30, 2018 Filing 608 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC regarding Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures. (Cooper, Jamison)
March 29, 2018 Filing 607 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell B. Tuggle on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Tuggle, Mitchell)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SEPARATE AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR UNRESOLVED TRACTS, ECONOMIC UNITS OR OWNERSHIP: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a separate Amended Complaint and pay a separate filing fee for each tract, economic unit or ownership which has not been resolved by dismissal, stipulation or Order of the Court by 5/1/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/18. (copy Atty J. Hall) (cnd)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL REGARDING INTERESTS OWNED BY CNX GAS COMPAY LLC, CONSOL MINING COMPANY LLC, AND NOBLE ENERGY, INC.: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #576 Motion to Withdraw and Substitution is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/18. (copy Atty J. Hall)(cnd)
March 21, 2018 Filing 604 Proof of Service for Meier, Jr., David W., Trustee of the Appalachian Gas and Oil Trust Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 603 Proof of Service for June P. Corlett Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 602 Proof of Service for Judy R. Garner Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 601 Proof of Service for Paul A. Smith Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 600 Proof of Service for Holtz, Timmy D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 599 Proof of Service for Harrah, Peggy S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 598 Proof of Service for Burton, Helen Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 597 Proof of Service for Radtka, Ryan C. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 596 Proof of Service for Monroe, Shirley A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 595 Proof of Service for Gill, Elizabeth A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 594 Proof of Service for Dotson, John J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 593 Proof of Service for Bunner, Wilma T. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 592 Proof of Service for Underwood, Jr., Worthy C. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 591 Proof of Service for Sigley, Clarence E. a/k/a Sigley, Sr., Clarence E., Trustee of the Carolyn E. Farr Trust Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 590 Proof of Service for Romine, Elizabeth A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 589 Proof of Service for McConnell, Mary Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 588 Proof of Service for McConnell, Juanita Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 587 Proof of Service for McConnell, Christina Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 586 Proof of Service for McConnell, Ada J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 585 Proof of Service for Doak, Melanie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 584 Proof of Service for Barcus, Penelope L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 583 Proof of Service for Monroe, Charles N. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 582 Proof of Service for Smith, Colleen Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 21, 2018 Filing 581 Proof of Service for Wright, Mary Lou V. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 580 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant James E. Holliday (service by email). (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 579 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC Regarding Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant CNX Gas Company. (Cooper, Jamison)
March 16, 2018 Filing 578 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC Regarding Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant CONSOL Mining Company LLC. (Cooper, Jamison)
March 16, 2018 Filing 577 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamison H. Cooper on behalf of Rover Pipeline LLC (Cooper, Jamison)
March 16, 2018 Filing 576 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Regarding Interests Owned by CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC, and Noble Energy, Inc. by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 575 Proof of Service for Taft, David D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 574 Proof of Service for Demorest, Amy P. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 573 Proof of Service for Brown, Angel M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 572 Proof of Service for Herrod, Terri L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 571 Proof of Service for Cox, Gregory B. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 570 Proof of Service for Weekley, Suzette Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 569 Proof of Service for St. Laurent, Jonathan Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 568 Proof of Service for Ross, Michael a/k/a Ross, Mike Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 567 Proof of Service for Hoit, Richard Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 566 Proof of Service for Burnside, Betty A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 565 Proof of Service for Knechtges, Karen V. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 564 Proof of Service for Batt, Margaret W. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 563 Proof of Service for Moore, Lois J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 562 Proof of Service for Corlett, June P. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 561 Proof of Service for Brinton, Blaine Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 560 Proof of Service for Anderson, Kimberly K. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 559 Proof of Service for Anderson, Jeffrey S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 558 Proof of Service for Ballard, Debbie K. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 557 Proof of Service for Vanscoy, Johnny, Co-Executor of the Estate of Beulah Vanscoy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 556 Proof of Service for Vanscoy, Danny, Co-Executor of the Estate of Beulah Vanscoy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 555 Robinson Jr., Lando G. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 554 Proof of Service for Mace, Vickie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 553 Proof of Service for Bauso, Kelli M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 552 Proof of Service for Shivers, Catherine M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 551 Proof of Service for Todd, Thomas R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 550 Proof of Service for Juenger, Leslie A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 549 Proof of Service for Glover, Constance a/k/a Glover, Connie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 548 Proof of Service for Baltoff, Audrey J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 547 Proof of Service for Walsh, Daniel O. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 546 Proof of Service for Palmer, Robert S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 545 Proof of Service for Lively, William H. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 544 Proof of Service for Knight, Stephen L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 543 Proof of Service for Frazier, William R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 542 Proof of Service for Moses, Maribeth Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 541 Proof of Service for Jones, Russell D., Co-Trustee of the Russell D. Jones and Nancy J. Jones Revocable Trust Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 540 Proof of Service for Deaton, Floyd D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 539 Proof of Service for Stanley, James M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 538 Proof of Service for Whited, Christopher G. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 537 Proof of Service for Heath, Juanita M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 536 Proof of Service for Herrod, Brenda S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 535 Proof of Service for Ford III, Clyde M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 534 Proof of Service for Cottrill Jr., Gary Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 533 Proof of Service for Sherman, Reese F. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 532 Proof of Service for Phillips, Timothy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 531 Proof of Service for Soto, Candy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 530 Proof of Service for Soules, Danielle Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 529 Proof of Service for Gardner, Judy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 528 Proof of Service for Jordan Beveridge, Elizabeth A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 527 Proof of Service for Knight, David Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 526 Proof of Service for Freeland, Kim Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 525 Proof of Service for Stanley, James M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 16, 2018 Filing 524 Proof of Service for Satrang, Sherry Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 523 Proof of Service for Cain, Dorothy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 522 Proof of Service for Wolverton Jr., John B. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 521 Proof of Service for Swain, Cheryl Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 520 Proof of Service for Ervin, Richard Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 519 Proof of Service for Anderson, Donald Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 518 Proof of Service for O'Brien, Nancy E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 517 Proof of Service for O'Brien, Morgan Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 516 Proof of Service for O'Brien, Michael T. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 515 Proof of Service for O'Brien, Casey Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 514 Proof of Service for Spencer, John P. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 513 Proof of Service for Alexander, Lee Ann Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 512 Proof of Service for Lavey, Robyn Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 511 Proof of Service for Hilliard, Susannah Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 510 Proof of Service for Glover, Wallace Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 509 Proof of Service for Daubenspeck, Katherine M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 508 Proof of Service for Smith, Howard Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 507 Proof of Service for Smith Jr., Edward D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 506 Proof of Service for Paladi, Tom Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 505 Proof of Service for Alexander, Brenda Jo Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 504 Proof of Service for Sutton, Erin E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 503 Proof of Service for Leggett, Zadok M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 502 Proof of Service for Leggett, Kelleigh D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 501 Proof of Service for Moore, Cloyetta Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 500 Proof of Service for Brinkley, Carolyn Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren)
March 15, 2018 Filing 499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC . (Puz, Rodger)
March 14, 2018 Filing 498 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant James E. Holliday. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant Tobey Lynn Nutt, Trustee. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 496 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant Jerry E. Hyatt. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 495 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Defendant David E. Bowyer. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant AT&T Corp. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 493 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Armstrong Land Management Company. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendant Paul Amos Smith. (Williams, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 491 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production to Defendants Nancy E. OBrien, Maggie OBrien Sammons, Ryder OBrien, Morgan OBrien, and Casey OBrien. (Williams, Lauren)
March 1, 2018 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant AT&T Corp.s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. (Williams, Lauren)
February 28, 2018 Filing 489 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC. (Puz, Rodger)
February 27, 2018 Filing 488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Paul Amos Smiths First Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Williams, Lauren)
February 27, 2018 Filing 487 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Nancy E. OBrien, Ryder OBrien, Morgan OBrien, Casey OBrien, and Maggie OBrien Sammons First Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Williams, Lauren)
February 15, 2018 Filing 486 NOTICE by Delores J. Hyatt, Jerry E. Hyatt (Attachments: #1 Attachment Death Certificate)(McNab, J.) Modified security of attachment per IMK on 2/28/2018 (cnd).
January 30, 2018 Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff. (Harrell, Raymond)
January 30, 2018 Filing 484 Defendants Nancy O'Brien, Ryder O'Brien, Morgan O'Brien, Casey O'Brien and Maggie O'Brien Sammons First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Nancy E. O'Brien.(Ford, William) Modified filers on 1/31/2018 (cnd).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER: It is ORDERED that the O'Brien Defendants' #482 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/29/18. (cnd)
January 25, 2018 Filing 482 MOTION to Amend/Correct #398 Answer to Amended Complaint by Nancy E. O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Complaint)(Ford, William)
January 19, 2018 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Amos Smith Of First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC. (Ford, William)
January 19, 2018 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy E. O'Brien Of First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC. (Ford, William)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 PAPERLESS ORDER: the Motion to Withdraw #477 is granted, and accordingly, the Motion to Continue #476 is withdrawn. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on November 27, 2017. (eh)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCRETIONARY INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL: It is ORDERED that Defendant David E. Bowyer's #474 Motion for Discretionary Interlocutory Appeal is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/27/17. (cnd)
November 22, 2017 Filing 477 MOTION to Withdraw by David E. Bowyer. (Elmore, O.)
November 22, 2017 Filing 476 MOTION to Continue by David E. Bowyer. (Elmore, O.)
November 15, 2017 Filing 475 RESPONSE in Opposition re #474 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dawkins, Lori)
November 1, 2017 Filing 474 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by David E. Bowyer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt Certificate of Service)(Elmore, O.)
November 1, 2017 Filing 473 NOTICE by David E. Bowyer (Elmore, O.)
October 5, 2017 Set Hearing: Jury Selection set for 6/19/2018 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey, per #472 Order. (cnd)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER OF STATUS CONFERENCE: It is ORDERED that the #458 Motion to Appoint a Commission is hereby DENIED; Motions in limine due by 5/17/2018, Proposed Pretrial Motions due by 5/31/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2018 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 6/19/2018 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/5/17. (cnd) Modified docket text, NEF regenerated on 10/5/2017 (cnd).
October 4, 2017 Filing 471 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: A Status Conference was held on 10/4/2017. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (bjt)
September 29, 2017 Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re #458 MOTION to Appoint a Commission filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting #468 Motion to Substitute Responsible Local Attorney. Ordered that said motion is granted and it is ordered that Lauren A. Williams is hereby discharged from further duties as the responsible local attorney for Thomas A. Zabel and that William D. Wilmoth is hereby substituted. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/29/17. (jss)
September 28, 2017 Filing 468 MOTION to Substitute Attorney /Responsible Local Attorney for Thomas A. Zabel by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 PAPERLESS ORDER: A Status Conference is now set for 10/4/2017, at 11:00 AM, in the Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/28/2017. (JP)
September 22, 2017 Filing 466 RESPONSE in Opposition re #458 MOTION to Appoint a Commission from O'Brien Family Defendants and Defendant Paul Amos Smith filed by Nancy E. O'Brien. (Ford, William)
September 20, 2017 Filing 465 REPLY to Response to Motion re #458 MOTION to Appoint a Commission filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
September 15, 2017 Filing 464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC Rover Pipeline LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to the O'Brien Defendants and Defendant Smith. (Williams, Lauren)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AGREED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR OBRIEN DEFENDANTS AND DEFENDANT SMITH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT A COMMISSION: The defendants Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time for OBrienDefendants and Defendant Smith to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint a Commission #462 is hereby GRANTED to the extent that the Court will extend the deadline to September 22, 2017. Therefore this Court ORDERS that the OBrien defendants and defendant Smith shall file a Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint a Commission #458 by September 22, 2017. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/15/17. (jss)
September 14, 2017 Filing 462 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Commissioner by Nancy E. O'Brien. (Ford, William)
September 13, 2017 Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #458 MOTION to Appoint a Commission filed by Delores J. Hyatt, Jerry E. Hyatt, Tobey Lynn Nutt. (McNab, J.)
September 13, 2017 Filing 460 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy E. O'Brien et al of Defendants Rule 26(a) Disclosure. (Ford, William)
September 1, 2017 Filing 459 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dawkins, Lori)
September 1, 2017 Filing 458 MOTION to Appoint a Commission by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Dawkins, Lori)
August 21, 2017 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Rover Pipeline LLC for proceedings held on 8-17-2017 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
August 21, 2017 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/17/2017, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 9/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (ck)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER ON MOTIONS HEARING OF AUGUST 17, 2017: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #441 Motion for Contempt and to Enforce Order Against David E. Bowyer is hereby DENIED; Defendant David E. Bowyer's #449 Motion to Enforce Settlement is DENIED; and Defendant Bowyer's #450 Motion to Expedite is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/18/17. (cnd)
August 18, 2017 Filing 454 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Oral Argument Hearing held before District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/18/2017. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (bjt) (Main Document 454 replaced on 8/18/2017) (bjt). Modified on 8/18/2017 to correct clerical error on Minute Entry (bjt).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER REGARDING SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: It is ORDERED that #447 Motion to Set Scheduling Conference and Enter a Scheduling Order is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff and O'Brien and Smith Defendants shall meet and submit to this Court a written report and a completed Scheduling Order Checklist on or before 9/1/17. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/11/17. (cnd)
August 10, 2017 Filing 452 Proposed Order by David E. Bowyer. (Elmore, O.)
August 10, 2017 Filing 451 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David E. Bowyer . (Elmore, O.)
August 10, 2017 Filing 450 MOTION to Expedite by David E. Bowyer. (Elmore, O.)
August 10, 2017 Filing 449 MOTION for Settlement by David E. Bowyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Elmore, O.)
August 10, 2017 Filing 448 NOTICE by David E. Bowyer (Elmore, O.)
August 9, 2017 Filing 447 Motion to Set Scheduling Conference and Trial Date and Enter Scheduling Order Other Document as to the Obrien Defendants and Defendant Paul A. Smith, Jr filed by Nancy E. O'Brien. (Ford, William) Modified event type on 8/11/2017 (cnd).
August 9, 2017 Filing 446 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Michael T. O'Brien by Nancy E. O'Brien. (Ford, William)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER GRANTING DAVID E. BOWYER'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING. The Court grants Defendant Bowyer's #444 Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing reset for 8/17/2017 03:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey re #441 MOTION for Order to Show Cause /for Contempt Against Defendant David E. Bowyer. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/31/17. (mh)
July 31, 2017 Filing 444 MOTION to Continue Hearing by David E. Bowyer. (Elmore, O.)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND TO ENFORCE ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT DAVID E BOWYER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #442 Motion for Hearing is hereby GRANTED and the parties are to appear on 8/1/2017 at 8:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. The Defendant Bowyer is DIRECTED to file any response by 7/31/2017 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/28/17. (cnd)
July 27, 2017 Filing 442 MOTION for Hearing re #441 MOTION for Order to Show Cause /for Contempt Against Defendant David E. Bowyer by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
July 27, 2017 Filing 441 MOTION for Order to Show Cause /for Contempt Against Defendant David E. Bowyer by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dawkins, Lori)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT MARKWEST LIBERTY MIDSTREAM & RESOURCES, LLC: It is ORDERED that the #439 Joint Motion to Dismiss MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. is hereby GRANTED and MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. is DISMISSED from the civil action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/25/17. (cnd)
July 21, 2017 Filing 439 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Andrew)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT FRONTIER WEST VIRGINIA, INC.: It is ORDERED that the #437 Joint Motion to Dismiss Frontier West Virginia Inc. is hereby GRANTED and Frontier West Virginia Inc. is DISMISSED from the civil action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/17/17. (cnd)
July 14, 2017 Filing 437 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT FRONTIER WEST VIRGINIA INC. by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
July 5, 2017 Filing 436 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, for Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
June 20, 2017 Filing 435 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, for Additional Extension of Time to Respond by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 434 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, for Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
May 23, 2017 Filing 433 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, For Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting #431 Unopposed Motion for Dismissal of defendants Key Oil Company, Chapman Energy, LLC, Jan E. Chapman and Franklin L. Butler re dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/5/17. (jss) Modified docket text on 5/11/2017 (jss).
May 3, 2017 Filing 431 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS KEY OIL COMPANY, CHAPMAN ENERGY, LLC, JAN E. CHAPMAN, AND FRANKLIN L. BUTLER by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
May 2, 2017 Filing 430 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, for Additional Extension of Time to Respond by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
April 26, 2017 Filing 429 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier West Virginia Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Frontier Communications Corporation for Frontier West Virginia Inc... (Starsick, Joseph)
April 21, 2017 Filing 428 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp., AT&T Corp... (Harrell, Raymond)
April 21, 2017 Filing 427 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint, by AT&T Corp..(Harrell, Raymond)
April 21, 2017 Filing 426 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Entsminger on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Entsminger, Kurt)
April 20, 2017 Filing 425 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. Harrell, Jr on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Harrell, Raymond)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PEOPLES GAS WV LLC: It is ORDERED that the parties' #423 Joint Motion for Dismissal of Defendant Peoples Gas WV LLC is hereby GRANTED and Peoples Gas WV LLC is DISMISSED from this civil action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/20/17. (cnd)
April 19, 2017 Filing 423 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT PEOPLES GAS WV LLC by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
April 19, 2017 Filing 422 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONSOL Mining Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Consol Energy Inc., Corporate Parent CONSOL Mining Holding Company LLC for CONSOL Mining Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC.. (Puz, Rodger)
April 19, 2017 Filing 421 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNX Gas Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Consol Energy Inc., Corporate Parent CNX Gas Corporation for CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC, CNX Gas Company LLC.. (Puz, Rodger)
April 18, 2017 Filing 420 STIPULATION re #49 Amended Complaint, by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
April 13, 2017 Filing 419 NOTICE of Appearance by Bader C. Giggenbach on behalf of Armstrong Land Management Company (Giggenbach, Bader)
April 11, 2017 Filing 418 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Noble Energy, Inc.. (Casto, Matthew)
April 10, 2017 Filing 417 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Noble Energy, Inc..(Casto, Matthew)
April 5, 2017 Filing 416 NOTICE of Appearance by J. R. Hall on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Amended Notice of Appearance)(Hall, J.)
April 5, 2017 Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger L. Puz on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Amended Notice of Appearance)(Puz, Rodger)
April 4, 2017 Filing 414 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
April 4, 2017 Filing 413 STIPULATION for Additional Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Jenkins, Andrew)
April 4, 2017 Filing 411 NOTICE by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. of Change of Attorney Information (Ward, Joseph) (Main Document 411 replaced on 4/6/2017 to remove pdf fillable document) (cnd).
April 3, 2017 Filing 410 STIPULATION for Extention of Time to File an Answer by Noble Energy, Inc.. (Casto, Matthew)
March 31, 2017 Filing 409 NOTICE Returned Executed as to DFW Midstream Services LLC served on 3/28/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
March 31, 2017 Filing 408 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company served on 3/28/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER GRANTING WEST VIRGINIA DIVISION OF NATURAL RESOURCES' MOTION TO DISMISS: It is ORDERED that Defendant West Virginia Division of Natural Resources' #345 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED. West Virginia Division of Natural Resources terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/29/17. (cnd)
March 28, 2017 Filing 405 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Successors and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc. served on 3/8/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER: It is STIPULATED and ORDERED that the time period in which Defendant Noble Energy, Inc. has to answer Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Condemnation is hereby extended until 4/3/2017. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/27/17. (cnd)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER: It is STIPULATED and ORDERED that the time period in which Defendants CNX Gas Company LLC and CONSOL Mining Company LLC have to answer Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Condemnation be extended until 4/5/2017. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/27/17. (cnd)
March 24, 2017 Filing 402 STIPULATION re #2 Complaint, for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Noble Energy, Inc.. (Casto, Matthew)
March 23, 2017 Filing 401 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File An Answer by CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC. (Puz, Rodger)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER: It is STIPULATED and ORDERED that Defendant MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. has up to and including 4/5/2017 to answer and/or respond to the #49 Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/23/17. (cnd)
March 22, 2017 Filing 399 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint, by Maggie O'Brien Sammons.(Ford, William)
March 22, 2017 Filing 398 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint, by Michael T. O'Brien, Morgan O'Brien, Nancy E. O'Brien, Ryder O'Brien.(Ford, William)
March 22, 2017 Filing 397 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C.. (Ward, Joseph)
March 22, 2017 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Ward on behalf of MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. (Ward, Joseph)
March 22, 2017 Filing 395 Defendant Paul Amos Smith's ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint, by Paul Amos Smith.(Ford, William)
March 22, 2017 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Casto on behalf of Noble Energy, Inc. (Casto, Matthew)
March 22, 2017 Filing 393 NOTICE Returned Executed as to UMC Petroleum Corporation served on 3/20/2017. (jss)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MONONGAHELA POWER COMPANY AND TRANS-ALLEGHENY INTERSTATE LINE COMPANY: Order granting Joint #390 Motion to Dismissal of defendants Monongahela Power Company and Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company is granted and ordered that defendants Monongahela Power Company and Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company are hereby dismissed from the civil action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/17. (jss)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ANATERO RESOURCES CORPORATION, ANTERO MIDSTREAM LLC AND ANTERO MIDSTREAM PARTNERS LP: Order granting unopposed #383 Motion to Dismiss and Ordered that defendants Antero Resources Corporation, Antero Midstream LLC, and Antero Midstream Partners LP are hereby dismissed from the civil action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/17. (jss)
March 21, 2017 Filing 390 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MONONGAHELA POWER COMPANY AND TRANS-ALLEGHENY INTERSTATE LINE COMPANY by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
March 21, 2017 Filing 389 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Monongahela Power Company served on 3/14/2017. (cnd)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #386 Unopposed Motion for Dismissal of Defendant The Ohio State University is hereby GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Ohio State University terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/21/17. (cnd)
March 21, 2017 Filing 387 STIPULATION Re: Deadline to Answer Verified Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (Amandus, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2017 Filing 386 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
March 17, 2017 Filing 385 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, by Frontier West Virginia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Starsick, Joseph)
March 15, 2017 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Casto on behalf of Peoples Gas WV LLC (Casto, Matthew)
March 14, 2017 Filing 383 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS ANTERO RESOURCES CORPORATION, ANTERO MIDSTREAM LLC, AND ANTERO MIDSTREAM PARTNERS LP by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawkins, Lori)
March 14, 2017 Filing 382 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
March 14, 2017 Filing 381 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Successor and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc. served on 3/8/2017. (jss)
March 14, 2017 Filing 380 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Black Gold Group Limited served on 3/8/2017. (jss)
March 13, 2017 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by J. R. Hall on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC (Hall, J.)
March 13, 2017 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger L. Puz on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC, CONSOL Mining Company LLC (Puz, Rodger)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER CLARIFYING ORDERS ON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that the #355 Order and 208 Order in 5:17cv15 constitutes the combined total necessary for Rover to pay in these two related cases. Rover has satisfied its obligations to pay a deposit in each case per #356 , and 209 in 5:17cv15. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/13/17. (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 376 NOTICE Returned Executed as to DFW Midstream Services LLC served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 375 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 374 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Monongahela Power Company served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 373 NOTICE Returned Executed as to MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 372 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Carnegie Interstate Pipeline Company served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 371 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Harrison Rural Electrification Association, Inc. served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
March 9, 2017 Filing 370 NOTICE Returned Executed as to KAJ, LLC served on 3/7/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER DIRECTING DISCLOSURE OF SEALED EXHIBITS: It is ORDERED that the Clerk provide color copies of all exhibits admitted under seal to counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/9/17. (color copies provided to Plaintiff's counsel in person from WHG Clerk's office this day)(cnd)
March 8, 2017 Filing 368 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Ohio State University served on 2/28/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
March 8, 2017 Filing 367 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Trans-Allegheny Interstate Line Company served on 3/1/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 8, 2017 Filing 366 NOTICE Returned Executed as to AT&T Corp. served on 3/1/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
March 7, 2017 Filing 365 Notice Returned Executed as to Noble Energy, Inc. served on 3/1/2017. (jss)
March 7, 2017 Filing 364 Notice Returned Executed as to Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC served on 3/1/2017. (jss)
March 7, 2017 Filing 363 Notice Returned Executed as to DFW Midstream Services LLC served on 3/1/2017. (jss)
March 6, 2017 Filing 362 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER for proceedings held on 3/2/2017 before Judge Bailey. (lsm)
March 6, 2017 Filing 361 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/2/2017, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Mullen, Telephone number (304) 234-3987. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 3/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (lsm)
March 6, 2017 Filing 360 Notice Returned Executed as to Energy Services and Consulting LLC. Served on 2/16/17. (jss)
March 3, 2017 Filing 359 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Carter Oil Co. served on 2/28/2017. (cnd)
March 3, 2017 Filing 357 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Appalachian Royalties, Inc. served on 2/28/2017. (cnd)
March 3, 2017 Filing 356 Registry Fund received per #355 Order: $ 348,731.50, receipt number WVNE010701. (cnd)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IMMEDIATE ACCESS AND POSSESSION OF EASEMENTS TO BE CONDEMNED: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and #64 Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff shall deposit with the Clerk of Court a certified check in the amount of $348,731.50. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/3/17. (cnd)
March 2, 2017 Filing 358 Clerk's Witness and Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant 1-10, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff 1-10 and 11, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff 12 and 13)(bjt)
March 2, 2017 Filing 354 NOTICE Returned Executed as to MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources, L.L.C. SOS accepted service on 2/22/2017. (jss) Modified on 3/3/2017 - corrected filed date (jss).
March 2, 2017 Filing 353 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: A Motion Hearing was held on 3/2/2017 re #25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and IMMEDIATE ACCESS AND POSSESSION OF EASEMENTS TO BE CONDEMNED filed by Rover Pipeline LLC, #64 Supplemental MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Easements to be Condemned filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) (bjt)
March 2, 2017 Filing 352 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means of Statoil USA Onshore Properties, Inc. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Thomas Zabel's #27 Motion/Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/2/17. (cnd)
March 1, 2017 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Ford, III on behalf of Haroldene K. Helmick (Ford, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Ford, III on behalf of James Edward Holliday (Ford, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 348 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation wiht Jury Demand, ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #6 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand by Tobey Lynn Nutt.(McNab, J.)
March 1, 2017 Filing 347 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #5 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #5 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, #5 Notice of Condemnation with Jury Demand by Delores J. Hyatt, Jerry E. Hyatt.(McNab, J.)
March 1, 2017 Filing 346 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Breton McNab on behalf of Delores J. Hyatt, Jerry E. Hyatt, Tobey Lynn Nutt (McNab, J.)
March 1, 2017 Filing 345 MOTION to Dismiss by West Virginia Division of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Easement Exhibit)(Charnock, Jane)
March 1, 2017 Filing 344 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rover Pipeline LLC (Dawkins, Lori)
March 1, 2017 Filing 343 NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Partial Voluntary Dismissal (Dawkins, Lori)
March 1, 2017 Filing 342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by West Virginia Division of Natural Resources re #339 Other Document Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means. (Charnock, Jane)
March 1, 2017 Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by West Virginia Division of Natural Resources re #338 Notice of Appearance and Counsel Contract Form. (Charnock, Jane)
March 1, 2017 Filing 340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
March 1, 2017 Filing 339 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document re #338 Notice of Appearance filed by West Virginia Division of Natural Resources. (Charnock, Jane)
March 1, 2017 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane G. Charnock on behalf of West Virginia Division of Natural Resources (Charnock, Jane)
March 1, 2017 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
March 1, 2017 Filing 336 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
March 1, 2017 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 334 Proof of Service of Monroe, Nathan Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 333 Proof of Service of Monroe, Matthew Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 332 Proof of Service of Lombardozzi, Jenny Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 331 Proof of Service of Satrang, Sherry Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 330 Proof of Service of Wolverton Jr, John B. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 329 Proof of Service of Robinson, James T. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 328 Proof of Service of Kinnard Jr, James D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 327 Proof of Service of Cumpston, Paul E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 326 Proof of Service of Cumpston, Donivan L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 325 Proof of Service of Hook, Barbara Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 324 Proof of Service of Grove, Richard L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 323 Proof of Service of Sammons, Maggie O'Brien Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 322 Proof of Service of Newton, Prudence A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 321 Proof of Service of Kennedy, Stephanie Kay Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 320 Proof of Service of Ingalls, Russell L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 319 Proof of Service of Hellyer, Pamela Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 318 Proof of Service of Hardin, Jane 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 317 Proof of Service of Vodonik, Steven J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 316 Proof of Service of Spencer, Paul E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 315 Proof of Service of Shields, Richard L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 314 Proof of Service of Penix, Kellie fka Mary Nicole Hinton Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 313 Proof of Service of Munsell, Linda K. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 312 Proof of Service of Mayle, Wendell G. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 311 Proof of Service of Hoffman, Thomas Scott Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 310 Proof of Service of Hoffman, III, E. Leslie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 309 Proof of Service of Goff, Martha Sue Bennett Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 308 Proof of Service of Farr, P. D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 307 Proof of Service of Davis, Theda D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 306 Proof of Service of Brown, Crystal Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 305 Proof of Service of Bradley, Heather Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 304 Proof of Service of Woodford, Danny Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 303 Proof of Service of Williams, Harriet E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 302 Proof of Service of Williams, Christina Price Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 301 Proof of Service of Smith, Terry L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 300 Proof of Service of Smith, Sr., Albert Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 299 Proof of Service of Smith, Matthew T. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 298 Proof of Service of Schwertfeger, Scott A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 297 Proof of Service of Prucka, Steven W. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 296 Proof of Service of Prucka, Steven W. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 295 Proof of Service of Prucka, Lisa A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 294 Proof of Service of Price, Katy Jo Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 293 Proof of Service of Swart, Robert E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 292 Proof of Service of Provenzano, Sue Ann Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 291 Proof of Service of Owens, Cherie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 290 Proof of Service of Kozoriz, Judith Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 289 Proof of Service of Holland, Kimberly K. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 288 Proof of Service of Hayhurst, Debbie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 287 Proof of Service of Grove Jr, George W. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 286 Proof of Service of Fowler, Eve M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 285 Proof of Service of Edwards, Carol Sue Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 284 Proof of Service of Couture, Sonny Lee Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 283 Proof of Service of Yarborough, Theresa Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 282 Proof of Service of White, Edith Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 281 Proof of Service of Stalling, Geraldine Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 280 Proof of Service of Smith, Victor R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 279 Proof of Service of Smith, Thomas R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 278 Proof of Service of Smith, James F. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David E. Bowyer . (Elmore, O.)
February 28, 2017 Filing 276 Proof of Service of Smith, Elizabeth Ann Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 275 Proof of Service of Smith, Carl A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 274 Proof of Service of Schwertfeger, Vernon R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 273 Proof of Service of Pflugh, Sylvia G. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 272 Proof of Service of Petz, Carol Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 271 Proof of Service of Paladi, Tara Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 270 Proof of Service of McGill, Lisa Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 269 Proof of Service of Mazzitello, Joyce Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 268 Proof of Service of Martin, Kimberly J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by O. Gay Elmore, Jr on behalf of David E. Bowyer (Elmore, O.)
February 28, 2017 Filing 266 Proof of Service of Knight, Neil Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 265 Proof of Service of Knight, Laroy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 264 Proof of Service of Keller, Nancy Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 263 Proof of Service of Grove, Terry A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 262 Proof of Service of Grove, Joseph A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 261 Proof of Service of Grable, Carolyn aka E. Carolyn Grable Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 260 Proof of Service of Estle, Janet Hixon Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 259 Proof of Service of Cowman, Thomas Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 258 Proof of Service of Cowman, John Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 257 Proof of Service of Cowman, Janice Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 256 Proof of Service of Cottrill, Elaine Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 255 Proof of Service of Conley, Loree Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 254 Proof of Service of Bays, Evelyn Starlene Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 253 Proof of Service of Wilmoth, Sarah M. nka Sarah Anderson Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 252 Proof of Service of West Virginia State Rail Authority co Cindy Butler, Director 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 251 Proof of Service of West Virginia State Rail Authority co Cindy Butler, Director 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 250 Proof of Service of Soules, Danielle Renee Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 249 Proof of Service of Mattos, Kimberly Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 248 Proof of Service of Linkfield, Colleen C. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 247 Proof of Service of Friend, II, Robert Arthur Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 246 Proof of Service of Erdman, Sharon Powell Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 245 Proof of Service of WV DOT,Division of Highways &Thomas J. Smith, P.E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 244 Proof of Service of Woodruff, Anna Marie 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 243 Proof of Service of Woodruff, Anna Marie 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 242 Proof of Service of Whited, Craig Scott Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 241 Proof of Service of Wherry, TiAnna Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 240 Proof of Service of Todd, William M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 239 Proof of Service of Tennant, Forrest Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 238 Proof of Service of Swisher, Lisa Dawn Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 237 Proof of Service of Swart, Steven L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 236 Proof of Service of Stahl, Linda Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 235 Proof of Service of Snider, Janice Kay Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 234 Proof of Service of Prucka, Joseph A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 233 Proof of Service of Powers, Jennifer L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 232 Proof of Service of Peters, Lewis K. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 231 Proof of Service of Peters, Lewis K. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 230 Proof of Service of Nutt, Tobey Lynn, Trustee Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 229 Proof of Service of McCuskey, John B., West Virginia State Auditor 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 228 Proof of Service of McCuskey, John B., West Virginia State Auditor 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 227 Proof of Service of McCuskey, John B., West Virginia State Auditor 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 226 Proof of Service of Leggett, Randall Richard Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 225 Proof of Service of Kovak, Virginia Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 224 Proof of Service of Knight, Valaria R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 223 Proof of Service of Grant, Diane R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 222 Proof of Service of Fulton, Brenda Jo Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 221 Proof of Service of Frey, Lonnie C. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 220 Proof of Service of Flanagan, Jr., Edward Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 219 Proof of Service of DeLawder, Eleanor Frances Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 218 Proof of Service of Cottrill, Larry S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 217 Proof of Service of Clay, Valerie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 216 Proof of Service of Brown, Lillie G. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 215 Proof of Service of Al-Wazzan, Grace Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 214 Proof of Service of Worswick, Michael J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 213 Proof of Service of Watts, Chiquita Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 212 Proof of Service of Van Doren, William B. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 211 Proof of Service of Valenta, Richard R. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 210 Proof of Service of Valenta, Richard R. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 209 Proof of Service of Seymour, Liz Beth Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 208 Proof of Service of Pearcy III, Charles L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 207 Proof of Service of Herrod, Tyler 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 206 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Carter Land Company (not a named Defendant)served on 2/23/2017. Plaintiff's counsel has asked the WVSOS to re-serve the correct entity, The Carter Oil Co. (cnd)
February 28, 2017 Filing 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 204 Proof of Service of Matheny, Audra June Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 203 Proof of Service of Linville, Tonya Renee Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 202 Proof of Service of Leleu, Laurie Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 201 Proof of Service of Kirby, Sarah Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 200 Proof of Service of Kelley, Judy E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 199 Proof of Service of Ingalls, Gary L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 198 Proof of Service of Herrod, Robert Lee 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 197 Proof of Service of Herrod, Robert Lee 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 196 Proof of Service of Bliss, Pamela Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 195 Proof of Service of Wilt, Septembre P. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 194 Proof of Service of Wilt, Septembre P. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 193 Proof of Service of Wilt, Mark W. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 192 Proof of Service of Wilt, Mark W. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 191 Proof of Service of Starkey, Janice Carpenter Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 190 Proof of Service of Robinson, James T. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 189 Proof of Service of Powers, Sharon Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 188 Proof of Service of Phillips, Lorelei F. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 187 Proof of Service of Linville, John Michael Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 186 Proof of Service of Lemick, Haroldene K. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 185 Proof of Service of Knight, Dianne Lynne Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 182 Proof of Service of Kelley, Terrissa 4 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 181 Proof of Service of Kelley, Terrissa 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 179 Proof of Service of Kelley, Terrissa 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 177 Proof of Service of Kelley, Terrissa 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 176 Proof of Service of Hoskinson, Beverly A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 174 Proof of Service of Holtz, David R. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 173 Proof of Service of Herrod, Tyler 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 169 Proof of Service of Herrod, Tyler 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 158 Proof of Service of Herrod, Ronald Jeremy 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 157 Proof of Service of Herrod, Ronald Jeremy 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 156 Proof of Service of Herrod, Christopher 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 155 Proof of Service of Herrod, Christopher 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 154 Proof of Service of Herrod, Christopher 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 153 Proof of Service of Headley, Michael, Sheriff of Doddridge County, WV 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 152 Proof of Service of Headley, Michael, Sheriff of Doddridge County, WV 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 151 Proof of Service of Headley, Michael, Sheriff of Doddridge County, WV 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 150 Proof of Service of Gains, Janie L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 149 Proof of Service of Ford, Marvin L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 148 Proof of Service of Ford, Jennifer L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 147 Proof of Service of Farr, William A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 146 Proof of Service of Balis, Veta M. aka Veta Lewis 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 145 Proof of Service of Balis, Veta M. aka Veta Lewis 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 144 Proof of Service of Ash, Victor 4 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 143 Proof of Service of Ash, Victor 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 142 Proof of Service of Ash, Victor 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 141 Proof of Service of Ash, Victor 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 140 Proof of Service of Ash, Galen R. 4 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 139 Proof of Service of Ash, Galen R. 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 138 Proof of Service of Ash, Galen R. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 137 Proof of Service of Ash, Galen R. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 136 Proof of Service of Zellerbach III, James David Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 135 Proof of Service of Zeigler, Jr., James Robert Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 134 Proof of Service of Thomas, Carolyn M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 133 Proof of Service of Tennant, Helen Virginia Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 132 Proof of Service of Tate, Clara J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 131 Proof of Service of Taggart, Joey Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 130 Proof of Service of Sykes, Jonathan C. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 129 Proof of Service of Sykes, J. Douglas Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 128 Proof of Service of Spencer, Donald Dean Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 127 Proof of Service of Smith, Gerald Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 126 Proof of Service of Smith, Doris M., fka Doris Monroe Taggart Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 125 Proof of Service of Smith, Bessie M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 124 Proof of Service of Shafer, Sarah E., aka Sarah E. Burdine Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 123 Proof of Service of Schwertfeger, Norman A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 122 Proof of Service of Satrang, Sherry Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 121 Proof of Service of Sandreth, Connie J. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 120 Proof of Service of Miller, Dawna L. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 119 Proof of Service of Mathess, Lillian Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 118 Proof of Service of Johnston, Cathy Jo Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 117 Proof of Service of Johnson, Shirley A. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 116 Proof of Service of Hunt, Lois M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 115 Proof of Service of Howells, Margaret E., aka Margaret Sykes Howells, fka Margaret E. Cipoletti Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 114 Proof of Service of Hinkle, Darlene S. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 113 Proof of Service of Harris, Sonja J., Individually, or co Lois M. Hunt Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 112 Proof of Service of Dorsey, Mary Price Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 111 Proof of Service of Cottrill, Lawrence D. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 110 Proof of Service of Barnhart, John F. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 109 Proof of Service of Barnhart, John F. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 108 Proof of Service of WV DOT,Division of Highways,&Thomas J. Smith, P.E. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 107 Proof of Service of WV Division of Natural Resources co Robert A. Fala, Director 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 106 Proof of Service of WV Division of Natural Resources co Robert A. Fala, Director 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 105 Proof of Service of Rogers, Julia Ann Robinson 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 104 Proof of Service of Rogers, Julia Ann Robinson 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 103 Proof of Service of Robinson, Kathryn E., aka Kathryn Summers Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 102 Proof of Service of Powell, Mellie M. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 101 Proof of Service of Powell, Mellie M. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 100 Proof of Service of Powell, Dennis H. 4 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 99 Proof of Service of Powell, Dennis H. 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 98 Proof of Service of Powell, Dennis H. 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 97 Proof of Service of Powell, Dennis H. 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 96 Proof of Service of Poe, Agnes E. aka Agnes Elizabeth Poe Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 95 Proof of Service of North Bend Rail Trail co Paul Elliott, Superintendent 4 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 94 Proof of Service of North Bend Rail Trail co Paul Elliott, Superintendent 3 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 93 Proof of Service of North Bend Rail Trail co Paul Elliott, Superintendent 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 92 Proof of Service of North Bend Rail Trail co Paul Elliott, Superintendent 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 91 Proof of Service of Menear, Chesna Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 90 Proof of Service of McCuskey, John B., WV State Auditor 11 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 89 Proof of Service of Leggett, Patrick Dean Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 88 Proof of Service of Leggett, Bernard Keith Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 87 Proof of Service of Lawrence, Andrea Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 86 Proof of Service of Jones, Freda B. Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 85 Proof of Service of Headley, Michael, Sheriff of Doddridge County, WV 2 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 84 Proof of Service of Headley, Michael, Sheriff of Doddridge County, WV 1 Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 83 Proof of Service of Guido, Elizabeth Ann Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 82 Proof of Service of Gaskins, Carolyn Sue Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 81 Proof of Service of Friend, Randall Eric Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 80 Proof of Service of Cantrell, Debra Kay Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 79 Proof of Service of Knight, Diana Lynne Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 28, 2017 Filing 78 Proof of Service of Cox, Gayford Alan Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Tenmile Land Limited Liability Company served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Waco Oil & Gas Co., Inc. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE Returned Executed as to XTO Energy, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Mountain V Oil & Gas, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Murvin & Meier Oil Co. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Mike Ross, Inc. served on 2/22/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Diversified Resources, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Armstrong Land Management Company served on 2/22/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Mike Ross Family Foundation, Inc. served on 2/22/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE Returned Executed as to H3 LLC served on 2/22/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Appalachian Royalties, Inc. served on 2/22/2017. (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE Returned Executed as to GTP Towers I, LLC served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Mountain V, LLC served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Energy Holdings LLC served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE Returned Executed as to BB&T Collateral Service Corporation served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE Returned Executed as to S.J.J. Leggett Family, LLC served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE Returned Executed as to The Ohio State University served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE Returned Executed as to East Resources, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (jmm)
February 27, 2017 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 76 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means of CONSOL Mining Company LLC Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 75 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means of CNX Gas Company LLC Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 74 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means of Franklin L. Butler Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Land Management Company. (Giggenbach, Bader)
February 27, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE by Armstrong Land Management Company Notice of Intent (Giggenbach, Bader)
February 27, 2017 Filing 71 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 70 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 27, 2017 Filing 69 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 24, 2017 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal (Dawkins, Lori)
February 24, 2017 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Dawkins, Lori)
February 24, 2017 Filing 66 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 24, 2017 Filing 65 Acceptance of Service by Electronic Means Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 64 Supplemental MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Easements to be Condemned by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 63 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 62 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 61 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 60 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 59 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 58 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 57 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 56 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 55 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 54 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 53 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 52 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 51 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 50 Amended NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Verified Complaint for Condemnation against All Defendants, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Partial Voluntary Dismissal (Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rover Pipeline LLC (Dawkins, Lori)
February 23, 2017 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of the Order Setting Emergency Hearing (Dawkins, Lori)
February 22, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Ford, III on behalf of Paul Amos Smith (Ford, William)
February 21, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Energy Services and Consulting LLC served on 2/16/2017. (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Carnegie Interstate Pipeline Company served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Frontier West Virginia Inc. served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE Returned Executed as to EMAX Oil Company served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Standard Land Company, LLC served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE Returned Executed as to West Union Bank served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Harrison Rural Electrification Association, Inc. served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Silverado Mineral Group, LP served on 2/16/2017.(attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 37 DUPLICATE ENTRY TO #35 - NOTICE Returned Executed as to St. Francis Health Center served on 2/16/2017.(attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd) (Main Document 37 replaced on 2/23/2017) (cnd).
February 21, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE Returned Executed as to St. Francis Hospital Fund served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office) (cnd)
February 21, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE Returned Executed as to Ed Broome, Inc. served on 2/16/2017. (attachments lodged in CBG Clerk's office)(cnd)
February 17, 2017 Filing 33 Certificate fro Service By Publication Other Document filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 17, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rover Pipeline LLC . (Dawkins, Lori)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING EMERGENCY HEARING: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #26 Motion for Expedited Hearing is hereby GRANTED. A hearing on the #25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Easements to be Condemned will be held on 3/2/2017 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/16/17. (cnd)
February 13, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Wilmoth on behalf of Rover Pipeline LLC (Wilmoth, William)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. District Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/10/17. (mh)
February 8, 2017 Filing 28 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for T.A. Zabel: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC001813 (jss)
February 8, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren)
February 7, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and IMMEDIATE ACCESS AND POSSESSION OF EASEMENTS TO BE CONDEMNED by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by Rover Pipeline LLC.(Dawkins, Lori)
February 7, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams, Lauren)
February 7, 2017 Filing 1 FILED IN WRONG CASE (jmm) Modified on 2/7/2017 (jmm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/7/2017 NEF regenerated) (jmm).
February 3, 2017 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION against All Defendants, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-2285641. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tract information, #2 Exhibit B - FERC Order Issuing Certificates, #3 Exhibit C - Map of approved route, #4 Exhibit D - FERC Environmental Impact Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)[Keeley](cnd) Modified filing date on 2/7/2017 (cnd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rover Pipeline LLC v. Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-009.972-TAR-1A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-009.972-TAR-1A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agnes E. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Grable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis Hospital Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Anzel Irene Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah E. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veta M. Balis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret E. Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph H. Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-006.510-ROW-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Fern Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C. Radtka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan O'Brien
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Successors and Assigns of the Estate of Harold G. Worswick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Mary E. Gumprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Paladi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrissy McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah M. Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Swart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad J. Harkness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Mace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Ritchay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Union District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Layne Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Zeigler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Stalling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Raymond Couture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Rural Electrification Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty A. Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred E. Herrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Valenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron H. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Brannon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L. Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard William Herrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Walsh Kadderly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Hilda V. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Dr. Joseph D. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Holliday
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Amos Smith
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-022.000-ROW-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil USA Onshore Properties Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Carpenter Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Fay Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Lavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Jo Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TiAnna Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Vinton W. Knechtges Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Lee Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFW Midstream Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Petz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence E. Sigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence E. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monongahela Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Vinton W. Knechtges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHC-040.000-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Jeremy Herrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida M. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen R. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Beth Smell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kay Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valaria R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascent Resources - Marcellus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell L. Ingalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elta Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Paladi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Connie Prucka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel O. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Joann McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-046.000-ROW-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Cottrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ann Provenzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-023.000-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Department of Transportation, Division of Highways, and Thomas J. Smith, P.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthy Carson Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Eric Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Victor Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Successors and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-016.000-ROW-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Sue Bennett Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Bowyer
Represented By: O. Gay Elmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wolverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Land Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Heidecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Marie Daubenspeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No. WV-DO-SHB-008.000-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Goit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Hellyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHB-021.971-TAR-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverlee Ann Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Collateral Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Herrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles N. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Starlene Bays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Renee Linville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonewall Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Successor and Assigns of the Eastern Oil Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie M. Wolverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Martha Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White & Ellis Drilling Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heirs, Successors, and Assigns of Charles Ray Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie L. Gains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrissa Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Van Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Successors and Assigns of Empire Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Minnear Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis Health Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawna L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R. Valenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Lynne Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Carolyn Grable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kay Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Kovak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. O'Brien
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Sue Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |