Robinson et al v. Pintez et al

Plaintiff: Alajuan Robinson and Reggie Robinson El
Defendant: J.D. Morgan, John Doe and Sgt. Pintez
Case Number: 1:2018cv00151
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Monongalia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 27 RETURN RECEIPT as to #24 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/29/2018, as to Reggie Robinson El. (wrr) Modified on 10/5/2018 to correct filing date (wrr).
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 RETURN RECEIPT as to #24 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/29/2018, as to Alajuan Robinson. (wrr)
September 27, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.D. Morgan, Pintez. (Gamble, Keith)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/11/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018 01:00 PM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. If counsel elects to proceed by telephone, the Court directs lead counsel for the Defendants Pintez and Morgan to arrange the conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court no later than October 24, 2018. Discovery due by 11/1/2018. The Court hereby DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Disclosure (ECF No. #22 ) as the initial disclosure deadline is set in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/26/2018. (Copy to PS Plaintiffs via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 21, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION For Disclosure filed by J.D. Morgan, Pintez. (Gamble, Keith)
September 21, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE by Alajuan Robinson, Reggie Robinson El. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by J.D. Morgan, Pintez. (Gamble, Keith)
September 7, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN RECEIPT as to #17 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, as to Reggie Robinson El. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/2018, per USPS. (wrr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 19 RETURN RECEIPT as to #17 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, as to Alajuan Robinson. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/2018, per USPS. (wrr)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' #8 MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by Alajuan Robinson, Reggie Robinson El. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: The Court denies the Plaintiffs' #5 Petition for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/31/2018. (Copy to PS Plaintiffs via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Roseboro Notice, as to Reggie Robinson El. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/25/2018. (wrr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Roseboro Notice, as to Alajuan Robinson. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/25/2018. (wrr)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ROSEBORO NOTICE re: #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pintez, J.D. Morgan. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, the Plaintiffs shall file any opposition they have to Defendants' motion. The Plaintiffs' response shall not exceed 25 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/23/2018. (Copy to PS Plaintiffs via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 Supplement to Notice of Removal Other Document re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by J.D. Morgan, Pintez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(Gamble, Keith)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 ORDER OF REFERRAL, as to Alajuan Robinson. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/11/2018. (wrr)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, as to Alajuan Robinson. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/9/2018. (wrr)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 ORDER OF REFERRAL, as to Reggie Robinson El. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/11/2018. (wrr)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support by J.D. Morgan, Pintez re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Gamble, Keith)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by J.D. Morgan, Pintez. (Gamble, Keith)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by John Doe.(Miller, Kenneth)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, as to Reggie Robinson El. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/9/2018. (wrr)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Financial Affidavit and Application, #6 State Court Civil Case Info. Sheet, #7 Letter to Circuit Court, #8 State Court certification of record, #9 Letter to Clerk of Court) (wrr)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL: It is ORDERED that the Court REFERS this action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, U. S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/8/2018. (Copy to PS Plaintiffs via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION/PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Alajuan Robinson, Reggie Robinson El. (wrr)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re: #1 Notice of Removal.(Copies to PS Plaintiffs via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 18-C-293), filed by Pintez, J.D. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400 Paid - Receipt #0424-2641694. (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #5 Wrong Document Attached - replaced on 8/7/2018) (wrr). Modified on 8/7/2018 to correct docket text(wrr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Pintez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Morgan
Represented By: Keith C. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Kenneth Alex Miller, II
Represented By: Kenneth R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Pintez
Represented By: Keith C. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alajuan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Robinson El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?