Bartus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richard Bartus
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv00152
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 9 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Walmart Stores East, LP.(Brown, Sara)
September 19, 2018 8 Featured Case FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Thescheduling conference may be by telephone. If counsel elect to proceed by telephone, the Court directs lead counsel for the plaintiff to arrange the conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court no later than November 29, 2018. If counsel elect to appear in person, counsel shall notify the Court no later than November 20, 2018. Discovery due by 12/6/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/19/2018. (wrr)
September 19, 2018 7 Featured Case AGREED ORDER DISMISSING WAL-MART STORES, INC. AND SUBSTITUTING WALMART STORES EAST, LP: It is ORDERED that Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action and shall be deleted from the style of the case, and Walmart Stores East, LP shall be properly substituted as the correct Defendant in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/19/2018. (wrr)
September 18, 2018 6 Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Walmart Stores, Inc. and Substituting Walmart Stores East, LP by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Brown, Sara)
September 17, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 9/11/2018. (mh)
August 30, 2018 3 Proposed Summons to be Issued Other Document filed by Richard Bartus. (Colombo, Dino)
August 29, 2018 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by Richard Bartus against Richard Bartus, filed by Richard Bartus.(Colombo, Dino)
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Richard Bartus. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2642506. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bartus
Represented By: Kala Leane Sowers
Represented By: Dino S. Colombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?