Spears v. Cable News Network, CNN
Plaintiff: John K. Spears
Defendant: Cable News Network, CNN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00162
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 RETURN RECEIPT as to #20 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on (Per USPS 10/6/18). (mh)
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cable News Network, CNN. (Flaherty, Thomas)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Motion to be permitted to file electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/3/18. (mh) (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 Per PS Plaintiff, Motion to be permitted to file electronically by John K. Spears. (mh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DENY MOTION TO DISMISS re #17 Response to Motion by John K. Spears. (mh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss/RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John K. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Misc. Information, #2 Exhibit B - Misc. Information, #3 Exhibit C - Misc. Information, #4 Exhibit D - Return Receipt Card and Misc. Document)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (mh).
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cable News Network, CNN. (Flaherty, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cable News Network, CNN. (Flaherty, Thomas)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Charles D. Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/27/18. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Charles D. Tobin PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002353. (wrr)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Tobin by Cable News Network, CNN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Thomas)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 Attorney used incorrect event, Attorney refiled document (see docket entry #12 ) Other Document Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Cable News Network, CNN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Thomas) Modified on 9/27/2018 (mh). NEF regen.
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 Document to Defendant filed by John K. Spears. (mh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Letter to Defendant filed by John K. Spears. (mh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cable News Network, CNN served on 9/7/2018. (mh)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on (Per USPS 8/24/18). (mh)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/22/2018, per USPS. (wrr)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL referring case to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/21/18. (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002322. (mh)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cable News Network, CNN, filed by John K. Spears. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 8/20/18 from Plaintiff to Defendant)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Cable News Network, CNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, CNN
Represented By: Charles D. Tobin
Represented By: Thomas V. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?