Herrington v. Continental American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: James Herrington
Defendant: Continental American Insurance Company and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00175
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISSMISAL ORDER; It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/9/2018. (jmm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Pretrial Order Dismissal Order by James Herrington. (Grunau, David)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court DIRECTS counsel to forward an appropriate dismissal order within thirty (30) days following the entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/14/2018. (wrr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by James Herrington (Grunau, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Continental American Insurance Company. (Funari, Brad)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County (case number 18-C-314) (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Interrogatories, #2 summons, #3 Notice Of Removal, #4 cover letter) (jmm)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/18/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/10/2018. (wrr)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County WV, (case number 18-C-314), filed by Continental American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Copy of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C 3 Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2661558. (jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrington v. Continental American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Herrington
Represented By: David M. Grunau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad A Funari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?