Maier v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Maier
Defendant: Bradley Scott Campbell and Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00217
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America.. (Pentino, Denise)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/17/19. (cnd)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Nationwide Insurance Company of America re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pentino, Denise)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Pentino, Denise)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Marion County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, Notice and Notice of Removal) (cnd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marion County, (case number 18-C-178) filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2718669 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - WVSOS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Return on Bradley Scott Campbell, #5 Exhibit 5 Marion County Docket, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nationwide Policy Declarations, #7 Exhibit 7 - State of Ohio Certificate, #8 Exhibit 8 - Memo re Medical Bills, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maier v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Maier
Represented By: Kevin T. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?