Allergan Sales, LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, LTD. and Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Sandoz Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, LTD., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00226
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 279 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #278 Order Dismissing Case. Copy to Trademark/Patent Office. (wrr)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 STIPULATION AND ORDER: This Stipulation And Order shall finally resolve the Action. All other claims, defenses, and counterclaims asserted by the parties against each other in Plaintiffs' and Mylan's pleadings in the Action, including the allegations and averments contained therein, are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/27/2018. (wrr)
December 24, 2018 Filing 277 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Companion, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 275 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Jack B. Blumenfeld, Jeremy Tigan, Adam W. Poff, Deepro R. Mukerjee, Joseph M. Janusz, Lance A. Soderstrom, Robert M. Vrana, and Stephanie M. Roberts. (wrr)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court SCHEDULES a status conference by telephone for Thursday, January 24, 2019, at 1:30 P.M. The defendant is DIRECTED to provide call-in information to all parties and the Court, by email to candace_levitsky@wvnd.uscourts.gov, no later than Friday, January 18, 2019, at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/20/2018. (wrr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 272 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:16-cv-01114. (cmd)
December 19, 2018 The case as it relates to the claims, defenses, and counterclaims asserted against or by MPI are hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SO ORDERED re (D.I. 270 in 16-cv-1114-RGA; D.I. 9 in 18-cv-482-RGA) Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00482-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 270 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORAL ORDER: The request at D.I. #268 is APPROVED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 268 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert M. Vrana regarding status report on venue dispute. (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORAL ORDER: The briefing schedule on "improper venue" was stayed on June 12, 2018, pursuant to the parties' request. (D.I. #181 ). The Court requests that the parties update the Court on the status of the "improper venue" issue. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/28/2018. (nms) Modified on 12/6/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed at D.I. 265 has been removed per counsel's request. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 266 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Robert S. Langer, Sc.D. Regarding [Teva's, Mylan's, and Sandoz's] ANDA Products; and (2) Expert Report of Nimish B. Vakil, M.D. Regarding [Teva's, Mylan's, and Sandoz's] ANDA Products, separately on their respective counsel filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Opening Expert Report of Jeffrey L. Barnett, M.D. in Support of Invalidity of the Patents in Suit; 2) Opening Expert Report of Lawrence H. Block, Ph.D., FAPRS, FAAPS, and 3) Opening Expert Report of Stephen Brian Henry Kent, Ph.D. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #263 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 263 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 11/5/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SO ORDERED, re #260 Stipulation and Order Regarding Authenticity of Certain Business Records. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 260 STIPULATION Regarding Authenticity of Certain Business Records by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 259 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2, 5-6, and 9-10) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 258 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Infringement Claim Charts For Defendant Mylan Relating To The 72 ug ANDA Product filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 257 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Chien on September 20, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 256 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Linda Kunka on September 26, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 255 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Poff, Adam) Modified on 9/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #254 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher B. Ferenc, filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/11/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 254 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher B. Ferenc - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Seventh Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Remark: The main pdf at D.I. #250 has been replaced per D.I. 252 . (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORAL ORDER: The request found at D.I. #251 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 251 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding corrected version of the Amended Complaint (D.I. #250 ) . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Amended Complaint)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/5/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 250 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.- filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(nms) (Main Document 250 replaced on 9/5/2018) (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SO ORDERED Granting #248 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(2). The motion to amend (D.I. #231 ) is granted. The motion to dismiss (D.I. #214 ) is withdrawn as moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 248 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice, by Allergan USA Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/30/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SO ORDERED, re #246 STIPULATION and Proposed Order (see Order for further deadlines). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 246 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 8/23/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #245 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial invalidity contentions as to its ANDA No. 211381 to September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 245 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve initial invalidity contentions as to its ANDA No. 211381 to September 4, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SO ORDERED Granting #243 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/17/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 243 STIPULATION of Dismissal only as to U.S. Patent No. 8,933,030, by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/16/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SO ORDERED Granting #241 Stipulation of Dismissal (*Party Sandoz Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 241 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(2), by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/16/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #240 STIPULATION and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin S. Masar III, PhD, filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 240 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #239 STIPULATION and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2018. (ksr, ) Modified on 8/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 239 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 8/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin S. Masar III, PhD - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Forest's Privilege and Redaction Log; and (2) the Privilege Log for Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 236 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Katie Reed on August 16, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 120-21) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #233 STIPULATION and Proposed Order (*Set Briefing Schedule: re #214 MOTION to Dismiss with respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371. Answering Brief due 8/10/2018., Reply Brief due 9/6/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 233 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 7/27/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #231 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/9/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notices of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., and Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibits A-H, #3 Exhibits 2)(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 7/26/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #229 STIPULATION and Proposed Order (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #214 MOTION to Dismiss with respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371. Answering Brief due 7/27/2018, Reply Brief due 8/8/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Sandoz Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 229 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 7/25/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos.1-4) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Non-Party Ralph Giannella's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Document Subpoena; (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Document Subpoena to Ralph Giannella; (3) Non-Party Henry Wolfe's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Document Subpoena; and (4) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Document Subpoena to Henry Wolfe filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #226 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura L. Fairneny. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 226 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura L. Fairneny - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Claim Charts for Defendant Mylan Relating to the 72ug ANDA Product filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Teva Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) (2) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bernard Domnic on August 14, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Parag Shah on August 13, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yasser Gwad on August 8, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 220 REDACTED VERSION of #215 Opening Brief in Support, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12)(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Sixth Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 110-111) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., and Allergan USA, Inc. and 2. Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants (Nos. 110-111) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 215 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #214 MOTION to Dismiss the 9,708,371 Patent, filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-12)(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 7/11/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 214 MOTION to Dismiss with respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 7/11/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 110-111) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE of Deposition Subpoena of Henry R. Wolfe, by Sandoz Inc.. (Bilson, David) Modified on 7/10/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE of Deposition Subpoena of Ralph Giannella, by Sandoz Inc.. (Bilson, David) Modified on 7/10/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 210 NOTICE of Document Subpoena of Henry R. Wolfe, by Sandoz Inc.. (Bilson, David) Modified on 7/10/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE of Document Subpoena of Ralph Giannella, by Sandoz Inc.. (Bilson, David) Modified on 7/10/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of #190 Notice to Take Deposition, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #189 Notice to Take Deposition by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 206 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Notice to Take Deposition, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 5, 2018 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI #188 , #189 , and #190 . (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #205 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 1) Plaintiffs to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Mylan's Counterclaim; and 2) Plaintiffs to Serve Paragraph 4.c Disclosures to 1) July 10, 2018; and 2) July 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 205 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 1) Plaintiffs to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Mylan's Counterclaim; and 2) Plaintiffs to Serve Paragraph 4.c Disclosures to 1) July 10, 2018; and 2) July 12, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Derstine on August 11, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Xiaohong Qi on August 10, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kinjal Suchak on July 30, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Melissa Henry on July 31, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jyoti Sachdeva on July 27, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Kirsch on July 26, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Witowski on August 15, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shalina Mahajan-Miklos on July 27, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark G. Currie on August 1, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hong Zhao on July 24, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Caroline Kurtz on August 8, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Angelika Fretzen on August 16, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 120-21) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #191 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 4.c of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery with Respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371 and MPI's ANDA to July 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 191 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 4.c of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery with Respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371 and MPI's ANDA to July 5, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 190 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on August 9, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 189 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandoz Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on August 3, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 188 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on July 30, 2018 filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #187 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson Mackavage, filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan Sales LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 187 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson Mackavage - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Paragrah 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #184 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to counterclaims to July 3, 2018, filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan Sales LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2018. (ksr, ) Modified on 6/21/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Claim Charts for Defendant Teva Relating to the 72 g ANDA Product filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 184 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to counterclaims to July 3, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 6/21/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #183 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of the Court's Defautl Standard for Discovery, including ESI, with repsect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371 and MPI's ANDA to June 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 183 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of the Court's Defautl Standard for Discovery, including ESI, with repsect to U.S. Patent No. 9,708,371 and MPI's ANDA to June 27, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court will stay briefing on MPI's renewed motion to dismiss as requested in D.I. #181 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants (Nos. 110-111) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 181 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Maryellen Noreika, regarding status. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 6/11/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORAL ORDER: The Court requests a status report following up on the status report of March 21, 2018. (D.I. #148 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 30, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 179 has been amended to reflect Sandoz, Inc. is not terminated. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SO ORDERED, Granting #178 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2018. (nms) Modified on 5/30/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 178 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/29/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan (Nos. 72-109) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #173 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) Plaintifffs to submit their Answer to Sandoz's counterclaims; (2) Plaintiffs to serve Paragraph 4(a) disclosures; and (3) Sandoz's substantial completion of document production. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SO ORDERED Granting #170 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery and (2) Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 174 ANSWER to Teva's Counterclaims, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 173 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) Plaintifffs to submit their Answer to Sandoz's counterclaims; (2) Plaintiffs to serve Paragraph 4(a) disclosures; and (3) Sandoz's substantial completion of document production for documents located outside of the United States to (1) May 29, 2018; (2) May 29, 2018; and (3) June 11, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #171 STIPULATION and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure of Electronically Stored Information Regarding the Accused Generic Capsule Products Containing 72 mg of Linaclotide filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 171 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 170 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 169 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,708,371 B2 . (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 168 ANSWER to Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vrana, Robert) Modified on 5/10/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #167 STIPULATION and Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 167 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME 1) Plaintiffs to Respond to Teva Counterclaim; 2) Plaintiffs to serve Para. 4a Disclosure including ESI; 3) Plaintiffs & Teva to Exchange Para. 3 Disclosures re. Accused Teva Generic Product to May 14, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 SO ORDERED re #165 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/7/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/4/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE of of Change of Firm Affiliation, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) Modified on 5/4/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #160 STIPULATION to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #161 STIPULATION and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 163 REDACTED VERSION of #162 Letter by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 162 [SEALED] Joint Status Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Maryellen Noreika. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/1/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 161 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/1/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 160 STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 5/1/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Teva (Nos. 72-109) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #158 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 5/9/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 158 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Poff, Adam) Modified on 4/24/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #157 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Hill of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP, filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan Sales LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Hill of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #156 STIPULATION and Order to Extend certain deadlines (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION and Order to Extend certain deadlines - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 4/19/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #155 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the substantial completion of document production to May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 155 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the substantial completion of document production to May 11, 2018 - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, Granting #154 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 4/17/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan (Nos. 72-109) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SO ORDERED Granting (7 in 18-cv-482-RGA, 151 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00482-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Teva (Nos. 72-109) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORAL ORDER: The schedule proposed at D.I. #148 is APPROVED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/23/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 148 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Maryellen Noreika regarding status of Mylan venue-related discovery. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #147 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Joint Status Report to March 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/20/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #146 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to counterclaims and the date for substantial completion of document production to April 19, 2018 and April 30, 2018, respectively. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 147 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Joint Status Report to March 21, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/19/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 146 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the plaintiffs to move, answer, or otherwise respond to defendant's counterclaim and the date for substantial completion of document production to April 19, 2018 and April 30, 2018, respectively - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sharick Naqi as co-counsel.. (Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #143 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/14/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SO ORDERED re (9 in 18-cv-198-RGA, 142 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00198-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #143 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION To Extend Time - filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Main Document 143 replaced on 3/13/2018) (nms). Modified on 3/14/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Corrected First Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1 - 119) filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosure of Electronically Stored Information filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 139 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Sandoz Inc. filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 138 ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against all Plaintiffs, by Sandoz Inc..(Phillips, John) Modified on 2/21/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: The parties SHALL SUBMIT A FURTHER STATUS REPORT on or about March 19, 2018, which may include a briefing schedule should the parties think that appropriate. MPI's opening brief (D.I. #68 ) WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Briefing on the motion (D.I. #67 ) should begin with a new opening brief. The motion to dismiss (D.I. #67 ) is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until it is briefed and ready to be decided. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 VENUE-RELATED DISCOVERY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 135 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jack B. Blumenfeld, regarding status. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/15/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 SO ORDERED Granting (7 in 18-cv-171-RGA, 133 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00171-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Joint Status Report to February 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Joint Status Report to February 14, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Poff, Adam) Modified on 2/8/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 131 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd. filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SO ORDERED Granting #129 Stipulation to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 129 STIPULATION to Substitute Party, by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/8/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiffs and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are requested to submit a joint status report concerning discovery, any related issues, and the motion for change of venue (D.I. #67 ) by COB February 9, 2018, including, if reasonably possible, a schedule for completing briefing on the motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Claim Charts for Defendant Teva filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SO ORDERED, Granting (D.I. 10 in 17-cv-1728-RGA, and D.I. 124 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:17-cv-01728-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan USA Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Invalidity Contentions filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures, filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/28/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE of Change of Address, by Allergan USA Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 12/28/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Claim Charts for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 118 ANSWER to Counterclaim (see D.I. 7 in C.A. No. 17-1481-RGA), by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 12/6/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Brian G. Fahrenbach as co-counsel. Reason for request: Mr. Fahrenbach is no longer associated with Rakoczy Molino Mazzochi Siwik LLP.. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SO ORDERED Granting (9 in 17-cv-1481-RGA, 115 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/29/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:17-cv-01481-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Robert M. Vrana re #113 Transcript,, (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 113 Official Transcript of discovery conference held on September 28, 2017 before Judge Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2018. (vjg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 112 Amended Notice of Service of Core Technical Documents, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/9/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORAL ORDER: The Markman Hearing scheduled for May 16, 2018, is now CANCELED (see D.I. #110 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 110 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Maryellen Noreika regarding claim construction. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 2, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The letter filed at D.I. 110 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. The letter was prematurely filed. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simeon G. Papacostas, filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/12/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simeon G. Papacostas - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Proposed Claim Terms for Construction filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 106 ANSWER to Counterclaims (see D.I. 8 in C.A. No. 17-1210-RGA), by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 10/6/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference was held on 9/28/2017. Counsel present for Plaintiffs: J. Blumenfeld, M. Noreika. Counsel present for Defendants: A. Poff, D. Mukerjee, L. Soderstrom, S. Roberts, R. Vrana. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-11); and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-119) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 10 in 17-cv-1210-RGA, and D.I. 102 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:17-cv-01210-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Consolidation by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 101 REDACTED VERSION of #98 Letter by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 100 REDACTED VERSION of #99 Letter, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Poff, Adam) Modified on 9/26/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 99 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Adam W. Poff, Esq. regarding Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Submission Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of September 25, 2017 - re 97 Oral Order. (Poff, Adam) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 98 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to the Court's September 25, 2017 Oral Order - re 97 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested to submit letters by Tuesday, September 26, 2017, at 12:00 pm the effect of In re Cray on the issues in dispute at D.I. 93 & 94. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/25/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority Regarding Venue Letters (D.I. [93, #94 ), by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Poff, Adam) Modified on 9/25/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 95 REDACTED VERSION of #94 Letter by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Poff, Adam) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 94 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Adam W. Poff regarding response to Letter of September 19, 2017 (D.I. #93 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poff, Adam) Modified on 9/21/2017 (nms). Modified on 9/21/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 93 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Mylan Discovery Responses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Joint Initial Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Adam Wyatt Poff. Attorney James M. Lennon terminated. (Poff, Adam) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 9/28/2017, at 4:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian G. Fahrenbach for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian G. Fahrenbach, filed by Sandoz Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian G. Fahrenbach - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brian G. Fahrenbach)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' First Set of Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-119), and 2) Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-11) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan Regarding Venue (Nos. 1-17) and 2) Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Mylan Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Regarding Venue (Nos. 1-11) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne S. Toker of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART, & SULLIVAN, LLP filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne S. Toker of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART, & SULLIVAN, LLP - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SO ORDERED re #83 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 83 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 8/9/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER regarding dispute over protective order (see D.I. #74 , #79 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SO ORDERED, re #80 Stipulation and Order regarding response to D.I. #67 . Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and Order, by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 8/3/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 79 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Discovery Dispute - re #74 Letter. (Matterer, Mary) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on August 17, 2017 filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith Meckstroth on August 16, 2017 filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan Regarding Venue (Nos. 1-17) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Dismis for Improper Venue to August 3, 2017 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue. Answering Brief due 8/3/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Dismis for Improper Venue to August 3, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 7/28/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 74 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding proposed version of Paragraphs 14.c and 19 of the Stipulated Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 73 REDACTED VERSION of #69 Declaration by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 72 REDACTED VERSION of #68 Opening Brief in Support by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Core Technical Document Production filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s core technical documents related to ANDA No. 209564 pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 69 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Keith Meckstroth re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) Modified on 7/14/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 68 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2017. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Noorossadat Torabi, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/5/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Noorossadat Torabi - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #60 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order to July 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s [Confidential - Outside Counsel Attorney's Eyes Only] Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) Modified on 6/27/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure of Electronically Stored Information filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 60 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order to July 10, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: A teleconference regarding mediation was held on June 12, 2017 in this matter. As a result, IT IS ORDERED that within ten (10) days after issuance of the Markman decision, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information contained in this Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/17. (cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order to June 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their respective Initial Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information to June 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their respective Initial Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information to June 26, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order to June 26, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 55 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Aurobindo's responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Aurobindo's responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants (Nos. 1-71) (2) Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sandoz Inc.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Answer and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants (Nos. 1-4); and (2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-71) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4); 2) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-71), and 3) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/12/2017 at 1:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/2/17. (cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
June 2, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Robert M. Vrana. Attorney Gregory J. Brodzik terminated. (Vrana, Robert) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 7/27/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2018. Discovery due by 8/17/2018. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/13/2018. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/16/2018, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/7/2019, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. A 4 day Bench Trial is set for 6/17/2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/19/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2017. Appearances: J. Blumenfeld, P. Armenio, G. Morris for Plaintiffs; K. Dorsney, S. Patel, J. Lennon, S. Roberts, D. Bilson, J. Marx, K. Keller, S. Park for Defendants. (Court Reporter Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 43 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 5/17/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants (Nos. 1 - 4) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants (Nos. 1 - 71) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. Smith and Attorney Sailesh Patel, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/21/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. Smith and Attorney Sailesh Patel - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 21, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John K. Hsu,Joel M. Wallace for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)[Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John K. Hsu and Attorney Joel M. Wallace, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John K. Hsu and Attorney Joel M. Wallace - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 39 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall correct the Judge's initials in the case caption and refile the document. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Ashley M. Fry as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Quinn Emanuel. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/19/2017, at 3:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/11/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Aurobindo defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 6, 2017 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 4/6/2017; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 4/6/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Aurobindo defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 6, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory A. Morris and Vikram A. Mathrani. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory A. Morris and Vikram A. Mathrani - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Robert B. Wilson, Krista M. Rycroft, Ashley M. Fry and Sky Adams of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart, & Sullivan LLP, filed by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/3/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Robert B. Wilson, Krista M. Rycroft, Ashley M. Fry and Sky Adams of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart, & Sullivan LLP - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to #24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 23, 2017, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2017. (ksr, ) Modified on 2/21/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to March 23, 2017 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 2/21/2017 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 6, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M. Janusz for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 6, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee,Lance A Soderstrom,Stephanie M. Roberts for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Aurobindo defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 21, 2017 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 2/21/2017; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 2/21/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 3, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Aurobindo defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 21, 2017 - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee, Attorney Lance Soderstrom, Attorney Stephanie M. Roberts and Attorney Joseph M. Janusz, filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/2/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee, Attorney Lance Soderstrom, Attorney Stephanie M. Roberts and Attorney Joseph M. Janusz - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 2, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William A. Rakoczy,Cynthia H. Sun,Kevin P. Burke,Lauren M. Lesko,Jeffrey A Marx,Deanne M. Mazzochi for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
February 2, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul J. Molino for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Jeffrey A. Marx, Kevin P. Burke, Lauren M. Lesko and Cynthia H. Sun, filed by Sandoz Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Jeffrey A. Marx, Kevin P. Burke, Lauren M. Lesko and Cynthia H. Sun - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William A. Rakoczy, #2 Certification of Paul J. Molino, #3 Certification of Deanne M. Mazzochi, #4 Certification of Jeffrey A. Marx, #5 Certification of Kevin P. Burke, #6 Certification of Lauren M. Lesko, #7 Certification of Cynthia H. Sun)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Sandoz Inc. filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Sandoz Inc..(Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 6, 2017 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 2/6/2017; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 2/6/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 6, 2017 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 23, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharick Naqi, Christopher B. Essig, Bryce A. Cooper, Samuel S. Park, Jason Pesick for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi, Samuel S. Park, Christopher B. Essig, Bryce A. Cooper, Sharick Naqi, and Jason Z. Pesick, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2017. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi, Samuel S. Park, Christopher B. Essig, Bryce A. Cooper, Sharick Naqi, and Jason Z. Pesick - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 12/1/2016, answer due 1/30/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen)[Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. on 12/1/2016 by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/3/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2016, answer due 1/30/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 12/1/2016 by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/3/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2016, answer due 1/30/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sandoz Inc. on 12/1/2016 by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/3/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2016, answer due 1/30/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 12/1/2016 by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/3/2017. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. on 12/1/2016; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 12/1/2016; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 12/1/2016; Sandoz Inc. on 12/1/2016; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 12/1/2016. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 7 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,304,036 B2; 7,371,727 B2; 7,704,947 B2; 7,745,409 B2; 8,080,526 B2. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 6 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 10/18/2016. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/29/2020. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 5 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/3/2016. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/29/2020. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/3/2016. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/29/2020. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 10/24/2016. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/29/2020. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2038253.) - filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-I, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan Sales, LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Laboratories Holdings, LTD.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Cynthia H. Sun
Represented By: Lauren M. Lesko
Represented By: Brian G. Fahrenbach
Represented By: Jeffrey A Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma, LTD.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Joel M. Wallace
Represented By: John K. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Stephanie M. Roberts
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Bryce A. Cooper
Represented By: Samuel S. Park
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Sharick Naqi
Represented By: Jason Pesick
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?