Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Forest Laboratories Holdings, LTD.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00227
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #17 Order Dismissing Case. Copy to Trademark/Patent Office. (wrr)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER: This Stipulation And Order shall finally resolve the Action. All other claims, defenses, and counterclaims asserted by the parties against each other in Plaintiffs' and Mylan's pleadings in the Action, including the allegations and averments contained therein, are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/27/2018. (wrr)
December 24, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Companion, James)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: It is ORDERED that the Court SCHEDULES a Status Conference for 1/24/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/20/18. (cnd)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Blumenfeld, Poff and Vrana re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (cnd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-00482. (cnd)
December 19, 2018 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re (D.I. 270 in 16-cv-1114-RGA; D.I. 9 in 18-cv-482-RGA) Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00482-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
August 30, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation filed at D.I. 9 has been removed per the directive at D.I. #8 . (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SO ORDERED Granting (7 in 18-cv-482-RGA, 151 in 16-cv-1114-RGA) Stipulation and Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01114-RGA, 1:18-cv-00482-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order of Consolidation by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. (Noreika, Maryellen) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 3/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc (f/k/a Actavis plc) for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd. filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,304,036 B2; 7,371,727 B2; 7,704,947 B2; 7,745,409 B2; 8,080,526 B2. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/14/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/14/2020. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2351026.) - filed by Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Laboratories Holdings, LTD.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?