Goode v. Precision Pipeline, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tina L. Goode
Defendant: Levi Theis and Precision Pipeline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00230
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Precision Pipeline, LLC, Levi Theis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Hill, Cy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tina L. Goode. (Tyree, D.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of by Precision Pipeline, LLC, Levi Theis re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hill, Cy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Precision Pipeline, LLC, Levi Theis. (Hill, Cy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed from SOS as to Levi Theis served on 1/23/2019. (jmm)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 01:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2019. (jmm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Levi Theis served on 1/8/2019. (wrr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Precision Pipeline, LLC served on 1/8/2019. (wrr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Entry done in error Attorney admitted on 12/20/2018VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to D. Scott Tyree. (wrr) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct docket text. (cmd).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precision Pipeline, LLC, Levi Theis, filed by Tina L. Goode. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2729123. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goode v. Precision Pipeline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Theis
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina L. Goode
Represented By: D. Scott Tyree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?