Due et al v. FCI Gilmer

Petitioner: Randall Due and Brent Swallers
Respondent: FCI Gilmer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Michael John Aloi
1 Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Brent Swallers on 3/1/19. (jss)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Randy Due on 3/1/19. (jss)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS: This action is hereby DISMISSED and all matters relating to Due and Swallers 2241 petition shall proceed in Civil Action No. 2:19cv7. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Petitioners in response to #4 Letter. (copy Petitioners) (cnd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Plaintiffs to the Clerk, requesting BOP addresses and forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(response letter to follow)(cnd)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Brent Swallers and Randall Due on 1/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Randall Due) (jss)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Court approved 2241 packet, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against FCI Gilmer filed by Randall Due and Brent Swallers. (Kleeh, Aloi, Williams) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Due et al v. FCI Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Due
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brent Swallers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?