Miller v. Lougery et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Miller
Defendant: Stephen Fitz, DeAndra Burton, Justice Margert Workman, Michael Palmer, Justice Robin Davis, Justice Allen Lougery, Ashley Hunt, Phillip D. Gaujot, Edward Rollo, Mrs. DeChristopher, Day Report Officer Westfall, Judge John Preston Bailey, Justice Beth Walker, William Pennington, Lisa Barrett and Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Michael John Aloi
1 Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/11/2019. (wrr)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, #3 Letter from Clerk re: filing fee. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/2/2019. (wrr)
February 5, 2019 Case Transfer Complete - Case transferred to Southern District of West Virginia on 2/5/2019. Southern District of West Virginia's case number is 2:19cv87. (wrr)
February 4, 2019 Case transferred to District of Southern District of West Virginia. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (wrr)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: It is ORDERED that this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/4/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Internet Crime Complaint filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Teresa Miller regarding filing fee for #1 Complaint, filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved IFP Form)(Mailed via CM, RRR)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Complaint.(Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Teresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Letter from US Department of Justice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Allen Lougery, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Beth Walker, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Robin Davis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Margert Workman, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Phillip D. Gaujot, #7 Civil Cover Sheet John Preston Bailey, #8 Civil Cover Sheet William Pennington, #9 Civil Cover Sheet DeAndra Burton, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Ashley Hunt, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Michael Palmer, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Stephen Fitz, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Edward Rollo, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Lisa Barrett, #15 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Lougery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Fitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAndra Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Margert Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Robin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Allen Lougery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip D. Gaujot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. DeChristopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day Report Officer Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John Preston Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Beth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?