Japan Tobacco Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Plaintiff: Japan Tobacco Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AMENDING PLANNING ORDER. Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/4/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/18/2019. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/21/19. (mh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION Extension of certain Planning dates by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER (For reasons appearing to the Court, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 4/18/2019, is RESCHEDULED for 5/2/2019, at 3:00 PM, in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. The hearing will be conducted by telephone. Counsel for the Plaintiff is directed to provide call-in information to all parties and the Court, by email to Candace_Levitsky@wvnd.uscourts.gov, no later than April 26, 2019.) Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/12/2019. (dk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 Pro Hac Filing fee as to Dominick Conde: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002511. Replaces receipt number WVNC002482 on DE #16 which was voided. (wrr)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Robert A. Delafield II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mylan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/5/19. (mh)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Nicole W. Stafford to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mylan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/5/19. (mh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 PHV Filing fee for Stafford and Delafield: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002485. (mh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Robert A. Delafield II) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nicole W. Stafford) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Dominick A. Conde to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/31/19. (mh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 PHV Filing fee for Dominick Conde: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002482. Voided-see DE #23 for correct receipt. (mh) Modified on 2/15/2019 to correct docket text (wrr).
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dominick A. Conde by Japan Tobacco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Bruce C. Haas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/31/19. (mh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 PHV Filing fee for Bruce Haas: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002480 (mh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Bruce C. Haas by Japan Tobacco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/29/19. (mh)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Christopher E. Loh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/28/19. (mh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Christopher E. Loh PAID: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002477. (wrr)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher E. Loh by Japan Tobacco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002086 (mh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Emailed to Attorneys Haas, Conde and Loh. (mh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Japan Tobacco Inc. (mh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental Information For Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Japan Tobacco Inc. (mh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Japan Tobacco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Japan Tobacco Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Japan Tobacco Inc.
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Dominick A. Conde
Represented By: Christopher E. Loh
Represented By: Bruce C. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Delafield, II
Represented By: Nicole Stafford
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?