GAUS et al v. THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: Kristi Gaus and Frank Gaus, III
Defendant: CBRE Group, Inc., March-Westin Company, Inc., McDonough, Bolyard, Peck, Inc., The General Services Administration Of The United States Of America, FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., KPN Architects, LLC, EYP Mission Critical Facilities, Inc., The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Of The United States Of America and EXP Global, Inc.
Cross Defendant: TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA and SQUARE-D COMPANY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 137 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Frank Gaus, III.(Trivelli, Vincent)
March 27, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario R. Bordogna on behalf of EYP Mission Critical Facilities, Inc.(a Corporation) (Bordogna, Mario)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/25/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Kleeh Chambers before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/22/19. (mh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #118 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Vertex's Third-Party Complaint by Tri-County Electric Company filed by Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc.. (Heflin, Stanley)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #129 Notice/Motion for substitution of counsel. AUSA Erin Reisenweber added as counsel for The General Services Administration of the USA and The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration of the USA. AUSA Michael C. Colville terminated. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/15/19. (mh)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Greg A. Ray terminated. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/15/19. (mh)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER OF COURT granting #120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vincent P. Lamperski terminated. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/15/19. (mh)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Samuel J. Pasquarelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/14/19. (mh)
February 14, 2019 District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh added. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. (mh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Reisenweber on behalf of The General Services Administration Of The United States Of America, The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Of The United States Of America (Reisenweber, Erin) Modified on 2/14/2019 to change to a pending motion. NEF regen (mh).
February 14, 2019 Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley added. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh no longer assigned to case. (mh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Moritz on behalf of McDonough, Bolyard, Peck, Inc. (Moritz, Kristen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 127 PHV Filing fee for Samuel J. Pasquarelli on behalf of Plaintiffs: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002496 (mh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Samual J. Pasquarelli by Frank Gaus, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Trivelli, Vincent)
February 11, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Trivelli on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trivelli, Vincent)
February 8, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by BreiAnne Varner Redd on behalf of EXP Global, Inc. (Redd, BreiAnne) (Main Document 124 replaced on 2/11/2019) (mh). Modified on 2/11/2019 to replace with properly formatted document. NEF regen (mh).
February 8, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin F. O'Brien on behalf of EXP Global, Inc. (O'Brien, Melvin) (Main Document 123 replaced on 2/11/2019) (mh). Modified on 2/11/2019 to replace with properly formatted document. NEF regen. (mh).
February 8, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw Greg A. Ray, Esquire by Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley A. Heflin on behalf of Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc. (Heflin, Stanley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw Vincent P. Lamperski, Esq. by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T DeMasters on behalf of Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc. (DeMasters, Peter)
February 7, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Sunseri, Anthony)
February 5, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Pie, Jr on behalf of KPN Architects, LLC (Pie, Thomas)
January 31, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony C. Sunseri on behalf of TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY (Sunseri, Anthony)
January 29, 2019 Filing 115 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Michael C. Colville. (To Counsel via USPS - no email address available) (mh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 114 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys James Leety, Vincent Lamperski, Katherine Lowery, Katherine McLay, Stephanie Solomon. (mh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 113 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Samuel Pasquarelli, Greg Ray, Ashley Rodgers, Michael Weiner, Michael Cremonese, Christopher Lee and Benjamin Martin.(mh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 112 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:17-cv-00471. (mh)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant Tri-County Electric Companys motion for leave to withdraw as counsel (Doc. No. 100), is GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Katherine J. McLay as counsel of record in the above-captioned action; 2. Plaintiffs motions to amend (Doc. Nos. 102, 107), this Courts Memorandum and Order dated February 15, 2018 (Doc. Nos, 97, 97-1), are DENIED AS MOOT; 3. This Courts Memorandum and Order dated February 15, 2018 (Doc. Nos. 97, 97-1), are VACATED as to the Courts prior dismissal of KPN from the above-captioned action; 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to REINSTATE KPN as a Defendant in the above-captioned action; 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, and 6. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 1/29/2019. (ve-PAMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 110 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to #103 Notice of Appeal filed by KRISTI GAUS, FRANK GAUS, III. (kr3) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 21, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #109 Notice. ERROR: Discovery is not filed with the District Court. CORRECTION: In the future, please do not file these types of documents with the District Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA (Arnold, Christopher) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Arnold on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA. (Arnold, Christopher) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION to Amendt #102 Order Dismissing Action to Provide for Transfer of This Case to Another Jurisdiction by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, SQUARE-D COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Leety on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA. (Leety, James) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #97 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0315-4659944. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION To Amend Order Dismissing Action to Provide for Transfer of This Case to Another Jurisdiction by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLay, Katherine) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 99 Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition re #85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) Text modified on 2/21/2018. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 101 Minute Entry for Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2018 before Judge Yvette Kane. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 98 Supplemental BRIEF in Support re #85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Solomon, Stephanie) Text modified on 2/20/2018. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM & ORDER - upon consideration of Defendant KPN Architects, LLC (KPN)'s #73 motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), IT IS ORDERED THAT KPNs motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT all claims asserted against KPN are DISMISSED, and the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE KPN from the caption of the above-captioned action. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 2/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Order) (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management conference originally scheduled in the above-captioned action for January 29, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Doc. No. #94 ), is CONTINUED to February 16, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 1/19/18. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 95 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a Case Management Conference is set for 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before January 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 12/7/17. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE Defendant Corgan Architect Associates, Inc. as a Defendant in the above-captioned action. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 12/1/17. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 11/30/2017 before Judge Yvette Kane. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT a status conference is scheduled in the above-captioned action for November 30, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. The Court prefers to conduct this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 11/2217. (rwMD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
November 1, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #89 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Opposition to Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
November 1, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #89 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Document was not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 90 BRIEF in Opposition re #85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 89 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #85 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certification of Service) (Ray, Greg) Modified on 11/1/2017 to add document linkage, remove attachment #2 from public view and redocket it at #90 . (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 24, 2017 Set Response: Response to Motion. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2017 (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 88 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. Answer due from VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. on 10/31/2017. (Ray, Greg) Modified on 10/24/2017 to add answer due date. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 87 Disclosure Statement identifying Penn Line Service, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Solomon, Stephanie) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 86 BRIEF in Support re #85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Solomon, Stephanie) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Stephanie) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned for all further proceedings to Judge Yvette Kane (M.D. Pa.), who, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b), has been designated and assigned by the Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit to hold court in civil matters for the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan is no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/26/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 83 REPLY BRIEF re #73 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) Modified on 9/14/2017 to add document linkage. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 82 Defendant EYP Mission Critical Facilities, Inc. ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Weiner, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 81 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA. (Lamperski, Vincent) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 80 Schneider Electric USA, Inc. fka Square D Company's ANSWER to #42 Third Party Complaint of Defendant Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC.(a Corporation), CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.(a Corporation), EXP GLOBAL, INC.(a Corporation), EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC.(a Corporation), KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC(A Limited Liability Company and), MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC.(A Corporation), MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.(a Corporation), THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC., VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA. (Lamperski, Vincent) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 79 BRIEF in Opposition re #73 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY waiver sent on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 76 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EXP GLOBAL, INC. (Martin, Benjamin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 75 Proposed Order re #73 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 74 BRIEF in Support re #73 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 73 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. on 9/8/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 72 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. Answer due from EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. on 9/8/201. (Weiner, Michael) Modified on 8/10/2017 to add answer due date. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 71 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC. (a Corporation), CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC. (a Corporation), EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. (a Corporation), KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC (A Limited Liability Company and), MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. (A Corporation), MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC. (a Corporation), THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by EXP GLOBAL, INC. (a Corporation). (Martin, Benjamin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Solomon on behalf of TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Solomon, Stephanie) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. White on behalf of TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (White, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine J. McLay on behalf of TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY. (McLay, Katherine) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 67 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Colville, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 66 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Colville, Michael) Modified on 8/2/2017. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as to Defendant, Corgan Architect Associates, Inc. by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) Modified on 8/2/2017. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 64 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 63 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, SQUARE-D COMPANY, TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 61 Errata re #42 Third Party Complaint Summons by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. Reason for Correction: Summons on Third Party. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 18, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #59 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 60 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 59 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. (Argento, L.) Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and redocketed at #60 . Modified on 7/18/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING the #56 Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant, EXP Global, Inc. has until August 7, 2017, to Answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/14/2017. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 57 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CBRE GROUP, INC. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 13, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by EXP GLOBAL, INC. (Martin, Benjamin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 55 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by EXP GLOBAL, INC. (Martin, Benjamin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 54 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC.. (Weiner, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement identifying Hewlett Packard Enterprise as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC.. (Weiner, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 52 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.(a Corporation) Answer due from CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.(a Corporation) on 8/1/2017. (Cremonese, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 51 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 50 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons directed to Third Party Defendant TRI COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (Ray, Greg) Modified on 7/12/2017. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 49 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons directed to Third Party Defendant SQUARE-D COMPANY by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (Ray, Greg) Modified on 7/12/2017. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 48 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons directed to Third Party Defendant SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (Ray, Greg) Modified on 7/12/2017. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 47 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.(a Corporation). (Cremonese, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 46 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 6, 2017 Filing 45 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC. on 7/25/2017. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant McDonough, Bolyard, & Peck, Inc. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 7/5/17. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
July 3, 2017 Filing 43 Defendant CBRE, Inc., incorrectly identified as CBRE Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by CBRE GROUP, INC.(a Corporation). (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 42 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, SQUARE-D COMPANY, filed by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than July 21, 2017. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 06/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Martin on behalf of EXP GLOBAL, INC.(a Corporation). (Martin, Benjamin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Lee on behalf of EXP GLOBAL, INC.(a Corporation). (Lee, Christopher) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition re #21 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. Answer due from EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. on 8/14/2017. (Weiner, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) re #8 Amended Complaint filed by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CBRE GROUP, INC. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Weiner on behalf of EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC.. (Weiner, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CBRE GROUP, INC.(a Corporation) Answer due from CBRE GROUP, INC.(a Corporation) on 7/10/2017. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 32 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC.. (Argento, L.)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on 8/1/2017; THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on 8/1/2017. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Defendants GSA and NOAA #29 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to #8 Amended Complaint. Responsive pleading due by 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 6/20/17. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE - Certificate of Merit by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint by THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Colville, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Colville on behalf of THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Colville, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 27 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) M [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint With Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against CBRE GROUP, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Esposito Kaufman on behalf of CBRE GROUP, INC.. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Intention to File Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to File a Certificate of Merit by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC. Answer due from CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC. on 7/12/2017. (Cremonese, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support re #21 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) filed by MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) re #8 Amended Complaint by MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
June 1, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #20 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 6/8/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Cremonese on behalf of CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Cremonese, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC.. (Argento, L.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by L. John Argento on behalf of MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC.. (Argento, L.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Gesk on behalf of MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Gesk, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Gesk on behalf of MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.. (Gesk, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. Answer due from MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. on 6/22/2017. (Argento, L.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Relative to Defendant Facilities Support Services, LLC Only Pursuant to F.R.C.P. No. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 9, 2017 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. on 6/1/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CBRE GROUP, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC. (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. Answer due from MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. on 6/1/2017 (Argento, L.) Modified on 5/9/2017 to add answer due date. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC., MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC., CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., EXP GLOBAL, INC., CBRE GROUP, INC., FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC.; KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC answer due 6/16/2107; MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC. answer due 6/16/2107; THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 6/16/2107; THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 6/16/2107; VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. answer due 6/16/2107, filed by FRANK GAUS, III; KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Summons MCDONOUGH, BOLYARD, PECK, INC. #2 Summons FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, #3 Summons CBRE GROUP, INC., #4 EXP GLOBAL, INC., #5 Summons CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC., #6 Summons EYP MISSION CRITICAL FACILITIES, INC. (Pasquarelli, Samuel) Text modified on 5/8/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC Answer due from KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC on 6/16/2017. (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg A. Ray on behalf of VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC.. (Ray, Greg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 3, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 5/10/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 3, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Bentz on behalf of KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Bentz, Daniel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley N. Rodgers on behalf of KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC. (Rodgers, Ashley) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
April 13, 2017 Summons Issued as to KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]
April 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KPN ARCHITECTS, LLC, MARCH-WESTIN COMPANY, INC., THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERTEX NON-PROFIT HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4301291), filed by FRANK GAUS, III, KRISTI GAUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons General Services Administration, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, #6 Summons Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc., #7 Summons KPN Architects, LLC, #8 Summons March-Westin Company, Inc.) (jsp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAUS et al v. THE GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine J. McLay
Represented By: Stephanie L. Solomon
Represented By: David B. White
Represented By: Anthony C. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl Esposito Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: March-Westin Company, Inc.
Represented By: L. John Argento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonough, Bolyard, Peck, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Gesk
Represented By: Jonathan M. Gesk
Represented By: Kristen Moritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The General Services Administration Of The United States Of America
Represented By: Michael C. Colville
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORGAN ARCHITECT ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Cremonese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPN Architects, LLC
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Daniel R. Bentz
Represented By: Thomas M. Pie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYP Mission Critical Facilities, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Weiner
Represented By: Mario R. Bordogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Of The United States Of America
Represented By: Michael C. Colville
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXP Global, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Lee
Represented By: Benjamin Martin
Represented By: BreiAnne Varner Redd
Represented By: Melvin F. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA
Represented By: Christopher S. Arnold
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SQUARE-D COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Gaus
Represented By: Samuel J. Pasquarelli
Represented By: Vincent M. Trivelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gaus, III
Represented By: Samuel J. Pasquarelli
Represented By: Vincent M. Trivelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Vertex Non-Profit Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Greg A. Ray
Represented By: Stanley A. Heflin
Represented By: Peter T DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?