The Marion County Coal Company v. United Mine Workers of America, International Union et al
Plaintiff: The Marion County Coal Company
Defendant: United Mine Workers Of America, Local Union 9909 and United Mine Workers of America, International Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against The Marion County Coal Company by United Mine Workers Of America, Local Union 9909, United Mine Workers of America, International Union. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Arbitration Award, #2 Attachment 2016 NBCWA, #3 Attachment Grievance)(Fagan, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Marion County Coal Company. United Mine Workers Of America, Local Union 9909 waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; United Mine Workers of America, International Union waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Glass, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Marion County Coal Company identifying Corporate Parent Murray Energy Holdings Co. for The Marion County Coal Company.. (Glass, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO CAVATE ARBITRATION AWARD against United Mine Workers Of America, Local Union 9909, United Mine Workers of America, International Union, filed by The Marion County Coal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Grievance, #2 Exhibit B Decision and Award, #3 Exhibit C Order: Supplemental To Decision 78-16, #4 Exhibit D ARB Case No. 78-26 (Selby, 1980), #5 Exhibit E Relevant Sections of the 2016 NBCWA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2814264.(jmm) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Marion County Coal Company v. United Mine Workers of America, International Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers Of America, Local Union 9909
Represented By: Kevin F. Fagan
Represented By: Charles F. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America, International Union
Represented By: Kevin F. Fagan
Represented By: Charles F. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marion County Coal Company
Represented By: Michael D. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?