Solomon v. Fansler et al
Plaintiff: Michael L. Solomon
Defendant: Triad Engineering, Inc., Advance Refrigeration, Inc, Clear Mountain Bank, West Virginia State Tax Department, Wolf Landscapes Plus, Mercantile Realty, Inc., F.K. Everest, Inc., Charles Trompack, The Huntington National Bank, Jackson Kelly, PLLC, Deitrich S. Fansler, Leslie Equipment Co. and Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald G. Kramer, II (Kramer, Ronald)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS #15 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2019. Discovery due by 9/23/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/21/19. (njz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES CONTAINED IN THE FIRST ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY re #4 FirstOrder,, by Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tighe, Tara)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Umina on behalf of Wolf Landscapes Plus (Umina, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR TRIAD ENGINEERING, INC. Court ORDERS that Teresa J. Dumire and Camille E. Wartts of Kay Casto & Chaney PLLC, shall substitute as counsel for Defendant Triad Engineering, Inc., in place of Attorney David V. Moore of DV Moore Law, PLLC. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/4/2019 (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Order Approving Substitution of Counsel re #10 Notice (Other) by Triad Engineering, Inc.. (Dumire, Teresa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Triad Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Triad Engineering, Inc. for Triad Engineering, Inc... (Dumire, Teresa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Triad Engineering, Inc. of Substitution of Counsel (Dumire, Teresa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Leslie Equipment Co..(Hammond, Jason)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kyle L. Bishop. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/29/2019 (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Beahlf of US Department of Justice Attorney Kyle Bishop by Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tighe, Tara)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Wayne Williams on behalf of West Virginia State Tax Department (Williams, L.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Originally filed in wrong case, now filed in correct case with original file date) (jmm). (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/29/2019 with correct case number on document) (jmm).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/21/19. (mh)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Granting #2 The United States Of America's Motion To Establish Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint. Answer due within sixty days from the date when United States removed this case from the Circuit Court of Monongalia County, West Virginia Court. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/21/2019 (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 United States Of America's Motion To Establish Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jmm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County, (case number 19-C-107), filed by Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Attachment State Court Docket sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) No Filing Fee Paid - USA removed(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Fansler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: David V. Moore
Represented By: Camille E Wartts
Represented By: Teresa J. Dumire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Refrigeration, Inc
Represented By: Ronald G. Kramer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Mountain Bank
Represented By: Kyle T. Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia State Tax Department
Represented By: L. Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Landscapes Plus
Represented By: Ryan J. Umina
Represented By: Peter D. Dinardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercantile Realty, Inc.
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.K. Everest, Inc.
Represented By: John Ray Funkhouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Trompack
Represented By: John B. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Kelly, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deitrich S. Fansler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Equipment Co.
Represented By: Jason S. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Tara Noel Tighe
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Solomon
Represented By: Michael L. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?