DBI Networks, LLC v. City of Morgantown
Plaintiff: DBI Networks, LLC
Defendant: City of Morgantown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00119
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CANCELING JULY 15, 2019 HEARING. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/9/19. (jss)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Regarding the Issue of Service filed by DBI Networks, LLC. (McCoy, Adam)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Anita Taff-Rice: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002640 (jss)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anita Taff-Rice by DBI Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCoy, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Morgantown served on 6/27/2019. (McCoy, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON THE ISSUE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND SCHEDULING HEARING: The Court DIRECTS that Plaintiff file a response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by 7/8/2019 and Defendant must file a reply by 7/12/2019. The Court SCHEDULES a Motion Hearing for 7/15/2019 01:00 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/19. (cnd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Morgantown. (Webb, Erin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Morgantown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Carol Allen, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Webb, Erin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUBPOENA RETURNED as to City of Morgantown., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Morgantown served on 6/5/2019. (McCoy, Adam)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) filed by DBI Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chad Henson, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Lyndall Nipps)(McCoy, Adam)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) by DBI Networks, LLC. (McCoy, Adam)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMNARY INJUNCTION, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES against City of Morgantown filed by DBI Networks, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2833400 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lyndall Nipps Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Timothy Chad Henson Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) Modified title on 6/4/2019 (jss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DBI Networks, LLC v. City of Morgantown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBI Networks, LLC
Represented By: Adam L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Morgantown
Represented By: Erin J Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?