El-Amin et al v. IRS, US Government
Plaintiff: Ali K. El-Amin and Yuliya A. El-Amin
Defendant: IRS, US Government
Case Number: 1:2019cv00122
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice and #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/19/19. (mh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to IRS, US Government served on 6/14/2019 (per USPS website) (mh)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/11/19. (mh) (To PS Plaintiffs via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Plaintiffs via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002623 (mh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IRS, US Government, filed by Ali K. El-Amin, Yuliya A. El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2019: #2 Exhibit A - Sealed per IMK, #3 Exhibit B - Sealed per IMK, #4 Exhibit C - Sealed per IMK, #5 Exhibit D - Sealed per IMK, #6 Exhibit E - Sealed per IMK, #7 Exhibit F - Sealed per IMK, #8 Exhibit G - Sealed per IMK) (mh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Amin et al v. IRS, US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS, US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali K. El-Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuliya A. El-Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?