Rover Pipeline, LLC v. Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ROW and WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ATWS-2 et al
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Ronnie D. Smith, Any Unknown Owners, Pamela P. Smith and Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ROW and WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ATWS-2
Case Number: 1:2019cv00124
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rover Pipeline, LLC (Williams, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/26/2019. (dk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Temporary Easement(s) to be Condemned by Rover Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Temporary Easement(s) to be Condemned by Rover Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 A, #3 B)(Williams, Lauren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Rover Pipeline, LLC of Condemnation Action (Williams, Lauren)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Court TRANSFERS this civil action to theactive docket of the Honorable John Preston Bailey. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/17/2019. (wrr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT(S) against All Defendants filed by Rover Pipeline, LLC. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2841045. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Diagram of Easement, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rover Pipeline, LLC v. Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ROW and WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ATWS-2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rover Tract No(s) WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ROW and WV-DO-SHC-042.300-ATWS-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Lauren A. Williams
Represented By: Lori A. Dawkins
Represented By: William D. Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?