Stillwagon v. West Virginia University Board of Governors et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Stillwagon
Defendant: Cara Lyle, West Virginia University Board of Governors and Adam J. Kaplan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sims, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof filed by Adam J. Kaplan. (White, Tamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Cara Lyle, M.D. filed by Cara Lyle. (Prince, Chelsea)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Cara Lyle, M.D. filed by Thomas Stillwagon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for Pre-Suit Mediation, #2 Exhibit Form 95)(Sims, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof of Defendant Kaplan filed by Thomas Stillwagon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit Form 95)(Sims, David)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE [DKT. NOS. #9 , #10 ]. The Court GRANTS Stillwagon's unopposed motions to extend (Dkt. Nos. #9 , #10 ) and EXTENDS the time in which he may file any response to the defendants' #5 , #8 motions to dismiss until Monday, August 19, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/6/2019. (wrr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Thomas Stillwagon. (Sims, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Cara Lyle, M.D. by Thomas Stillwagon. (Sims, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Cara Lyle, M.D. by Thomas Stillwagon. (Sims, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Thomas Stillwagon. (Sims, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Adam J. Kaplan. (White, Tamela)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Adam J. Kaplan Joinder in Notice of Removal Filed by Cara Lyle, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Tamela)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint For Damages by Adam J. Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Tamela)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Cara Lyle, M.D. by Cara Lyle. (Prince, Chelsea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendant WVUBOG to Plaintiff's Complaint by West Virginia University Board of Governors.(Prince, Chelsea)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 03:00 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/17/2019. (wrr) Emailed to Attorney Lewis. Modified on 7/22/2019 to correct docket text (wrr).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Austin T. Lewis. (wrr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Thomas Stillwagon v West Virginia University Board of Governors, et al. from Circuit Court of Harrison County, WV, (case number 19-C-164-2)Filing Fee $400, PAID - Receipt #0424-2858715, filed by Cara Lyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State court record, #2 Exhibit B-Affiliation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwagon v. West Virginia University Board of Governors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stillwagon
Represented By: David A. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Lyle
Represented By: Chelsea V. Prince
Represented By: Crystal I. Cutright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Board of Governors
Represented By: Chelsea V. Prince
Represented By: Crystal I. Cutright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J. Kaplan
Represented By: Austin T. Lewis
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?