Lough v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beverly Lough
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00139
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney, #2 US Attorney General)(jss)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. The Court ORDERS and NOTICES that in accordance with LR Gen P 3.01, Plaintiff shall stipulate in an affidavit that any recovery in the action shall, pursuant to the order of the Court, bepaid to the Clerk, who shall pay therefrom any remaining unpaid costs taxed against the Plaintiff and remit the balance to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 7/26/2019. (Copy to USM.)(wrr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Non-redacted #1 Complaint filed by Beverly Lough. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Lough. (jss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Beverly Lough. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - Order of Appeals Council, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) Modified on 7/19/2019 - Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2862581 (jss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lough v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Lough
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?