Meeks v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Byron Meeks
Defendant: Rob McClung, Tom Joyce and Joe Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (mh) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/27/2019) (mh).
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Byron Meeks re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rule 4. Summons, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Certificate of Service) (No envelope - documents received at counter). (dk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Foster, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tom Joyce, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Joe Martin, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Michele Craig)(Foster, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/2019 (per USPS website). (dk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Byron Meeks. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/8/2019 (per USPS website). (dk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Byron Meeks recommending that this action be transferred, pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 1404(a), to the docket of the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Any party shall, within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation, file with the Clerk of the Court specific written objections identifying the portions of the Report and Recommendation to which objection is made, and the basis for such objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/5/19. (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/3/19 (per USPS). (mh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rob McClung served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tom Joyce served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joe Martin served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL of action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/1/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002661. (dk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT (To Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Byron Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob McClung
Represented By: Jeffrey A Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Joyce
Represented By: Jeffrey A Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Martin
Represented By: Jeffrey A Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?