Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. Rymer
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: David M Rymer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00146
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court SCHEDULES a status conference for Wednesday, October 30, 2019, at 2:00 P.M. Counsel and Mr. Rymer shall appear in person at the Clarksburg, West Virginia point of holding court. The Court DIRECTS Columbia to provide a copy of this Order to Rymer and file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/30/2019. (wrr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 Mail sent to David M. Rymer #9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SCHEDULING HEARING, Returned as Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward. (wrr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David M Rymer served on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents Served)(Meadows, John)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER MEMORIALIZING PARTIES' AGREEMENT, HOLDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN ABEYANCE [DKT. NO. #2 ], AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT STATUS REPORT OR PROPOSED DISMISSAL ORDER. The Court further DIRECTED counsel for Columbia to submit a status report or proposed dismissal order no later than Friday, September 20, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/23/2019. (wrr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Exhibit and Witness List from continued hearing held 8/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Packet of documents delivered to Defendant on 8/5/19 (including Complaint, Motion for TRO, 8/5/19 Order, CD of Exhibit 5 to Complaint)). (dk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Show Cause Hearing held on 8/21/2019; Continued Evidentiary Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC held on 8/21/2019. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Memorandum in Support filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chain of Title, #2 Exhibit Title Documents - Chart, #3 Exhibit Title Documents, #4 Exhibit Title Documents)(Meadows, John)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SCHEDULING HEARING. Rymer is ORDERED to appear in person for a Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2019 03:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/12/2019 (copy of order, docket entries 3 and 6 to Defendant via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Exhibit and Witness List for hearing held 8/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Property Tax Records from Doddridge County, #3 Exhibit 3 - Photograph of Property, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/31/19 Letter from TC Energy to Mr. Rymer, (5) Exhibit 5 - CD voicemail recording (lodged in Clerk's Office)). (dk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/12/2019. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David M Rymer served on 8/6/2019. (Meadows, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Peter J. Raupp. (Sent via fax.) (wrr)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [DKT. NO. #2 ] AND SCHEDULING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Because Columbia has not satisfied the requirements of Rule 65(b)(1), the Court DENIES its motion for a temporary restraining order. The Court SCHEDULES an evidentiary hearing on the pending motion for a preliminary injunction for Monday, August 12, 2019, at 1:00 P.M., at the Clarksburg, West Virginia, point of holding court. It further ORDERS Columbia to provide a copy of this Order to Rymer and to file proof of such notice with the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/5/2019. (wrr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support Of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(jmm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David M Rymer, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2872190.(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. Rymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Rymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Devon Joseph Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?