Dolphus v. USA
Petitioner: Danzavious Dolphus
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00151
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wagner, Sarah)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/29/2019. (wrr)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINE (DKT. NO. #8 ). The Court GRANTS the motion and EXTENDS the respondent's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Friday, October 18, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/27/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. (Wagner, Sarah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Wagner on behalf of USA (Wagner, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/16/2019 per USPS website. (jmm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/2019. (dk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE ANSWER, MOTION, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/13/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner by cert. mail). (dk) (Main Document 3 replaced to remove MJ on 8/9/2019) (dk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support of his Application/Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2255 re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Danzavious Dolphus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Danzavious Dolphus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolphus v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Zelda E. Wesley
Represented By: Sarah E Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danzavious Dolphus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?