Kyle v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Kyle
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00162
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner Of Social Security Administration served on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return)(mh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Frederick J. Dailey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/26/19. (mh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 PHV Filing fee for J. Daley, Jr. $ 200.00, receipt number WVNE014373 (mh)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 8/21/19. (mh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen M. Kyle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, C.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Frederick J. Daley, Jr. (mh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen M. Kyle. (mh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security Administration, filed by Stephen M. Kyle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Kyle
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Represented By: C. Richard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?