Delaney v. Frost
Plaintiff: Alexandria M. Delaney
Defendant: Jack Frost, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/1/2019. (dk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jack Frost, III.(Hill, Cy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jack Frost, III served on 8/27/2019. (Edwards, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack Frost, III, filed by Alexandria M. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2883373.(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delaney v. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria M. Delaney
Represented By: J. Bryan Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Frost, III
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?