Novo Nordisk Inc. et al v. Mylan Institutional LLC
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk Inc. and Novo Nordisk A/S
Defendant: Mylan Institutional LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISMISSAL ORDER. This matter is dismissed, without prejudice and stricken from the docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/23/19. (mh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Other Document filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Companion, James)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for So Yeon Choe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/9/2019. (dk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Ryan P. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/9/2019. (dk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Laura T. Moran to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/9/2019. (dk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jeffrey Oelke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/9/2019. (dk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Fees received for Laura T. Moran, So Yeon Choe, Jeffrey J. Oelke and Ryan P. Johnson. $ 800.00. Receipt number WVNC002689. (dk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura T. Moran by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of So Yeon Choe by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey J. Oelke by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice or Ryan P. Johnson by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional Certification in Support of Application for Ryan P. Johnson's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Moran and Choe. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION of Attorney Johnson. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Oelke. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002264 (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFFS' FED.R.CIV.P. 7.1 STATEMENT by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR PATENT CASES INVOLVING AN ABBREVIATED NEW DRUG APPLICATION (ANDA) filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (lmm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Institutional LLC, filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 343 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 994 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - 833 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - 869 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - 618 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - 893 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - 956 Patent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novo Nordisk Inc. et al v. Mylan Institutional LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Oelke
Represented By: Ryan P. Johnson
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Laura T. Moran
Represented By: So Yeon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk A/S
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Oelke
Represented By: Ryan P. Johnson
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Laura T. Moran
Represented By: So Yeon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?