McGreevy v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Terry Shawn McGreevy
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/16/2019. (wrr)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is ORDERED, that 1:19-CV-166 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and retired from the docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/10/2019. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019. (wrr)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/19/2019 (copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Letter to plaintiff re: filing fee; #2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/31/2019. (wrr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Terry Shawn McGreevy regarding payment of filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved IFP Form)(Copy to plaintiff via CM, RRR, enclosed with #2 Notice.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security Administration, filed by Terry Shawn McGreevy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGreevy v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Shawn McGreevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?